GAY v. A.O. SMITH CORPORATION et al
Plaintiff: CARL E. GAY
Defendant: POWERMASTER PACIFIC PRODUCTS, ZURN INDUSTRIES, FLUOR CONSTRUCTORS INTERNATIONAL, MW CUSTOM PAPERS, LLC, NORTH AMERICAN MANUFACTURING CO., BRAND INSULATIONS, INC., INGERSOLL-RAND CORPORATION, WATTS REGULATOR CO., GENUINE PARTS COMPANY, RILEY POWER, INC., RCH NEW CO., II LLC, HONEYWELL, INC., AHLSTROM PUMPS LLC, BMI REFRACTORY SERVICES, INC., MET-PRO TECHNOLOGIES, LLC, AMETEK, INC., LONG ISLAND POWER AUTHORITY, JOHN CRANE, INC., CARVER PUMP COMPANY, GRINNELL, LLC, RESEARCH-COTTRELL, INC., MANCHESTER TANK, TRANE U.S. INC., EDF, INC., MILWAUKEE VALVE COMPANY, MINNOTTE CONTRACTING CORPORATION, VIKING PUMP, INC., ABB, INC., GENERAL DYNAMICS CORPORATION, THE GOODYEAR TIRE & RUBBER COMPANY, WHEELABRATOR AIR POLLUTION CONTROL, INC., SUNBEAM PRODUCTS, INC., GOULD ELECTRONICS, INC., THE MARLEY-WYLAIN COMPANY, YUBA HEAT TRANSFER, LLC, CRANE COMPANY, INC., CARRIER CORPORATION, EVOQUA WATER TECHNOLOGIES, LLC, NEXTERA ENERGY, INC., JOHNSON CONTROLS, INC., METROPOLITAN LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY, EXELON CORPORATION, OSRAM SYLVANIA INC., READING CRANE AND ENGINEERING COMPANY, UNION TANK CAR COMPANY, EICHLEAY CORPORATION, AURORA PUMP, WHEELING RUBBER PRODUCTS, INC., CHICAGO PNEUMATIC TOOL COMPANY, LLC, FLUOR CORPORATION, THE WILLIAM POWELL COMPANY, FOSTER WHEELER, LLC, UNITED STATES STEEL CORPORATION, LINDBERG, BEAZER EAST, INC, THE NASH ENGINEERING COMPANY, SULZER PUMPS (US), INC., HUNTER SALES CORPORATION, KADANT, INC., JOY GLOBAL SURFACE MINING, INC., AIRTEK, INC., IMO INDUSTRIES, INC, FMC CORPORATION, HAJOCA CORPORATION, DONALD MCKAY SMITH, INC., MCJUNKIN REDMAN CORPORATION, AMERON INTERNATIONAL CORPORATION, GOULDS PUMPS, LLC, CBS CORPORATION, GREENE TWEED & COMPANY, INC., ELLIOTT COMPANY, UNITED CONVEYOR CORPORATION, AIR & LIQUID SYSTEMS CORPORATION, SCHNEIDER ELECTRIC USA, INC., SAINT-GOBAIN ABRASIVES, INC., NAGLE PUMPS, INC., ARMSTRONG INTERNATIONAL, INC., BAKER HUGHES, FLSMIDTH, INC., CLARK RELIANCE CORPORATION, HOWDEN NORTH AMERICA, INC., FLUOR ENTERPRISES, INC., MUELLER STEAM SPECIALTY, MEAD, WT/HRC CORPORATION, ECODYNE HEAT EXCHANGERS, INC., CAMERON INTERNATIONAL CORPORATION, ELECTROLUX HOME PRODUCTS INC., WASHINGTON GROUP INTERNATIONAL, FLOWSERVE CORPORATION, MINE SAFETY APPLIANCE COMPANY, SPX COOLING TECHNOLOGIES, INC., DUQUESNE LIGHT COMPANY, AJAX MAGNETHERMIC CORPORATION, MCCARLS, INC., CLEAVER-BROOKS, CERTAINTEED CORPORATION, MCMASTER-CARR SUPPLY CO., WARREN PUMPS, LLC, BLUE M CORPORATION, PARKER-HANIFIN CORPORATION, JOY GLOBAL UNDERGROUND MINING, LLC, GOULD ELECTRONICS INC., FIRSTENERGY CORPORATION, EXELON GENERATION COMPANY, LLC, BW/IP, INC., CASHCO INC., FLOWSERVE US, INC., MOYNO, INC., CEMLINE CORPORATION, WTI RUST HOLDINGS, INC., YORK INTERNATIONAL CORPORATION, HONEYWELL INTERNATIONAL INC., BECHTEL CORPORATION, RUST ENGINEERING & CONSTRUCTION, INC., ELECTRIC BOAT CORPORATION, CLARK EQUIPMENT COMPANY, FLSMIDTH DORR-OLIVER, INC., VELAN VALVE CORPORATION, COLUMBUS MCKINNON CORP., EATON CORPORATION, AECOM ENERGY & CONSTRUCTION, INC., DRAVO CORPORATION, I.U. NORTH AMERICA, INC., OCEAN VIEW CAPITAL, SUNDYNE, LLC, LOCKHEED MARTIN CORPORATION, ALLIED GLOVE CORPORATION, STERLING FLUID SYSTEMS (USA), LLC, CLYDE UNION, INC., SIEMENS INDUSTRY INC, POWER PIPING COMPANY, A.O. SMITH CORPORATION, EXELON NUCLEAR PARTNERS, LLC, GENERAL ELECTRIC COMPANY, DEZURIK, INC., ARMSTRONG PUMPS, INC., CHICAGO BRIDGE & IRON COMPANY, MORGAN ENGINEERING SYSTEMS, INC., A.R. WILFLEY & SONS, INC., INSUL COMPANY, INC., INDUSTRIAL HOLDINGS CORPORATION, MCNEIL (OHIO) CORPORATION, REUNION INDUSTRIES, INC., SURFACE COMBUSTION, INC., WATSON MCDANIEL COMPANY, J-M MANUFACTURING COMPANY, INC., FOSECO, INC., ALFA LAVAL, INC., SPIRAX SARCO, INC., UNION CARBIDE CORPORATION, NORTEK GLOBAL HVAC, LLC, TUTHILL CORPORATION, ERIE CITY IRON WORKS, MARMON HOLDINGS, INC., BROWN BOVERI, INC., SIEMENS INDUSTRY, INC., FLORIDA POWER & LIGHT COMPANY, M.S. JACOBS & ASSOCIATES, INC., GARDNER DENVER, INC., BORGWARNER MORSE TEC LLC, ITT INDUSTRIES, INC., ATWOOD & MORRILL CO., INC. and PACIFIC PARTS
Case Number: 2:2019cv01311
Filed: October 11, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: William S Stickman
Nature of Suit: P.I. : Asbestos
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 9, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 9, 2019 Filing 438 REPLY BRIEF In Support of Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint filed by ALFA LAVAL, INC.. (Lowery, Katherine)
December 6, 2019 Filing 437 REPLY BRIEF re #356 Motion to Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction filed by GENERAL DYNAMICS CORPORATION. (Insco, James)
December 3, 2019 Filing 436 RESPONSE IN OPPOSITION TO ALFA LAVAL INC.'S MOTION TO DISMISS PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT to #431 Motion to Dismiss, #432 Brief in Support of Motion, filed by CARL E. GAY. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A) (Shipp, Jason)
December 2, 2019 Filing 435 ANSWER to all Cross-Claims asserted from November 9, 2019 to December 2, 2019 by FIRSTENERGY CORPORATION. (Sullivan, K.) Modified text on 12/3/2019. (jjg)
November 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 434 ORDER GRANTING #353 Electric Boat Corporation's Motion to Dismiss. Signed by Judge William S. Stickman on 11/26/19. (eca)
November 22, 2019 Filing 433 RESPONSE IN OPPOSITION to #356 Motion to Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction, filed by CARL E. GAY. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A) (Shipp, Jason)
November 22, 2019 Filing 432 BRIEF in Support re #431 Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction filed by ALFA LAVAL, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Proposed Order) (Lowery, Katherine)
November 22, 2019 Filing 431 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction by ALFA LAVAL, INC.. (Lowery, Katherine)
November 22, 2019 Filing 430 NOTICE of No Opposition by CARL E. GAY re #353 Motion to Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction (Shipp, Jason)
November 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 429 ORDER GRANTING #428 Motion to Voluntarily Dismiss Defendants Florida Power & Light Company and Nextera Energy, Inc. only. Signed by Judge William S. Stickman on 11/22/19. (eca)
November 21, 2019 Filing 428 MOTION to Dismiss Voluntarily, Defendants Florida Power & Light Company and Nextera Energy, Inc., only, by CARL E. GAY. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Shipp, Jason)
November 15, 2019 CLERK'S OFFICE QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE re #416 Local Rule 7.1 Certificate. ERROR: Wrong event selected. CORRECTION: Re-docketed as Disclosure Statement. This message is for informational purposes only. (jm)
November 14, 2019 Filing 426 ANSWER, AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES, AND CROSS CLAIMS AGAINST ALL DEFENDANTS ON BEHALF OF STERLING FLUID SYSTEMS (USA) LLC (Lowery, Katherine) Modified text on 11/15/2019. (jjg)
November 14, 2019 Filing 425 Disclosure Statement identifying None as corporate parent or other affiliate,. (Lowery, Katherine)
November 14, 2019 Filing 424 Disclosure Statement identifying None as corporate parent or other affiliate,. (Lowery, Katherine)
November 14, 2019 Filing 423 ANSWER, AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES AND CROSS CLAIMS AGAINST ALL DEFENDANTS ON BEHALF OF FMC CORPORATION (Lowery, Katherine) Modified text on 11/15/2019. (jjg)
November 14, 2019 Filing 422 Disclosure Statement identifying None as corporate parent or other affiliate, by CARVER PUMP COMPANY. (Lowery, Katherine)
November 14, 2019 Filing 421 ANSWER to Complaint Affirmative Defenses, CROSSCLAIM against All Defendants by CARVER PUMP COMPANY. (Lowery, Katherine)
November 14, 2019 Filing 420 ANSWER to Complaint and All Counter-claims filed by Co-Defendants by CAMERON INTERNATIONAL CORPORATION. (Koch, Nicholas)
November 14, 2019 Filing 419 ANSWER, Affirmative Defenses and Cross Claims on behalf of Union Carbide (Lowery, Katherine) Modified text on 11/15/2019. (jjg)
November 14, 2019 Filing 418 Disclosure Statement identifying None as corporate parent or other affiliate,. (Lowery, Katherine)
November 13, 2019 Filing 427 Disclosure Statement identifying None as corporate parent or other affiliate, by J-M MANUFACTURING COMPANY, INC. (jm)
November 13, 2019 Filing 417 ANSWER to Complaint Affirmative Defenses and, CROSSCLAIM against All Defendants by J-M MANUFACTURING COMPANY, INC.. (Schollaert, John)
November 13, 2019 Filing 416 LOCAL RULE 7.1 CERTIFICATE . (Schollaert, John) Document hidden from public view and redocketed at #427 . Modified text on 11/15/2019. (jm)
November 12, 2019 Filing 415 Disclosure Statement identifying Flowserve Corporation as corporate parent or other affiliate,. (Crimarki, Christine)
November 12, 2019 Filing 414 NOTICE of Appearance. (Crimarki, Christine)
