U.S. EQUAL EMPLOYMENT OPPORTUNITY COMMISSION v. CENTER ONE, LLC
Plaintiff: U.S. EQUAL EMPLOYMENT OPPORTUNITY COMMISSION
Defendant: CENTER ONE, LLC
Case Number: 2:2019cv01242
Filed: September 27, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: David S Cercone
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 42:2000
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 12, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 12, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Ronald L. Phillips on behalf of U.S. EQUAL EMPLOYMENT OPPORTUNITY COMMISSION. (Phillips, Ronald)
October 24, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Morgan M. J. Randle on behalf of CENTER ONE, LLC. (Randle, Morgan)
October 22, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE that instant civil action has been designated for placement into the United States District Court's Alternative Dispute Resolution program. Parties are directed to fully complete the required 26(f) report, which includes the stipulation of selecting an ADR process. Counsel for plaintiff (or in the case of a removal action, counsel for removing defendant) shall make service of the notice on all parties. (kak)
October 17, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Emily E. Mahler on behalf of CENTER ONE, LLC. (Mahler, Emily)
October 8, 2019 Filing 2 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by U.S. EQUAL EMPLOYMENT OPPORTUNITY COMMISSION. CENTER ONE, LLC waiver sent on 10/7/2019, answer due 12/6/2019. (Murray, Gregory)
September 27, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against CENTER ONE, LLC ), filed by U.S. EQUAL EMPLOYMENT OPPORTUNITY COMMISSION. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (sdp)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: U.S. EQUAL EMPLOYMENT OPPORTUNITY COMMISSION v. CENTER ONE, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: U.S. EQUAL EMPLOYMENT OPPORTUNITY COMMISSION
Represented By: Gregory A. Murray
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CENTER ONE, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?