HOUGH v. HEATH CONSULTANTS INCORPORATED
Plaintiff: WALTER HOUGH
Defendant: HEATH CONSULTANTS INCORPORATED
Case Number: 2:2019cv01257
Filed: October 1, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: Cynthia Reed Eddy
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 25, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 25, 2019 Filing 9 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by WALTER HOUGH. HEATH CONSULTANTS INCORPORATED waiver sent on 10/17/2019, answer due 12/16/2019. (Logan, James)
October 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER granting #3 Motion for Aaron Holt to Appear Pro Hac Vice, #7 Errata. Signed by Chief Magistrate Judge Cynthia Reed Eddy on 10/22/2019. Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Order of the Court or Notice on the matter. (sms)
October 22, 2019 Filing 7 Errata re #3 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, by HEATH CONSULTANTS INCORPORATED. Reason for Correction: Attorney requesting admission as filer. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Proposed Order) (Holt, Aaron)
October 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER striking #5 Errata re #3 Motion for Aaron Holt to Appear Pro Hac Vice. In accordance with LCvR 83.2.B, the motion must be made by the attorney seeking to be admitted. Attorney Aaron Holt shall refile the motion using the Errata event in ECF in order to avoid repaying the filing fee. Signed by Chief Magistrate Judge Cynthia Reed Eddy on 10/22/2019. Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Order of the Court or Notice on the matter. (sms)
October 21, 2019 Filing 5 Errata re #3 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, of Aaron Holt by HEATH CONSULTANTS INCORPORATED. Reason for Correction: Missing Proposed Order. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Affidavit of Aaron Holt, #2 Exhibit 1 - Certificate of Good Standing, #3 Proposed Order) (Ennis, Peter)
October 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER striking #3 Motion for Aaron Holt to Appear Pro Hac Vice to be refiled by the attorney seeking admission pro hac vice in accordance with LCvR 83.2.B. Attorney Aaron Holt shall refile his motion using the Errata event in ECF in order to avoid repaying the filing fee. Signed by Chief Magistrate Judge Cynthia Reed Eddy on 10/21/2019. Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Order of the Court or Notice on the matter. (sms)
October 21, 2019 CLERK'S OFFICE QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE re #3 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. ERROR: Proposed Order was not attached. CORRECTION: Attorney is advised to file a proposed order by using the Proposed Order event and linking it to the document in question. This message is for informational purposes only. (ma)
October 18, 2019 Filing 3 MOTION for attorney Aaron Holt to Appear Pro Hac Vice, (Filing fee $70, Receipt # 0315-5326433) by HEATH CONSULTANTS INCORPORATED. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service, #2 Affidavit for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Aaron Holt, #3 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing) (Ennis, Peter)
October 2, 2019 Filing 2 STANDING ORDER ON RULE 12(b) MOTIONS. Signed by Chief Magistrate Judge Cynthia Reed Eddy on 10/2/2019. (sms)
October 1, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against HEATH CONSULTANTS INCORPORATED (Filing fee, including Administrative fee, $400, receipt number 0315-5302955), filed by WALTER HOUGH. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (mao)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: HOUGH v. HEATH CONSULTANTS INCORPORATED
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HEATH CONSULTANTS INCORPORATED
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: WALTER HOUGH
Represented By: James H. Logan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?