November 11, 2019 Filing 413 NOTICE of Appearance by Stephen R. Mlinac, Esq. on behalf of CRANE CO. (Mlinac, Stephen) Modified text on 11/12/2019. (jjg)
November 11, 2019 Filing 412 NOTICE of Appearance by Ryan Anthony Zeli on behalf of CHICAGO PNEUMATIC TOOL COMPANY, LLC. (Zeli, Ryan)
November 11, 2019 Filing 411 Disclosure Statement identifying Chicago Pneumatic Tool Company LLC is a private non-governmental Delaware limited liability company. The sole member of Chicago Pneumatic Tool Company LLC is Atlas Copco North America LLC, a Delaware limited liability company. The sole member of Atlas Copco North America LLC is Atlas Copco USA Holdings Inc., a Delaware corporation. The sole voting shareholder of Atlas Copco USA Holdings Inc. is Atlas Copco AB, a company organized under the laws of the Kingdom of Sweden. Atlas Copco AB is publicly traded on the Stockholm stock exchange, and American Depository Receipts are offered in Over the Counter Market in the United States. No other publicly held corporation or other publicly held entity has a direct financial interest in the outcome of this litigation. as corporate parent or other affiliate, by CHICAGO PNEUMATIC TOOL COMPANY, LLC. (Mangino, Joni)
November 11, 2019 Filing 410 Chicago Pneumatic Tool Company LLC's ANSWER to Complaint Affirmative Defenses, CROSSCLAIM To Plaintiff's Complaint in Civil Action against All Defendants by CHICAGO PNEUMATIC TOOL COMPANY, LLC. (Mangino, Joni)
November 11, 2019 Filing 409 NOTICE of Appearance by Joni M. Mangino on behalf of CHICAGO PNEUMATIC TOOL COMPANY, LLC. (Mangino, Joni)
November 8, 2019 Filing 408 ANSWER TO CROSS-CLAIMS by FIRSTENERGY CORPORATION. (Sullivan, K.) Modified text on 11/12/2019. (jjg)
November 8, 2019 Filing 407 ANSWER to Complaint and Affirmative Defenses, CROSSCLAIM against All Defendants by ATWOOD & MORRILL CO., INC.. (Krauth, Daniel)
November 8, 2019 Filing 406 Disclosure Statement identifying None as corporate parent or other affiliate,. (Vey, Paul)
November 8, 2019 Filing 405 ANSWER to Complaint and Affirmative Defenses, CROSSCLAIM against All Defendants by EICHLEAY CORPORATION. (Krauth, Daniel)
November 8, 2019 Filing 404 Stipulation for Extension of Time to Answer by ALFA LAVAL, INC. Answer due 11/22/19 from ALFA LAVAL, INC.. (Lowery, Katherine) Modified text on 11/12/2019. (jjg)
November 6, 2019 Filing 403 Disclosure Statement identifying None as corporate parent or other affiliate, by PARKER-HANIFIN CORPORATION. (Hogan, Robert)
November 6, 2019 Filing 402 Disclosure Statement identifying None as corporate parent or other affiliate, by HAJOCA CORPORATION. (Hogan, Robert)
November 6, 2019 Filing 401 ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) , Affirmative Defenses, CROSSCLAIM and Reply to Cross-Claims against All Defendants by FOSECO, INC.. (Schrock, Terry)
November 6, 2019 Filing 400 Disclosure Statement identifying McWane, Inc as corporate parent or other affiliate,. (Margolin, Erin)
November 5, 2019 Filing 399 Disclosure Statement identifying None as corporate parent or other affiliate,. (Hogan, Robert)
November 5, 2019 Filing 398 ANSWER to Complaint , Answer to All Crossclaims, CROSSCLAIM against All Defendants by HONEYWELL INTERNATIONAL INC.(f/k/a Allied Signal, Inc., as successor-in-interest to the Bendix Corporation). (Hogan, Robert)
November 5, 2019 Filing 397 Disclosure Statement identifying None as corporate parent or other affiliate, by THE GOODYEAR TIRE & RUBBER COMPANY. (Hogan, Robert)
November 5, 2019 Filing 396 Disclosure Statement identifying None as corporate parent or other affiliate, filed by FLUOR CORPORATION. (Petrina, Joseph)
November 5, 2019 Filing 395 ANSWER to Complaint , Affirmative Defenses, Answer to Crossclaims, CROSSCLAIM against All Defendants by THE GOODYEAR TIRE & RUBBER COMPANY. (Hogan, Robert)
November 5, 2019 Filing 394 NOTICE of Appearance. (Petrina, Joseph)
November 5, 2019 Filing 393 Disclosure Statement identifying None as corporate parent or other affiliate,. (Petrina, Joseph)
November 5, 2019 Filing 392 NOTICE of Appearance. (Petrina, Joseph)
November 5, 2019 Filing 391 Disclosure Statement identifying None as corporate parent or other affiliate,. (Petrina, Joseph)
November 5, 2019 Filing 390 NOTICE of Appearance on behalf of FLUOR CORPORATION. (Petrina, Joseph)
November 5, 2019 Filing 389 Disclosure Statement identifying None as corporate parent or other affiliate, by POWERMASTER PACIFIC PRODUCTS. (Hogan, Robert)
November 5, 2019 Filing 388 ANSWER to Complaint , Answer to All Crossclaims, CROSSCLAIM against All Defendants by POWERMASTER PACIFIC PRODUCTS. (Hogan, Robert)
November 5, 2019 Filing 387 ANSWER to Complaint , Answer to All Crossclaims, CROSSCLAIM against All Defendants by HAJOCA CORPORATION. (Hogan, Robert)
November 5, 2019 Filing 386 ANSWER to Complaint , Answer to All Crossclaims, CROSSCLAIM against All Defendants by PARKER-HANIFIN CORPORATION. (Hogan, Robert)
November 5, 2019 Filing 385 ANSWER to Complaint , Answer to All Crossclaims, CROSSCLAIM against All Defendants by IMO INDUSTRIES, INC. (Hogan, Robert)
November 5, 2019 Filing 384 Disclosure Statement identifying Babcock Power Inc. as corporate parent or other affiliate, by RILEY POWER, INC.. (Hogan, Robert)
November 5, 2019 Filing 383 ANSWER to Complaint , Answer to All Crossclaims, CROSSCLAIM against All Defendants by RILEY POWER, INC.. (Hogan, Robert)
November 5, 2019 Filing 382 Disclosure Statement identifying Colfax Corporation, Colfax Fluid Handling LLC, IMO Holdings, Inc. as corporate parent or other affiliate,. (Hogan, Robert)
November 5, 2019 Filing 381 ANSWER to Complaint , CROSSCLAIM against All Defendants by BROWN BOVERI, INC.. (Huetter, Glenn)
November 5, 2019 Filing 380 ANSWER to Complaint , CROSSCLAIM against All Defendants by ALLIED GLOVE CORPORATION. (Huetter, Glenn)
November 5, 2019 Filing 379 ANSWER to Complaint , CROSSCLAIM against All Defendants by MCMASTER-CARR SUPPLY CO. (Huetter, Glenn)
November 5, 2019 Filing 378 ANSWER to Complaint , CROSSCLAIM against All Defendants by MCNEIL (OHIO) CORPORATION. (Huetter, Glenn)
November 5, 2019 Filing 377 ANSWER to Complaint , CROSSCLAIM against All Defendants by WT/HRC CORPORATION. (Huetter, Glenn)
November 4, 2019 Filing 376 NOTICE of Appearance. (Leety, James)
November 4, 2019 Filing 375 NOTICE of Appearance. (Leety, James)
November 4, 2019 Filing 374 NOTICE of Appearance. (Leety, James)
November 4, 2019 Filing 373 NOTICE of Appearance by James M. Leety on behalf of CARVER PUMP COMPANY. (Leety, James)
November 4, 2019 Filing 372 NOTICE of Appearance by James M. Leety on behalf of ALFA LAVAL, INC.. (Leety, James)
November 4, 2019 Filing 371 Disclosure Statement identifying None as corporate parent or other affiliate,. (Richert, Ronald)
November 4, 2019 Filing 370 Disclosure Statement identifying None as corporate parent or other affiliate,. (Richert, Ronald)
November 4, 2019 Filing 369 Disclosure Statement identifying None as corporate parent or other affiliate,. (Richert, Ronald)
November 4, 2019 Filing 368 ANSWER to Complaint , CROSSCLAIM against All Plaintiffs by SUNDYNE, LLC. (Richert, Ronald)
November 4, 2019 Filing 367 ANSWER to Complaint , CROSSCLAIM against All Plaintiffs by POWER PIPING COMPANY. (Richert, Ronald)
November 4, 2019 Filing 366 ANSWER to Complaint , CROSSCLAIM against All Plaintiffs by MOYNO, INC.. (Richert, Ronald)
November 4, 2019 Filing 365 ANSWER to Complaint , CROSSCLAIM against All Plaintiffs by BMI REFRACTORY SERVICES, INC.. (Richert, Ronald)
November 4, 2019 Filing 364 NOTICE of Appearance. (Boehme, Sarah)
November 4, 2019 Filing 363 NOTICE of Appearance by Mallory P. Gold on behalf of EICHLEAY CORPORATION. (Gold, Mallory)
November 4, 2019 Filing 362 NOTICE of Appearance by Mallory P. Gold on behalf of ATWOOD & MORRILL CO., INC.. (Gold, Mallory)
November 4, 2019 Filing 361 ANSWER to Complaint by SURFACE COMBUSTION, INC. (Malone, Patrick)
November 1, 2019 Filing 360 Siemens Industries, Inc. ANSWER to Complaint and Affirmative Defenses, CROSSCLAIM against All Defendants by SIEMENS INDUSTRY INC. (Insco, James)
November 1, 2019 Filing 359 LOCAL RULE 7.1 CERTIFICATE Siemens Industry, Inc.. (Insco, James)
November 1, 2019 Filing 358 LOCAL RULE 7.1 CERTIFICATE on behalf of General Dynamics Corporation. (Insco, James)
November 1, 2019 Filing 357 LOCAL RULE 7.1 CERTIFICATE on behalf of Electric Boat Corporation. (Insco, James)
November 1, 2019 Filing 356 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction on behalf of General Dynamics Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Brief, #2 Exhibit, #3 Proposed Order) (Insco, James)
November 1, 2019 Filing 355 LOCAL RULE 7.1 CERTIFICATE by WATTS REGULATOR CO. . (Insco, James)
November 1, 2019 Filing 354 ANSWER to Complaint Affirmative Defenses, CROSSCLAIM against All Defendants by WATTS REGULATOR CO.. (Insco, James)
November 1, 2019 Filing 353 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction by ELECTRIC BOAT CORPORATION. (Attachments: #1 Brief, #2 Proposed Order) (Insco, James)
