TAUCHER v. TOPGOLF INTERNATIONAL, INC. et al
Plaintiff: RONALD TAUCHER
Defendant: TOPGOLF PAYROLL SERVICES, LLC, TOPGOLF USA PITTSBURGH, LLC and TOPGOLF INTERNATIONAL, INC.
Case Number: 2:2019cv01280
Filed: October 7, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: Lisa Pupo Lenihan
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Americans with Disabilities - Employment
Cause of Action: 42:12101
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 6, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 6, 2019 Filing 9 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Lisa Pupo Lenihan: A Telephone Conference was held on 11/6/2019. Defendant would be willing to engage in settlement discussions, but it has placed a 'de minimus' value on the case. Given that, Plaintiff would like to proceed with the initial scheduling conference and discovery. An initial scheduling conference will be set after the Answer is filed, but Plaintiff is asked by the Court to make a demand, to which the Defendant will respond. Plaintiff counsel asks to participate in the initial conference via telephone. Defendants counsel will appear in person. This is acceptable to the court and, if defendant also intends to participate via telephone, she should alert the court in advance. (Court Reporter: none) (jmb)
November 1, 2019 Filing 8 Errata on the 7 Order Setting Telephone Conference. Reason for Correction: The wrong date was on the order. This entry corrects that error.ORDER that a Telephone Conference is scheduled for November 6, 2019 at 1:30 PM. Counsel shall call into the conference by dialing 888-363-4749 and entering the access code 6019141. If asked for a security code, use * to bypass. Plaintiffs counsel is ordered to forward this order to all known defense counsel. (jmb)
November 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER that a Telephone Conference is scheduled for November 6, 2020 at 1:30 PM. Counsel shall call into the conference by dialing 888-363-4749 and entering the access code 6019141. If asked for a security code, use * to bypass. Plaintiffs counsel is ordered to forward this order to all known defense counsel. Signed by Magistrate Judge Lisa Pupo Lenihan on 11/01/2019. Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Order of the Court or Notice on the matter. (jmb)
October 31, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Jennifer G. Betts on behalf of TOPGOLF INTERNATIONAL, INC., TOPGOLF PAYROLL SERVICES, LLC, TOPGOLF USA PITTSBURGH, LLC. (Betts, Jennifer)
October 31, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by W. Charles Sipio on behalf of RONALD TAUCHER. (Sipio, W.)
October 14, 2019 Filing 4 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by RONALD TAUCHER. TOPGOLF INTERNATIONAL, INC. waiver sent on 10/9/2019, answer due 12/9/2019; TOPGOLF PAYROLL SERVICES, LLC waiver sent on 10/9/2019, answer due 12/9/2019; TOPGOLF USA PITTSBURGH, LLC waiver sent on 10/9/2019, answer due 12/9/2019. (Karpf, Ari)
October 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER re Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 12(b) Motions to Dismiss, as more fully stated in said order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Lisa Pupo Lenihan on 10/10/2019. (jmb)
October 8, 2019 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to TOPGOLF INTERNATIONAL, INC., TOPGOLF PAYROLL SERVICES, LLC, TOPGOLF USA PITTSBURGH, LLC (cel)
October 7, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against TOPGOLF INTERNATIONAL, INC., TOPGOLF PAYROLL SERVICES, LLC, TOPGOLF USA PITTSBURGH, LLC (Filing fee, including Administrative fee, $400, receipt number 0315-5312075), filed by RONALD TAUCHER. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (cel)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: TAUCHER v. TOPGOLF INTERNATIONAL, INC. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TOPGOLF PAYROLL SERVICES, LLC
Represented By: Jennifer G. Betts
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TOPGOLF USA PITTSBURGH, LLC
Represented By: Jennifer G. Betts
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TOPGOLF INTERNATIONAL, INC.
Represented By: Jennifer G. Betts
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: RONALD TAUCHER
Represented By: Ari R. Karpf
Represented By: W. Charles Sipio
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?