TARUGU et al v. JOURNAL OF BIOLOGICAL CHEMISTRY et al
Plaintiff: DR. RAJU C. REDDY and ARAVIND R. TARUGU
Defendant: AMERICAN SOCIETY OF BIOCHEMISTRY AND MOLECULAR BIOLOGY and JOURNAL OF BIOLOGICAL CHEMISTRY
Case Number: 2:2019cv01256
Filed: September 30, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: Cynthia Reed Eddy
Nature of Suit: Assault Libel & Slander
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 26, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER DENYING AS MOOT THE (ECF No. #12 ) Motion to Dismiss. A (ECF No. #19 ) First Amended Complaint was filed November 25, 2019, rendering this motion MOOT. Signed by Magistrate Judge Lisa Pupo Lenihan on 11/26/2019. Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Order of the Court or Notice on the matter. (jmb)
November 25, 2019 Filing 19 First AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants All Defendants, filed by ARAVIND R. TARUGU, RAJU C. REDDY. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Ex. A-B, #2 Exhibit Ex. C-D, #3 Exhibit Ex. E-F, #4 Exhibit Ex. G-H, #5 Exhibit Ex. I, #6 Exhibit Ex. J-K (Part 1), #7 Exhibit Ex. K (Part 2), #8 Exhibit Ex. K (Part 3), #9 Exhibit Ex. L (Part 1), #10 Exhibit Ex. L (Part 2), #11 Exhibit Ex. L (Part 3)) (Cass, Jonathan)
November 11, 2019 Filing 18 STIPULATION Extending Plaintiffs' time to Respond to Defendants' Motion to Dismiss by RAJU C. REDDY, ARAVIND R. TARUGU. (Cass, Jonathan)
November 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER GRANTING the #14 Motion for Jonathan A. Cass to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Lisa Pupo Lenihan on 11/01/2019. Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Order of the Court or Notice on the matter. (jmb)
October 30, 2019 Filing 16 CONSENT to Trial/Jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge OR District Judge Option, by ARAVIND R. TARUGU. (McNally, James)
October 30, 2019 Filing 15 CONSENT to Trial/Jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge OR District Judge Option, by AMERICAN SOCIETY OF BIOCHEMISTRY AND MOLECULAR BIOLOGY, JOURNAL OF BIOLOGICAL CHEMISTRY. (Montgomery, Katelin)
October 30, 2019 Filing 14 MOTION for attorney Jonathan A. Cass to Appear Pro Hac Vice, (Filing fee $70, Receipt # 0315-5342108) by RAJU C. REDDY, ARAVIND R. TARUGU. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Certificate of Service, #3 Affidavit, #4 Exhibit) (Cass, Jonathan)
October 21, 2019 Filing 13 BRIEF in Support re #12 Motion to Dismiss filed by AMERICAN SOCIETY OF BIOCHEMISTRY AND MOLECULAR BIOLOGY, JOURNAL OF BIOLOGICAL CHEMISTRY. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit) (Montgomery, Katelin)
October 21, 2019 Filing 12 MOTION to Dismiss PURSUANT TO RULE 12(b)(6) by AMERICAN SOCIETY OF BIOCHEMISTRY AND MOLECULAR BIOLOGY, JOURNAL OF BIOLOGICAL CHEMISTRY. (Attachments: #1 Supplement Certificate of Conferral, #2 Proposed Order) (Montgomery, Katelin)
October 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER that because this case has been assigned to a Magistrate Judge, each party must execute and file the form consenting to the jurisdiction of the Magistrate Judge or selecting the option to have the case randomly assigned to a District Judge no later than October 30, 2019. The applicable form is available on the Courts website at www.pawd.uscourts.gov in the forms section. THE EVENT USED FOR DOCKETING THIS FORM IS FOUND UNDER OTHER DOCUMENTS, CALLED CONSENT TO TRIAL BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE OR DISTRICT JUDGE. If the parties elect to have the case assigned to a District Judge, Magistrate Judge Lisa Pupo Lenihan will continue to manage the case as provided for in Local Rule 72G. Signed by Magistrate Judge Lisa Pupo Lenihan on 10/09/2019. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Consent Form) (jmb)
October 4, 2019 Update Answer Deadline: Answer due from AMERICAN SOCIETY OF BIOCHEMISTRY AND MOLECULAR BIOLOGY on 10/21/2019; JOURNAL OF BIOLOGICAL CHEMISTRY on 10/21/2019 (jm)
October 4, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by James McNally on behalf of RAJU C. REDDY, ARAVIND R. TARUGU. (McNally, James)
October 4, 2019 Magistrate Judge Lisa Pupo Lenihan added. (mao)
October 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE indicating that the Clerk of Court shall reassign this action to another member of the Court for all further proceedings. Signed by Judge Nora Barry Fischer on 10/3/2019. (bdk)
October 3, 2019 Filing 8 Stipulation for Extension of Time to Answer by JOURNAL OF BIOLOGICAL CHEMISTRY, AMERICAN SOCIETY OF BIOCHEMISTRY AND MOLECULAR BIOLOGY Answer due from All Defendants on 10/21/2019. (Montgomery, Katelin) Modified text on 10/4/2019. (jm)
October 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER RE: 12(b) Motions (details more fully stated in said Order). Signed by Judge Nora Barry Fischer on 10/3/19. (jg)
October 3, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE that instant civil action has been designated for placement into the United States District Court's Alternative Dispute Resolution program. Parties are directed to fully complete the required 26(f) report, which includes the stipulation of selecting an ADR process. Counsel for plaintiff (or in the case of a removal action, counsel for removing defendant) shall make service of the notice on all parties. (jg)
October 3, 2019 Judge Nora Barry Fischer presiding. Magistrate Judge Cynthia Reed Eddy no longer assigned to case. (nll)
October 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER OF RECUSAL. Chief Magistrate Judge Cynthia Reed Eddy recused. Signed by Chief Magistrate Judge Cynthia Reed Eddy on 10/2/2019. (sms)
October 2, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Debra M. Parrish on behalf of AMERICAN SOCIETY OF BIOCHEMISTRY AND MOLECULAR BIOLOGY and JOURNAL OF BIOLOGICAL CHEMISTRY. (Parrish, Debra) Modified text on 10/4/2019. (jm)
October 2, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by David G. Oberdick on behalf of AMERICAN SOCIETY OF BIOCHEMISTRY AND MOLECULAR BIOLOGY, JOURNAL OF BIOLOGICAL CHEMISTRY. (Oberdick, David)
October 2, 2019 Filing 2 STANDING ORDER ON RULE 12(b) MOTIONS. Signed by Chief Magistrate Judge Cynthia Reed Eddy on 10/2/2019. (sms)
September 30, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Common Pleas of Allegheny Court, case number G.D. 19-11584 (Filing fee, including Administrative fee, $400, receipt number 0315-5302791), filed by JOURNAL OF BIOLOGICAL CHEMISTRY, AMERICAN SOCIETY OF BIOCHEMISTRY AND MOLECULAR BIOLOGY. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D) (jm)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: TARUGU et al v. JOURNAL OF BIOLOGICAL CHEMISTRY et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DR. RAJU C. REDDY
Represented By: James McNally
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ARAVIND R. TARUGU
Represented By: James McNally
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AMERICAN SOCIETY OF BIOCHEMISTRY AND MOLECULAR BIOLOGY
Represented By: Katelin J. Montgomery
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOURNAL OF BIOLOGICAL CHEMISTRY
Represented By: Katelin J. Montgomery
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?