November 1, 2019 Filing 352 ANSWER to Complaint , Affirmative Defenses,, CROSSCLAIM and Answer and Affirmative Defenses to Cross Claims against All Defendants by MANCHESTER TANK. (Margolin, Erin)
November 1, 2019 Filing 351 NOTICE of Appearance by Erin Margolin on behalf of MANCHESTER TANK. (Margolin, Erin)
November 1, 2019 Filing 350 NOTICE of Appearance by Patrick Reilly on behalf of MANCHESTER TANK. (Reilly, Patrick)
November 1, 2019 Filing 349 ANSWER to #53 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim, #61 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim, #346 Answer to Complaint,, Crossclaim, #85 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim, #289 Answer to Complaint (Notice of Removal), Crossclaim, #39 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim, #261 Answer to Complaint,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, Crossclaim,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, #99 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim, #125 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim, #71 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim, #189 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim, #163 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim, #24 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim, #224 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim, #278 Answer to Complaint (Notice of Removal), Crossclaim, #93 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim, #52 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim, #60 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim, #109 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim, #26 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim, #55 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim, #90 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim, #267 Answer to Complaint (Notice of Removal), Crossclaim, #259 Answer to Complaint,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, Crossclaim,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, #79 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim, #338 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim, #87 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim, #45 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim, #73 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim, #51 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim, #107 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim, #270 Answer to Complaint (Notice of Removal), Crossclaim, #70 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim, #97 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim, #46 Answer to Complaint (Notice of Removal), Crossclaim, #105 Answer to Complaint (Notice of Removal), Crossclaim, #138 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim, #262 Answer to Complaint,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, Crossclaim,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, #240 Answer to Complaint (Notice of Removal), Crossclaim , ANSWER to #53 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim, #61 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim, #346 Answer to Complaint,, Crossclaim, #85 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim, #289 Answer to Complaint (Notice of Removal), Crossclaim, #39 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim, #261 Answer to Complaint,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, Crossclaim,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, #99 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim, #125 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim, #71 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim, #189 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim, #163 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim, #24 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim, #224 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim, #278 Answer to Complaint (Notice of Removal), Crossclaim, #93 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim, #52 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim, #60 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim, #109 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim, #26 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim, #55 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim, #90 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim, #267 Answer to Complaint (Notice of Removal), Crossclaim, #259 Answer to Complaint,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, Crossclaim,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, #79 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim, #338 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim, #87 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim, #45 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim, #73 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim, #51 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim, #107 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim, #270 Answer to Complaint (Notice of Removal), Crossclaim, #70 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim, #97 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim, #46 Answer to Complaint (Notice of Removal), Crossclaim, #105 Answer to Complaint (Notice of Removal), Crossclaim, #138 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim, #262 Answer to Complaint,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, Crossclaim,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, #240 Answer to Complaint (Notice of Removal), Crossclaim , ANSWER to #53 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim, #61 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim, #346 Answer to Complaint,, Crossclaim, #85 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim, #289 Answer to Complaint (Notice of Removal), Crossclaim, #39 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim, #261 Answer to Complaint,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, Crossclaim,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, #99 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim, #125 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim, #71 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim, #189 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim, #163 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim, #24 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim, #224 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim, #278 Answer to Complaint (Notice of Removal), Crossclaim, #93 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim, #52 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim, #60 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim, #109 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim, #26 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim, #55 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim, #90 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim, #267 Answer to Complaint (Notice of Removal), Crossclaim, #259 Answer to Complaint,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, Crossclaim,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, #79 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim, #338 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim, #87 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim, #45 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim, #73 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim, #51 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim, #107 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim, #270 Answer to Complaint (Notice of Removal), Crossclaim, #70 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim, #97 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim, #46 Answer to Complaint (Notice of Removal), Crossclaim, #105 Answer to Complaint (Notice of Removal), Crossclaim, #138 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim, #262 Answer to Complaint,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, Crossclaim,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, #240 Answer to Complaint (Notice of Removal), Crossclaim , ANSWER to #53 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim, #61 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim, #346 Answer to Complaint,, Crossclaim, #85 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim, #289 Answer to Complaint (Notice of Removal), Crossclaim, #39 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim, #261 Answer to Complaint,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, Crossclaim,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, #99 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim, #125 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim, #71 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim, #189 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim, #163 