CARTER v. FITNESS INTERNATIONAL, LLC et al
Plaintiff: CHARLES H CARTER
Defendant: FITNESS INTERNATIONAL, LLC, LA FITNESS and JOHN DOE
Case Number: 2:2019cv01215
Filed: September 23, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: William S Stickman
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1446
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 18, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER GRANTING #12 Motion for Extension of Time. Response to #10 Motion to Dismiss due by 11/29/2019; Reply due by 12/6/2019. Signed by Judge William S. Stickman on 11/18/19. (eca)
November 15, 2019 Filing 12 First MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #11 Response/Briefing Schedule by CHARLES H CARTER. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Zagari, John)
October 29, 2019 CLERK'S OFFICE QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE re #10 Motion to Dismiss. ERROR: Document was not linked. CORRECTION: Linked to appropriate document. This message is for informational purposes only. CLERK'S OFFICE QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE. ERROR: Document should have been filed as two separate documents. CORRECTION: Attorney advised in future that documents of that nature are to be filed as separate documents. Clerk of Court docketed Brief in Support of Motion. This message is for informational purposes only. (jm)
October 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER SETTING BRIEFING SCHEDULE. Response to #10 Omnibus Motion due by 11/19/2019; Reply due by 11/26/2019. Page limitations outlined herein. Signed by Judge William S. Stickman on 10/29/19. (eca)
October 28, 2019 W/ #10 BRIEF in Support re #10 Motion to Dismiss, filed by FITNESS INTERNATIONAL, LLC. (jm)
October 28, 2019 Filing 10 MOTION to Dismiss re #8 Amended Complaint by FITNESS INTERNATIONAL, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order A, #2 Proposed Order B, #3 Proposed Order C, #4 Proposed Order D) (McMeekin, John) Modified text on 10/29/2019 to add document linkage. (jm)
October 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER OF COURT. In light of the filing of #8 Amended Complaint, #5 Motion to Dismiss is DENIED AS MOOT. Signed by Judge William S. Stickman on 10/18/19. Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Order of the Court or Notice on the matter. (eca)
October 17, 2019 Filing 8 First AMENDED COMPLAINT against FITNESS INTERNATIONAL, LLC FITNESS INTERNATIONAL, LLC answer due 10/31/2019, filed by CHARLES H CARTER. (Zagari, John)
September 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER SETTING BRIEFING SCHEDULE. Response to #5 Omnibus Motion due by 10/21/2019; Reply due by 10/28/2019. Page limitations outlined herein. Signed by Judge William S. Stickman on 09/30/19. (eca)
September 27, 2019 Filing 6 BRIEF in Support re #5 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim, Motion for More Definite Statement, Motion to Dismiss for Failure to Join an Indispensible Party, Motion to Dismiss Punitive Damages filed by FITNESS INTERNATIONAL, LLC. (McMeekin, John)
September 27, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM , MOTION for More Definite Statement , MOTION to Dismiss Failure to Join an Indispensible Party, Dismiss Punitive Damages by FITNESS INTERNATIONAL, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order 1, #2 Proposed Order 2, #3 Proposed Order 3, #4 Proposed Order 4, #5 Exhibit A, #6 Exhibit B) (McMeekin, John) Modified text on 9/30/2019. (ept)
September 24, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Edward J. Chiodo on behalf of FITNESS INTERNATIONAL, LLC. (Chiodo, Edward)
September 24, 2019 Filing 3 Disclosure Statement identifying None as corporate parent or other affiliate, by FITNESS INTERNATIONAL, LLC. (Simkin, Sarah)
September 24, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Sarah J. Simkin on behalf of FITNESS INTERNATIONAL, LLC. (Simkin, Sarah)
September 23, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Court of Common Pleas of Allegheny County, case number GD-19-005578 (Filing fee, including Administrative fee, $400, receipt number 0315-5293557), filed by FITNESS INTERNATIONAL, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A - State Court Complaint) (cjo)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: CARTER v. FITNESS INTERNATIONAL, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FITNESS INTERNATIONAL, LLC
Represented By: John C. McMeekin, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LA FITNESS
Represented By: John C. McMeekin, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOHN DOE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CHARLES H CARTER
Represented By: John J. Zagari
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?