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim, #24 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim, #224 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim, #278 Answer to Complaint (Notice of Removal), Crossclaim, #93 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim, #52 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim, #60 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim, #109 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim, #26 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim, #55 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim, #90 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim, #267 Answer to Complaint (Notice of Removal), Crossclaim, #259 Answer to Complaint,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, Crossclaim,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, #79 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim, #338 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim, #87 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim, #45 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim, #73 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim, #51 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim, #107 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim, #270 Answer to Complaint (Notice of Removal), Crossclaim, #70 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim, #97 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim, #46 Answer to Complaint (Notice of Removal), Crossclaim, #105 Answer to Complaint (Notice of Removal), Crossclaim, #138 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim, #262 Answer to Complaint,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, Crossclaim,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, #240 Answer to Complaint (Notice of Removal), Crossclaim , ANSWER to #53 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim, #61 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim, #346 Answer to Complaint,, Crossclaim, #85 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim, #289 Answer to Complaint (Notice of Removal), Crossclaim, #39 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim, #261 Answer to Complaint,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, Crossclaim,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, #99 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim, #125 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim, #71 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim, #189 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim, #163 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim, #24 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim, #224 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim, #278 Answer to Complaint (Notice of Removal), Crossclaim, #93 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim, #52 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim, #60 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim, #109 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim, #26 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim, #55 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim, #90 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim, #267 Answer to Complaint (Notice of Removal), Crossclaim, #259 Answer to Complaint,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, Crossclaim,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, #79 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim, #338 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim, #87 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim, #45 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim, #73 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim, #51 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim, #107 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim, #270 Answer to Complaint (Notice of Removal), Crossclaim, #70 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim, #97 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim, #46 Answer to Complaint (Notice of Removal), Crossclaim, #105 Answer to Complaint (Notice of Removal), Crossclaim, #138 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim, #262 Answer to Complaint,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, Crossclaim,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, #240 Answer to Complaint (Notice of Removal), Crossclaim , ANSWER to #53 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim, #61 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim, #346 Answer to Complaint,, Crossclaim, #85 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim, #289 Answer to Complaint (Notice of Removal), Crossclaim, #39 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim, #261 Answer to Complaint,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, Crossclaim,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, #99 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim, #125 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim, #71 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim, #189 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim, #163 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim, #24 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim, #224 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim, #278 Answer to Complaint (Notice of Removal), Crossclaim, #93 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim, #52 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim, #60 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim, #109 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim, #26 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim, #55 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim, #90 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim, #267 Answer to Complaint (Notice of Removal), Crossclaim, #259 Answer to Complaint,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, Crossclaim,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, #79 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim, #338 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim, #87 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim, #45 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim, #73 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim, #51 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim, #107 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim, #270 Answer to Complaint (Notice of Removal), Crossclaim, #70 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim, #97
November 1, 2019 Filing 348 NOTICE of Appearance by Samantha Quinn on behalf of EICHLEAY CORPORATION. (Quinn, Samantha)
November 1, 2019 Filing 347 NOTICE of Appearance by Samantha Quinn on behalf of ATWOOD & MORRILL CO., INC.. (Quinn, Samantha)
November 1, 2019 Filing 346 Minnotte Contracting Corporation's ANSWER to Complaint Affirmative Defenses, CROSSCLAIM and Answer to CrossClaims to Plaintiff's Complaint against All Defendants by MINNOTTE CONTRACTING CORPORATION. (Mangino, Joni)
November 1, 2019 Filing 345 Donald McKay Smith, Inc.'s ANSWER to Complaint Affirmative Defenses, CROSSCLAIM and Answer to CrossClaims to Plaintiff's Complaint against All Defendants by DONALD MCKAY SMITH, INC.. (Mangino, Joni)
November 1, 2019 Filing 344 Morgan Engineering System, Inc.'s ANSWER to Complaint Affirmative Defenses, CROSSCLAIM and Answer to CrossClaims to Plaintiff's Complaint against All Defendants by MORGAN ENGINEERING SYSTEMS, INC.. (Mangino, Joni)
November 1, 2019 Filing 343 Disclosure Statement identifying None as corporate parent or other affiliate, by MORGAN ENGINEERING SYSTEMS, INC.. (Mangino, Joni)
November 1, 2019 Filing 342 NOTICE of Appearance by Joni M. Mangino on behalf of MORGAN ENGINEERING SYSTEMS, INC.. (Mangino, Joni)
November 1, 2019 Filing 341 Insul Company, Inc.'s ANSWER to Complaint Affirmative Defenses, CROSSCLAIM To Plaintiff's Complaint in Civil Action against All Defendants by INSUL COMPANY, INC.. (Mangino, Joni)
November 1, 2019 Filing 340 Disclosure Statement identifying None as corporate parent or other affiliate, by INSUL COMPANY, INC.. (Mangino, Joni)
November 1, 2019 Filing 339 NOTICE of Appearance by Joni M. Mangino on behalf of INSUL COMPANY, INC.. (Mangino, Joni)
November 1, 2019 Filing 338 M.S. Jacobs & Associates, Inc.'s ANSWER to Complaint Affirmative Defenses, CROSSCLAIM and Answer to Cross Claims to Plaintiff's Complaint against All Defendants by M.S. JACOBS & ASSOCIATES, INC.. (Mangino, Joni)
November 1, 2019 Filing 337 Disclosure Statement identifying None as corporate parent or other affiliate, by M.S. JACOBS & ASSOCIATES, INC.. (Mangino, Joni)
November 1, 2019 Filing 336 NOTICE of Appearance by Joni M. Mangino on behalf of M.S. JACOBS & ASSOCIATES, INC.. (Mangino, Joni)
November 1, 2019 Filing 335 MRC Global (US) Inc. (Formerly Known As McJunkin Red Man Corporation's) ANSWER to Complaint Affirmative Defenses, CROSSCLAIM and Answer to CrossClaims to Plaintiff's Complaint against All Defendants by MCJUNKIN REDMAN CORPORATION. (Mangino, Joni)
November 1, 2019 Filing 334 Disclosure Statement identifying MRC Global Inc. as corporate parent or other affiliate,. (Mangino, Joni)
November 1, 2019 Filing 333 Affirmative Defenses ANSWER to Complaint , CROSSCLAIM against JOHN CRANE, INC. by JOHN CRANE, INC. (Schenck, Edward)
November 1, 2019 Filing 332 NOTICE of Appearance. (Mangino, Joni)
October 31, 2019 Filing 331 NOTICE of Appearance by Andrew F. Adomitis on behalf of OSRAM SYLVANIA INC.(in its own right and as successor-in-interest to GTE Products Corporation, The Clark Controller Company and A.O. Smith Corporation ). (Adomitis, Andrew)
October 31, 2019 Filing 330 NOTICE of Appearance by Andrew F. Adomitis on behalf of OCEAN VIEW CAPITAL. (Adomitis, Andrew)
October 31, 2019 Filing 329 NOTICE of Appearance by Andrew F. Adomitis on behalf of MUELLER STEAM SPECIALTY. (Adomitis, Andrew)
October 31, 2019 Filing 328 NOTICE of Appearance by Andrew F. Adomitis on behalf of CLYDE UNION, INC.(d/b/a Clyde Unioin Pumps, individually and as successor-by-merger to Union Pump Company). (Adomitis, Andrew)
October 31, 2019 Filing 327 NOTICE of Appearance by Andrew F. Adomitis on behalf of CLEAVER-BROOKS. (Adomitis, Andrew)
October 31, 2019 Filing 326 NOTICE of Appearance by Andrew F. Adomitis on behalf of A.O. SMITH CORPORATION. (Adomitis, Andrew)
October 31, 2019 Filing 325 NOTICE of Appearance by Leo G. Daly on behalf of OSRAM SYLVANIA INC.(in its own right and as successor-in-interest to GTE Products Corporation, The Clark Controller Company and A.O. Smith Corporation ). (Daly, Leo)
October 31, 2019 Filing 324 NOTICE of Appearance by Leo G. Daly on behalf of OCEAN VIEW CAPITAL. (Daly, Leo)
October 31, 2019 Filing 323 NOTICE of Appearance by Leo G. Daly on behalf of MUELLER STEAM SPECIALTY. (Daly, Leo)
October 31, 2019 Filing 322 NOTICE of Appearance by Leo G. Daly on behalf of CLYDE UNION, INC.(d/b/a Clyde Unioin Pumps, individually and as successor-by-merger to Union Pump Company). (Daly, Leo)
October 31, 2019 Filing 321 NOTICE of Appearance by Leo G. Daly on behalf of CLEAVER-BROOKS. (Daly, Leo)
October 31, 2019 Filing 320 NOTICE of Appearance by Leo G. Daly on behalf of A.O. SMITH CORPORATION. (Daly, Leo)
October 31, 2019 Filing 319 Disclosure Statement identifying Watts Water Technologies, Inc. as corporate parent or other affiliate, by MUELLER STEAM SPECIALTY. (Lamperski, Vincent)
October 31, 2019 Filing 318 ANSWER to Complaint AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES, CROSSCLAIMS AND ANSWER TO CROSSCLAIMS against all defendants by MUELLER STEAM SPECIALTY. (Lamperski, Vincent)
October 31, 2019 Filing 317 NOTICE of Appearance by Vincent P. Lamperski on behalf of MUELLER STEAM SPECIALTY. (Lamperski, Vincent)
October 31, 2019 Filing 316 Disclosure Statement identifying Clyde Union (US), Inc. as corporate parent or other affiliate, by CLYDE UNION, INC.(d/b/a Clyde Unioin Pumps, individually and as successor-by-merger to Union Pump Company). (Lamperski, Vincent)
October 31, 2019 Filing 315 ANSWER to Complaint AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES, CROSSCLAIMS AND ANSWER TO CROSSCLAIMS against all defendants by CLYDE UNION, INC.(d/b/a Clyde Unioin Pumps, individually and as successor-by-merger to Union Pump Company). (Lamperski, Vincent)
October 31, 2019 Filing 314 NOTICE of Appearance by Vincent P. Lamperski on behalf of CLYDE UNION, INC.(d/b/a Clyde Unioin Pumps, individually and as successor-by-merger to Union Pump Company). (Lamperski, Vincent)
October 31, 2019 Filing 313 Disclosure Statement identifying Cleaver-Holdings, Inc. as corporate parent or other affiliate, by CLEAVER-BROOKS. (Lamperski, Vincent)
October 31, 2019 Filing 312 ANSWER to Complaint AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES, CROSSCLAIMS AND ANSWER TO CROSSCLAIMS against all defendants by CLEAVER-BROOKS. (Lamperski, Vincent)
October 31, 2019 Filing 311 NOTICE of Appearance by Vincent P. Lamperski on behalf of CLEAVER-BROOKS. (Lamperski, Vincent)
October 31, 2019 Filing 310 Disclosure Statement identifying OSRAM GmbH, OSRAM Licht AG, OSRAM Beteiligungen GmbH as corporate parent or other affiliate, by OSRAM SYLVANIA INC. (in its own right and as successor-in-interest to GTE Products Corporation, The Clark Controller Company and A.O. Smith Corporation). (Lamperski, Vincent) Modified text on 11/4/2019. (ma)
October 31, 2019 Filing 309 ANSWER to Complaint AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES, CROSSCLAIMS AND ANSWER TO CROSSCLAIMS against all defendants by OSRAM SYLVANIA INC. (in its own right and as successor-in-interest to GTE Products Corporation, The Clark Controller Company and A.O. Smith Corporation). (Lamperski, Vincent)
October 31, 2019 Filing 308 NOTICE of Appearance by Vincent P. Lamperski on behalf of OSRAM SYLVANIA INC. (in its own right and as successor-in-interest to GTE Products Corporation, The Clark Controller Company and A.O. Smith Corporation). (Lamperski, Vincent)
October 31, 2019 Filing 307 ANSWER to Complaint AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES, CROSSCLAIMS AND ANSWER TO CROSSCLAIMS against all defendants by OCEAN VIEW CAPITAL. (Lamperski, Vincent)
October 31, 2019 Filing 306 NOTICE of Appearance by Vincent P. Lamperski on behalf of OCEAN VIEW CAPITAL. (Lamperski, Vincent)
October 31, 2019 Filing 305 Disclosure Statement identifying None as corporate parent or other affiliate, by A.O. SMITH CORPORATION. (Lamperski, Vincent)
October 31, 2019 Filing 304 ANSWER to Complaint AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES, CROSSCLAIMS AND ANSWER TO CROSSCLAIMS against all defendants by A.O. SMITH CORPORATION. (Lamperski, Vincent)
October 31, 2019 Filing 303 NOTICE of Appearance by Vincent P. Lamperski on behalf of A.O. SMITH CORPORATION. (Lamperski, Vincent) Modified text on 11/4/2019. (ma)
October 31, 2019 Filing 302 ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) , Answers to Cross-Claims, and CROSSCLAIM against All Defendants by CERTAINTEED CORPORATION. (Watson, Jennifer)
October 31, 2019 Filing 301 Disclosure Statement identifying DBMP LLC, a North Carolina limited liability company. Compagnie de Saint-Gobain as corporate parent or other affiliate,. (Watson, Jennifer)
October 31, 2019 Filing 300 NOTICE of Appearance by Jennifer E. Watson. (Watson, Jennifer)
October 31, 2019 Filing 299 Disclosure Statement identifying None as corporate parent or other affiliate of RCH NEWCO II, LLC. (Watson, Jennifer) Modified text on 11/1/2019. (ma)
October 31, 2019 Filing 298 Disclosure Statement identifying Saint-Gobain Delaware Corporation as corporate parent or other affiliate,. (Watson, Jennifer)
October 31, 2019 Filing 297 Disclosure Statement identifying None as corporate parent or other affiliate,. (Watson, Jennifer)
October 31, 2019 Filing 296 Disclosure Statement identifying None as corporate parent or other affiliate,. (Watson, Jennifer)
October 31, 2019 Filing 295 Disclosure Statement identifying None as corporate parent or other affiliate,. (Watson, Jennifer)
October 31, 2019 Filing 294 Disclosure Statement identifying Exelon Corporation,xelon Generation Company, LLC, Commonwealth Edison Company, PECO Energy Company, Baltimore Gas and Electric Company, Pepco Holdings LLC, Atlantic City Electric Company, Delmarva Power & Light Company, and Potomac Electric Power Company as corporate parent or other affiliate, by EXELON NUCLEAR PARTNERS, LLC. (Watson, Jennifer)
October 31, 2019 Filing 293 Disclosure Statement identifying Exelon Corporation, Commonwealth Edison Company, PECO Energy Company, Baltimore Gas and Electric Company, Pepco Holdings LLC, Atlantic City Electric Company, Delmarva Power & Light Company, and Potomac Electric Power Company as corporate parent or other affiliate,. (Watson, Jennifer)
October 31, 2019 Filing 292 ANSWER to Complaint Affirmative Defenses, CROSSCLAIM and Answer and Affirmative Defenses to Cross Claims against All Defendants by CASHCO INC.. (Margolin, Erin)
October 31, 2019 Filing 291 NOTICE of Appearance by Erin Margolin on behalf of CASHCO INC.. (Margolin, Erin)
October 31, 2019 Filing 290 Disclosure Statement identifying IDEX Corporation, and BlackRock Inc. as corporate parent or other affiliate,. (Watson, Jennifer)
October 31, 2019 Filing 289 ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) , Answers to Cross-Claims, and CROSSCLAIM against All Defendants by EXELON GENERATION COMPANY, LLC. (Watson, Jennifer)
October 31, 2019 Filing 288 Disclosure Statement identifying None as corporate parent or other affiliate, by CASHCO INC.. (Karaffa, Michael)
October 31, 2019 Filing 287 NOTICE of Appearance by Michael A. Karaffa on behalf of CASHCO INC.. (Karaffa, Michael)
October 31, 2019 Filing 286 ANSWER to Complaint Affirmative Defenses, CROSSCLAIM and Answer and Affirmative Defenses to Cross Claims against All Defendants by CLARK EQUIPMENT COMPANY. (Margolin, Erin)
October 31, 2019 Filing 285 Disclosure Statement identifying Exelon Generation Company, LLC, Commonwealth Edison Company, PECO Energy Company, Baltimore Gas and Electric Company, Pepco Holdings LLC, Atlantic City Electric Company, Delmarva Power & Light Company, and Potomac Electric Power Company as corporate parent or other affiliate,. (Watson, Jennifer)
October 31, 2019 Filing 284 Disclosure Statement identifying None as corporate parent or other affiliate, by AECOM ENERGY & CONSTRUCTION, INC.. (Watson, Jennifer)
October 31, 2019 Filing 283 Disclosure Statement identifying Doosan Bobcat Inc as corporate parent or other affiliate, BY CLARK EQUIPMENT COMPANY. (Margolin, Erin) Modified text on 11/6/2019. (jd)
October 31, 2019 Filing 282 ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) , Answers to Cross-Claims, and CROSSCLAIM against All Defendants by EXELON NUCLEAR PARTNERS, LLC. (Watson, Jennifer)
October 31, 2019 Filing 281 NOTICE of Appearance. (Margolin, Erin)
October 31, 2019 Filing 280 ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) , Answers to Cross-Claims, and CROSSCLAIM against All Defendants by I.U. NORTH AMERICA, INC.. (Watson, Jennifer)
October 31, 2019 Filing 279 NOTICE of Appearance by Patrick Reilly on behalf of CLARK EQUIPMENT COMPANY. (Reilly, Patrick)
October 31, 2019 Filing 278 ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) , Answers to Cross-Claims, and CROSSCLAIM against All Defendants by MILWAUKEE VALVE COMPANY. (Watson, Jennifer)
October 31, 2019 Filing 277 ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) , Answers to Cross-Claims, and CROSSCLAIM against All Defendants by SAINT-GOBAIN ABRASIVES, INC.. (Watson, Jennifer)
October 31, 2019 Filing 276 ANSWER to Complaint Affirmative Defenses, CROSSCLAIM and Answer and Affirmtive Defenses to Cross Claims against All Defendants by MW CUSTOM PAPERS, LLC. (Margolin, Erin)
October 31, 2019 Filing 275 ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) , Answers to Cross-Claims, and CROSSCLAIM against All Defendants by VIKING PUMP, INC.. (Watson, Jennifer)
October 31, 2019 Filing 274 Disclosure Statement identifying None as corporate parent or other affiliate, by MW CUSTOM PAPERS, LLC. (Margolin, Erin)
October 31, 2019 Filing 273 NOTICE of Appearance. (Margolin, Erin)
October 31, 2019 Filing 272 NOTICE of Appearance. (Reilly, Patrick)
October 31, 2019 Filing 271 Disclosure Statement identifying Ampco- Pittsburgh Corporation as corporate parent or other affiliate,. (Watson, Jennifer)
October 31, 2019 Filing 270 ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) , Answers to Cross-Claims, and CROSSCLAIM against All Defendants by MCCARLS, INC.. (Watson, Jennifer)
October 31, 2019 Filing 269 ANSWER to Complaint , Answers to Cross-Claims, and CROSSCLAIM against All Defendants by RCH NEW CO., II LLC. (Watson, Jennifer)
October 31, 2019 Filing 268 ANSWER to Complaint , Answers to Cross-Claims, and CROSSCLAIM against All Defendants by EXELON CORPORATION. (Watson, Jennifer)
October 31, 2019 Filing 267 ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) , Answers to Cross-Claims, and CROSSCLAIM against All Defendants by AECOM ENERGY & CONSTRUCTION, INC.. (Watson, Jennifer)
October 31, 2019 Filing 266 ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) Answers to Cross-Claims, and CROSSCLAIM against All Defendants by AIR & LIQUID SYSTEMS CORPORATION. (Watson, Jennifer)
October 31, 2019 Filing 265 ANSWER to Complaint Affirmative Defenses, CROSSCLAIM against All Defendants by RESEARCH-COTTRELL, INC.. (Orszulak, Joseph)
October 31, 2019 Filing 264 Disclosure Statement identifying None as corporate parent or other affiliate, by WATSON MCDANIEL COMPANY. (McGee, Kyle)
October 31, 2019 Filing 263 Disclosure Statement identifying None as corporate parent or other affiliate, by CEMLINE CORPORATION. (McGee, Kyle)
October 31, 2019 Filing 262 ANSWER to Complaint Affirmative Defenses, Cross-claims and Answer and Affirmative Defenses to Cross-Claims By Co-Defendants, CROSSCLAIM against ABB, INC.(as successor to Brown Boveri (Individually and as successor-in-interest to ITE IMPERIAL CO f/k/a ITE CIRCUIT BREAKER COMPANY)), AHLSTROM PUMPS LLC, AIR & LIQUID SYSTEMS CORPORATION(successor-by-merger to Buffalo Pumps, Inc.), AIRTEK, INC., AJAX MAGNETHERMIC CORPORATION, ALFA LAVAL, INC., ALLIED GLOVE CORPORATION, AMERON INTERNATIONAL CORPORATION, AMETEK, INC., ARMSTRONG INTERNATIONAL, INC., A.O. SMITH CORPORATION, A.R. WILFLEY & SONS, INC., ARMSTRONG PUMPS, INC., ATWOOD & MORRILL CO., INC., AURORA PUMP, BAKER HUGHES(a GE Company, LLC), BEAZER EAST, INC(in its own right and as successor to Koppers Co., Inc., and other related companies, including Thiem Corporation, Beazer USA, Inc., and Beazer, PLC), BECHTEL CORPORATION, BLUE M CORPORATION, BMI REFRACTORY SERVICES, INC., BORGWARNER MORSE TEC LLC, BRAND INSULATIONS, INC., BW/IP, INC., CAMERON INTERNATIONAL CORPORATION, CARRIER CORPORATION, CARVER PUMP COMPANY, CASHCO INC., CBS CORPORATION(f/k/a Viacom, Inc., as Successor by Merger to CBS Corp., a Pennsylvania corporation, f/k/a Westinghouse Electric Corporation), CERTAINTEED CORPORATION, CHICAGO BRIDGE & IRON COMPANY, CHICAGO PNEUMATIC TOOL COMPANY, LLC, CLARK EQUIPMENT COMPANY, CLARK RELIANCE CORPORATION(and its division Jerguson Gage and Valve), CLEAVER-BROOKS, CLYDE UNION, INC.(d/b/a Clyde Unioin Pumps, individually and as successor-by-merger to Union Pump Company), COLUMBUS MCKINNON CORP.(successor-by-merger to Lift Tech International, Inc., and its Shaw-Box Hoist Division), CRANE COMPANY, INC., DEZURIK, INC., DONALD MCKAY SMITH, INC., DRAVO CORPORATION, DUQUESNE LIGHT COMPANY, EATON CORPORATION(as successor-in-interest to Cutler Hammer, Inc., n/k/a Eaton Electrical Inc.), ECODYNE HEAT EXCHANGERS, INC.((incorrectly named as "Ecodyne Corp.")), EDF, INC., EICHLEAY CORPORATION, ELECTRIC BOAT CORPORATION, ELECTROLUX HOME PRODUCTS INC., ELLIOTT COMPANY, EVOQUA WATER TECHNOLOGIES, LLC(in its own right and as successor-in-interest to Wallace & Tiernan), EXELON CORPORATION, EXELON GENERATION COMPANY, LLC, EXELON NUCLEAR PARTNERS, LLC, FIRSTENERGY CORPORATION, FLORIDA POWER & LIGHT COMPANY, FLOWSERVE CORPORATION, FLOWSERVE US, INC.(f/k/a Flowserve FSD Corp., successor to Valtek International), FLOWSERVE US, INC.(solely as successor to Nordstrom Audco Inc., Edward Valves inc., Nordstrom Valves, Inc., and Rockwell Manufacturing Company), FLSMIDTH DORR-OLIVER, INC.(as successor-in-interest to Keller/Dorr-Oliver Boiler Company), FLSMIDTH, INC., FLUOR CONSTRUCTORS INTERNATIONAL, FLUOR CORPORATION, FLUOR ENTERPRISES, INC., FMC CORPORATION, FOSECO, INC., FOSTER WHEELER, LLC, GARDNER DENVER, INC., CARL E. GAY, GENERAL DYNAMICS CORPORATION, GENERAL ELECTRIC COMPANY, GENUINE PARTS COMPANY, GOULD ELECTRONICS INC.(Incorrectly desiganted by Plaintiff as Gould Electronics, Inc., f/k/a GD-TEK, Inc.), GOULD ELECTRONICS, INC., GOULDS PUMPS, LLC, GREENE TWEED & COMPANY, INC., GRINNELL, LLC, HAJOCA CORPORATION, HONEYWELL INTERNATIONAL INC.(f/k/a Allied Signal, Inc., as successor-in-interest to the Bendix Corporation), HONEYWELL, INC., HOWDEN NORTH AMERICA, INC., HUNTER SALES CORPORATION, IMO INDUSTRIES, INC, INDUSTRIAL HOLDINGS CORPORATION, INGERSOLL-RAND CORPORATION, INSUL COMPANY, INC., ITT INDUSTRIES, INC., J-M MANUFACTURING COMPANY, INC., I.U. NORTH AMERICA, INC.(as successor by merger to The Garp Company, formerly known as The Gage Company, formerly known as Pittsburgh Gage and Supply Company), JOHN CRANE, INC., JOHNSON CONTROLS, INC., JOY GLOBAL SURFACE MINING, INC., JOY GLOBAL UNDERGROUND MINING, LLC, KADANT, INC., LINDBERG, LOCKHEED MARTIN CORPORATION, LONG ISLAND POWER AUTHORITY, M.S. JACOBS & ASSOCIATES, INC., MANCHESTER TANK(Division of McWane, Inc.), MARMON HOLDINGS, INC., MCCARLS, INC., MCJUNKIN REDMAN CORPORATION, MCMASTER-CARR SUPPLY CO., MCNEIL (OHIO) CORPORATION, MET-PRO TECHNOLOGIES, LLC(incorrectly named as Met-Pro Corporation and its Dean Pump brand d/b/a Met-Pro Global Pump Solutions), METROPOLITAN LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY, MILWAUKEE VALVE COMPANY, MINE SAFETY APPLIANCE COMPANY, MINNOTTE CONTRACTING CORPORATION, MORGAN ENGINEERING SYSTEMS, INC., MOYNO, INC., MUELLER STEAM SPECIALTY, MW CUSTOM PAPERS, LLC, NAGLE PUMPS, INC., NEXTERA ENERGY, INC., NORTEK GLOBAL HVAC, LLC(as successor by merger to Reznor, LLC (incorrectly named herein; correct naming as follows: Nortek Global HVAC, LLC)), NORTH AMERICAN MANUFACTURING CO., OCEAN VIEW CAPITAL, OSRAM SYLVANIA INC.(in its own right and as successor-in-interest to GTE Products Corporation, The Clark Controller Company and A.O. Smith Corporation ), PARKER-HANIFIN CORPORATION, POWER PIPING COMPANY, POWERMASTER PACIFIC PRODUCTS, RCH NEW CO., II LLC(f/k/a Robertson Ceco Corporation, an alleged successor to H.H. Robertson Company), READING CRANE AND ENGINEERING COMPANY, RESEARCH-COTTRELL, INC.(n/k/a AWT AIR COMPANY, INC., incorrectly identified as Research Cottrell Cooling, Inc., n/k/a AWT Air Company, Inc.), REUNION INDUSTRIES, INC., RILEY POWER, INC., RUST ENGINEERING & CONSTRUCTION, INC., SAINT-GOBAIN ABRASIVES, INC., SCHNEIDER ELECTRIC USA, INC., SIEMENS INDUSTRY, INC.(in its own right, and as successor-in-interest to I-T-E Circuit Breaker Company), SPIRAX SARCO, INC., SPX COOLING TECHNOLOGIES, INC., STERLING FLUID SYSTEMS (USA), LLC, SULZER PUMPS (US), INC., SUNBEAM PRODUCTS, INC.(as success-in-interest to Sunbeam Corporation), SUNDYNE, LLC, SURFACE COMBUSTION, INC., THE GOODYEAR TIRE & RUBBER COMPANY, THE MARLEY-WYLAIN COMPANY, THE MARLEY-WYLAIN COMPANY(incorrectly designated as WEIL-McLAIN COMPANY), THE NASH ENGINEERING COMPANY, THE WILLIAM POWELL COMPANY, TRANE U.S. INC.(f/k/a American Standard Corporation, f/k/a/ American Radiator & Standard Sanitary, in its own right and as successor to Westinghouse Airbrake and/or WABCO), TUTHILL CORPORATION, UNION CARBIDE CORPORATION, UNION TANK CAR COMPANY, UNITED CONVEYOR CORPORATION, UNITED STATES STEEL CORPORATION, VELAN VALVE CORPORATION, VIKING PUMP, INC., WARREN PUMPS, LLC, WATTS REGULATOR CO., WHEELABRATOR AIR POLLUTION CONTROL, INC., WHEELING RUBBER PRODUCTS, INC., WT/HRC CORPORATION, WTI RUST HOLDINGS, INC., YORK INTERNATIONAL CORPORATION, YUBA HEAT TRANSFER, LLC, ZURN INDUSTRIES by WATSON MCDANIEL COMPANY. (McGee, Kyle)
October 31, 2019 Filing 261 ANSWER to Complaint Affirmative Defenses, Cross-claims and Answer and Affirmative Defenses to Cross-Claims By Co-Defendants, CROSSCLAIM against ABB, INC.(as successor to Brown Boveri (Individually and as successor-in-interest to ITE IMPERIAL CO f/k/a ITE CIRCUIT BREAKER COMPANY)), AHLSTROM PUMPS LLC, AIR & LIQUID SYSTEMS CORPORATION(successor-by-merger to Buffalo Pumps, Inc.), AIRTEK, INC., AJAX MAGNETHERMIC CORPORATION, ALFA LAVAL, INC., ALLIED GLOVE CORPORATION, AMERON INTERNATIONAL CORPORATION, AMETEK, INC., ARMSTRONG INTERNATIONAL, INC., A.O. SMITH CORPORATION, A.R. WILFLEY & SONS, INC., ARMSTRONG PUMPS, INC., ATWOOD & MORRILL CO., INC., AURORA PUMP, BAKER HUGHES(a GE Company, LLC), BEAZER EAST, INC(in its own right and as successor to Koppers Co., Inc., and other related companies, including Thiem Corporation, Beazer USA, Inc., and Beazer, PLC), BECHTEL CORPORATION, BLUE M CORPORATION, BMI REFRACTORY SERVICES, INC., BORGWARNER MORSE TEC LLC, BRAND INSULATIONS, INC., BW/IP, INC., CAMERON INTERNATIONAL CORPORATION, CARRIER CORPORATION, CARVER PUMP COMPANY, CASHCO INC., CBS CORPORATION(f/k/a Viacom, Inc., as Successor by Merger to CBS Corp., a Pennsylvania corporation, f/k/a Westinghouse Electric Corporation), CERTAINTEED CORPORATION, CHICAGO BRIDGE & IRON COMPANY, CHICAGO PNEUMATIC TOOL COMPANY, LLC, CLARK EQUIPMENT COMPANY, CLARK RELIANCE CORPORATION(and its division Jerguson Gage and Valve), CLEAVER-BROOKS, CLYDE UNION, INC.(d/b/a Clyde Unioin Pumps, individually and as successor-by-merger to Union Pump Company), COLUMBUS MCKINNON CORP.(successor-by-merger to Lift Tech International, Inc., and its Shaw-Box Hoist Division), CRANE COMPANY, INC., DEZURIK, INC., DONALD MCKAY SMITH, INC., DRAVO CORPORATION, DUQUESNE LIGHT COMPANY, EATON CORPORATION(as successor-in-interest to Cutler Hammer, Inc., n/k/a Eaton Electrical Inc.), ECODYNE HEAT EXCHANGERS, INC.((incorrectly named as "Ecodyne Corp.")), EDF, INC., EICHLEAY CORPORATION, ELECTRIC BOAT CORPORATION, ELECTROLUX HOME PRODUCTS INC., ELLIOTT COMPANY, EVOQUA WATER TECHNOLOGIES, LLC(in its own right and as successor-in-interest to Wallace & Tiernan), EXELON CORPORATION, EXELON GENERATION COMPANY, LLC, EXELON NUCLEAR PARTNERS, LLC, FIRSTENERGY CORPORATION, FLORIDA POWER & LIGHT COMPANY, FLOWSERVE CORPORATION, FLOWSERVE US, INC.(f/k/a Flowserve FSD Corp., successor to Valtek International), FLOWSERVE US, INC.(solely as successor to Nordstrom Audco Inc., Edward Valves inc., Nordstrom Valves, Inc., and Rockwell Manufacturing Company), FLSMIDTH DORR-OLIVER, INC.(as successor-in-interest to Keller/Dorr-Oliver Boiler Company), FLSMIDTH, INC., FLUOR CONSTRUCTORS INTERNATIONAL, FLUOR CORPORATION, FLUOR ENTERPRISES, INC., FMC CORPORATION, FOSECO, INC., FOSTER WHEELER, LLC, GARDNER DENVER, INC., CARL E. GAY, GENERAL DYNAMICS CORPORATION, GENERAL ELECTRIC COMPANY, GENUINE PARTS COMPANY, GOULD ELECTRONICS INC.(Incorrectly desiganted by Plaintiff as Gould Electronics, Inc., f/k/a GD-TEK, Inc.), GOULD ELECTRONICS, INC., GOULDS PUMPS, LLC, GREENE TWEED & COMPANY, INC., GRINNELL, LLC, HAJOCA CORPORATION, HONEYWELL INTERNATIONAL INC.(f/k/a Allied Signal, Inc., as successor-in-interest to the Bendix Corporation), HONEYWELL, INC., HOWDEN NORTH AMERICA, INC., HUNTER SALES CORPORATION, I.U. NORTH AMERICA, INC.(as successor by merger to The Garp Company, formerly known as The Gage Company, formerly known as Pittsburgh Gage and Supply Company), IMO INDUSTRIES, INC, INDUSTRIAL HOLDINGS CORPORATION, INGERSOLL-RAND CORPORATION, INSUL COMPANY, INC., ITT INDUSTRIES, INC., J-M MANUFACTURING COMPANY, INC., JOHN CRANE, INC., JOHNSON CONTROLS, INC., JOY GLOBAL SURFACE MINING, INC., JOY GLOBAL UNDERGROUND MINING, LLC, KADANT, INC., LINDBERG, LOCKHEED MARTIN CORPORATION, LONG ISLAND POWER AUTHORITY, M.S. JACOBS & ASSOCIATES, INC., MANCHESTER TANK(Division of McWane, Inc.), MARMON HOLDINGS, INC., MCCARLS, INC., MCJUNKIN REDMAN CORPORATION, MCMASTER-CARR SUPPLY CO., MCNEIL (OHIO) CORPORATION, MET-PRO TECHNOLOGIES, LLC(incorrectly named as Met-Pro Corporation and its Dean Pump brand d/b/a Met-Pro Global Pump Solutions), METROPOLITAN LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY, MILWAUKEE VALVE COMPANY, MINE SAFETY APPLIANCE COMPANY, MINNOTTE CONTRACTING CORPORATION, MORGAN ENGINEERING SYSTEMS, INC., MOYNO, INC., MUELLER STEAM SPECIALTY, MW CUSTOM PAPERS, LLC, NAGLE PUMPS, INC., NEXTERA ENERGY, INC., NORTEK GLOBAL HVAC, LLC(as successor by merger to Reznor, LLC (incorrectly named herein; correct naming as follows: Nortek Global HVAC, LLC)), NORTH AMERICAN MANUFACTURING CO., OCEAN VIEW CAPITAL, OSRAM SYLVANIA INC.(in its own right and as successor-in-interest to GTE Products Corporation, The Clark Controller Company and A.O. Smith Corporation ), PARKER-HANIFIN CORPORATION, POWER PIPING COMPANY, POWERMASTER PACIFIC PRODUCTS, RCH NEW CO., II LLC(f/k/a Robertson Ceco Corporation, an alleged successor to H.H. Robertson Company), READING CRANE AND ENGINEERING COMPANY, RESEARCH-COTTRELL, INC.(n/k/a AWT AIR COMPANY, INC., incorrectly identified as Research Cottrell Cooling, Inc., n/k/a AWT Air Company, Inc.), REUNION INDUSTRIES, INC., RILEY POWER, INC., RUST ENGINEERING & CONSTRUCTION, INC., SAINT-GOBAIN ABRASIVES, INC., SCHNEIDER ELECTRIC USA, INC., SIEMENS INDUSTRY, INC.(in its own right, and as successor-in-interest to I-T-E Circuit Breaker Company), SPIRAX SARCO, INC., SPX COOLING TECHNOLOGIES, INC., STERLING FLUID SYSTEMS (USA), LLC, SULZER PUMPS (US), INC., SUNBEAM PRODUCTS, INC.(as success-in-interest to Sunbeam Corporation), SUNDYNE, LLC, SURFACE COMBUSTION, INC., THE GOODYEAR TIRE & RUBBER COMPANY, THE MARLEY-WYLAIN COMPANY, THE MARLEY-WYLAIN COMPANY(incorrectly designated as WEIL-McLAIN COMPANY), THE NASH ENGINEERING COMPANY, THE WILLIAM POWELL COMPANY, TRANE U.S. INC.(f/k/a American Standard Corporation, f/k/a/ American Radiator & Standard Sanitary, in its own right and as successor to Westinghouse Airbrake and/or WABCO), TUTHILL CORPORATION, UNION CARBIDE CORPORATION, UNION TANK CAR COMPANY, UNITED CONVEYOR CORPORATION, UNITED STATES STEEL CORPORATION, VELAN VALVE CORPORATION, VIKING PUMP, INC., WARREN PUMPS, LLC, WATTS REGULATOR CO., WHEELABRATOR AIR POLLUTION CONTROL, INC., WHEELING RUBBER PRODUCTS, INC., WT/HRC CORPORATION, WTI RUST HOLDINGS, INC., YORK INTERNATIONAL CORPORATION, YUBA HEAT TRANSFER, LLC, ZURN INDUSTRIES by CEMLINE CORPORATION. (McGee, Kyle)
October 31, 2019 Filing 260 ANSWER to Complaint Affirmative Defenses, CROSSCLAIM and Answer and Affirmative Defenses to Cross Claims against All Defendants by MARMON HOLDINGS, INC.. (Margolin, Erin)
October 31, 2019 Filing 259 ANSWER to Complaint Affirmative Defenses, Cross-claims and Answer and Affirmative Defenses to Cross-Claims By Co-Defendants, CROSSCLAIM against ABB, INC.(as successor to Brown Boveri (Individually and as successor-in-interest to ITE IMPERIAL CO f/k/a ITE CIRCUIT BREAKER COMPANY)), AHLSTROM PUMPS LLC, AIR & LIQUID SYSTEMS CORPORATION(successor-by-merger to Buffalo Pumps, Inc.), AIRTEK, INC., AJAX MAGNETHERMIC CORPORATION, ALFA LAVAL, INC., ALLIED GLOVE CORPORATION, AMERON INTERNATIONAL CORPORATION, AMETEK, INC., ARMSTRONG INTERNATIONAL, INC., A.O. SMITH CORPORATION, A.R. WILFLEY & SONS, INC., ARMSTRONG PUMPS, INC., ATWOOD & MORRILL CO., INC., AURORA PUMP, BAKER HUGHES(a GE Company, LLC), BEAZER EAST, INC(in its own right and as successor to Koppers Co., Inc., and other related companies, including Thiem Corporation, Beazer USA, Inc., and Beazer, PLC), BECHTEL CORPORATION, BLUE M CORPORATION, BMI REFRACTORY SERVICES, INC., BORGWARNER MORSE TEC LLC, BRAND INSULATIONS, INC., BW/IP, INC., CAMERON INTERNATIONAL CORPORATION, CARRIER CORPORATION, CARVER PUMP COMPANY, CASHCO INC., CBS CORPORATION(f/k/a Viacom, Inc., as Successor by Merger to CBS Corp., a Pennsylvania corporation, f/k/a Westinghouse Electric Corporation), CERTAINTEED CORPORATION, CHICAGO BRIDGE & IRON COMPANY, CHICAGO PNEUMATIC TOOL COMPANY, LLC, CLARK EQUIPMENT COMPANY, CLARK RELIANCE CORPORATION(and its division Jerguson Gage and Valve), CLEAVER-BROOKS, CLYDE UNION, INC.(d/b/a Clyde Unioin Pumps, individually and as successor-by-merger to Union Pump Company), COLUMBUS MCKINNON CORP.(successor-by-merger to Lift Tech International, Inc., and its Shaw-Box Hoist Division), CRANE COMPANY, INC., DEZURIK, INC., DONALD MCKAY SMITH, INC., DRAVO CORPORATION, DUQUESNE LIGHT COMPANY, EATON CORPORATION(as successor-in-interest to Cutler Hammer, Inc., n/k/a Eaton Electrical Inc.), ECODYNE HEAT EXCHANGERS, INC.((incorrectly named as "Ecodyne Corp.")), EDF, INC., EICHLEAY CORPORATION, ELECTRIC BOAT CORPORATION, ELECTROLUX HOME PRODUCTS INC., ELLIOTT COMPANY, EVOQUA WATER TECHNOLOGIES, LLC(in its own right and as successor-in-interest to Wallace & Tiernan), EXELON CORPORATION, EXELON GENERATION COMPANY, LLC, EXELON NUCLEAR PARTNERS, LLC, FIRSTENERGY CORPORATION, FLORIDA POWER & LIGHT COMPANY, FLOWSERVE CORPORATION, FLOWSERVE US, INC.(f/k/a Flowserve FSD Corp., successor to Valtek International), FLOWSERVE US, INC.(solely as successor to Nordstrom Audco Inc., Edward Valves inc., Nordstrom Valves, Inc., and Rockwell Manufacturing Company), FLSMIDTH DORR-OLIVER, INC.(as successor-in-interest to Keller/Dorr-Oliver Boiler Company), FLSMIDTH, INC., FLUOR CONSTRUCTORS INTERNATIONAL, FLUOR CORPORATION, FLUOR ENTERPRISES, INC., FMC CORPORATION, FOSECO, INC., FOSTER WHEELER, LLC, GARDNER DENVER, INC., CARL E. GAY, GENERAL DYNAMICS CORPORATION, GENERAL ELECTRIC COMPANY, GENUINE PARTS COMPANY, GOULD ELECTRONICS INC.(Incorrectly desiganted by Plaintiff as Gould Electronics, Inc., f/k/a GD-TEK, Inc.), GOULD ELECTRONICS, INC., GOULDS PUMPS, LLC, GREENE TWEED & COMPANY, INC., GRINNELL, LLC, HAJOCA CORPORATION, HONEYWELL INTERNATIONAL INC.(f/k/a Allied Signal, Inc., as successor-in-interest to the Bendix Corporation), HONEYWELL, INC., HOWDEN NORTH AMERICA, INC., HUNTER SALES CORPORATION, I.U. NORTH AMERICA, INC.(as successor by merger to The Garp Company, formerly known as The Gage Company, formerly known as Pittsburgh Gage and Supply Company), IMO INDUSTRIES, INC, INDUSTRIAL HOLDINGS CORPORATION, INGERSOLL-RAND CORPORATION, INSUL COMPANY, INC., ITT INDUSTRIES, INC., J-M MANUFACTURING COMPANY, INC., JOHN CRANE, INC., JOHNSON CONTROLS, INC., JOY GLOBAL SURFACE MINING, INC., JOY GLOBAL UNDERGROUND MINING, LLC, KADANT, INC., LINDBERG, LOCKHEED MARTIN CORPORATION, LONG ISLAND POWER AUTHORITY, M.S. JACOBS & ASSOCIATES, INC., MANCHESTER TANK(Division of McWane, Inc.), MARMON HOLDINGS, INC., MCCARLS, INC., MCJUNKIN REDMAN CORPORATION, MCMASTER-CARR SUPPLY CO., MCNEIL (OHIO) CORPORATION, MET-PRO TECHNOLOGIES, LLC(incorrectly named as Met-Pro Corporation and its Dean Pump brand d/b/a Met-Pro Global Pump Solutions), METROPOLITAN LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY, MILWAUKEE VALVE COMPANY, MINE SAFETY APPLIANCE COMPANY, MINNOTTE CONTRACTING CORPORATION, MORGAN ENGINEERING SYSTEMS, INC., MOYNO, INC., MUELLER STEAM SPECIALTY, MW CUSTOM PAPERS, LLC, NAGLE PUMPS, INC., NEXTERA ENERGY, INC., NORTEK GLOBAL HVAC, LLC(as successor by merger to Reznor, LLC (incorrectly named herein; correct naming as follows: Nortek Global HVAC, LLC)), NORTH AMERICAN MANUFACTURING CO., OCEAN VIEW CAPITAL, OSRAM SYLVANIA INC.(in its own right and as successor-in-interest to GTE Products Corporation, The Clark Controller Company and A.O. Smith Corporation ), PARKER-HANIFIN CORPORATION, POWER PIPING COMPANY, POWERMASTER PACIFIC PRODUCTS, RCH NEW CO., II LLC(f/k/a Robertson Ceco Corporation, an alleged successor to H.H. Robertson Company), READING CRANE AND ENGINEERING COMPANY, RESEARCH-COTTRELL, INC.(n/k/a AWT AIR COMPANY, INC., incorrectly identified as Research Cottrell Cooling, Inc., n/k/a AWT Air Company, Inc.), REUNION INDUSTRIES, INC., RILEY POWER, INC., RUST ENGINEERING & CONSTRUCTION, INC., SAINT-GOBAIN ABRASIVES, INC., SCHNEIDER ELECTRIC USA, INC., SIEMENS INDUSTRY, INC.(in its own right, and as successor-in-interest to I-T-E Circuit Breaker Company), SPIRAX SARCO, INC., SPX COOLING TECHNOLOGIES, INC., STERLING FLUID SYSTEMS (USA), LLC, SULZER PUMPS (US), INC., SUNBEAM PRODUCTS, INC.(as success-in-interest to Sunbeam Corporation), SUNDYNE, LLC, SURFACE COMBUSTION, INC., THE GOODYEAR TIRE & RUBBER COMPANY, THE MARLEY-WYLAIN COMPANY, THE MARLEY-WYLAIN COMPANY(incorrectly designated as WEIL-McLAIN COMPANY), THE NASH ENGINEERING COMPANY, THE WILLIAM POWELL COMPANY, TRANE U.S. INC.(f/k/a American Standard Corporation, f/k/a/ American Radiator & Standard Sanitary, in its own right and as successor to Westinghouse Airbrake and/or WABCO), TUTHILL CORPORATION, UNION CARBIDE CORPORATION, UNION TANK CAR COMPANY, UNITED CONVEYOR CORPORATION, UNITED STATES STEEL CORPORATION, VELAN VALVE CORPORATION, VIKING PUMP, INC., WARREN PUMPS, LLC, WATTS REGULATOR CO., WHEELABRATOR AIR POLLUTION CONTROL, INC., WHEELING RUBBER PRODUCTS, INC., WT/HRC CORPORATION, WTI RUST HOLDINGS, INC., YORK INTERNATIONAL CORPORATION, YUBA HEAT TRANSFER, LLC, ZURN INDUSTRIES by WASHINGTON GROUP INTERNATIONAL(f/k/a Raytheon Engineers and Constructors, Inc. and all its domestic subsidiaries including The Badger Company, Inc., n/k/a URS Energy & Construction, Inc.). (McGee, Kyle)
October 31, 2019 Filing 258 Disclosure Statement identifying Berkshire Hathaway Inc. as corporate parent or other affiliate of MARMONG HOLDINGS, INC. (Margolin, Erin) Modified text on 11/1/2019. (ma)
October 31, 2019 Filing 257 NOTICE of Appearance by Erin N. Margolin on behalf of MARMON HOLDINGS, INC. (Margolin, Erin) Modified text on 11/1/2019. (ma)
October 31, 2019 Filing 256 NOTICE of Appearance by Patrick T. Reilly on behalf of MARMON HOLDINGS, INC. (Reilly, Patrick) Modified text on 11/1/2019. (ma)
October 31, 2019 Filing 255 ANSWER to Complaint Affimative Defenses, CROSSCLAIM against All Defendants by GENUINE PARTS COMPANY. (Arriaga, Alba)
October 31, 2019 Filing 254 ANSWER to Complaint Affirmative Defenses, CROSSCLAIM and Answer and Affirmative Defenses to Cross Claims against All Defendants by EATON CORPORATION(as successor-in-interest to Cutler Hammer, Inc., n/k/a Eaton Electrical Inc.). (Margolin, Erin)
October 31, 2019 Filing 253 NOTICE of Appearance. (Quinn, Samantha)
October 31, 2019 Filing 252 NOTICE of Appearance on behalf of SUNBEAM. (Krescanko, Ryan)
October 31, 2019 Filing 251 NOTICE of Appearance. (Quinn, Samantha)
October 31, 2019 Filing 250 Disclosure Statement identifying Eaton Corporation PLC as corporate parent or other affiliate of EATON CORPORATION. (Margolin, Erin) Modified text on 11/1/2019. (ma)
October 31, 2019 Filing 249 NOTICE of Appearance by Ryan M. Krescanko on behalf of WARREN PUMPS, LLC. (Krescanko, Ryan)
October 31, 2019 Filing 248 NOTICE of Appearance by Erin N. Margolin on behalf of EATON CORPORATION. (Margolin, Erin) Modified text on 11/1/2019. (ma)
October 31, 2019 Filing 247 NOTICE of Appearance by Ryan M. Krescanko on behalf of FLSMIDTH, INC. (Krescanko, Ryan)
October 31, 2019 Filing 246 NOTICE of Appearance by Patrick T. Reilly on behalf of EATON CORPORATION. (Reilly, Patrick) Modified text on 11/1/2019. (ma)
October 31, 2019 Filing 245 ANSWER to Complaint Affirmative Defenses, CROSSCLAIM and Answer and Affirmative Defenses to Cross Claims against All Defendants by UNION TANK CAR COMPANY. (Margolin, Erin) Modified text on 11/1/2019. (ma)
October 31, 2019 Filing 244 Disclosure Statement identifying Marmon Holdings Inc as corporate parent or other affiliate, by ECODYNE HEAT EXCHANGERS, INC.. (Margolin, Erin)
October 31, 2019 Filing 243 NOTICE of Appearance by Erin Margolin on behalf of ECODYNE HEAT EXCHANGERS, INC.. (Margolin, Erin)
October 31, 2019 Filing 242 NOTICE of Appearance by Kyle T. McGee on behalf of CEMLINE CORPORATION, WASHINGTON GROUP INTERNATIONAL(f/k/a Raytheon Engineers and Constructors, Inc. and all its domestic subsidiaries including The Badger Company, Inc., n/k/a URS Energy & Construction, Inc.), WATSON MCDANIEL COMPANY. (McGee, Kyle)
October 31, 2019 Filing 241 NOTICE of Appearance by Patrick Reilly on behalf of ECODYNE HEAT EXCHANGERS, INC.. (Reilly, Patrick)
October 31, 2019 CLERK'S OFFICE QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE. ERROR: #212 Signature on document and filer do not match. CORRECTION: Attorney advised of signature requirements. Attorney to resubmit the document using the Errata event. Also, two attorneys are listed on this Notice. Attorneys should individually sign and file their own Notices of Appearance. (ma)
October 31, 2019 Filing 240 ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) Affirmative Defenses, Crossclaims and Answers to, CROSSCLAIM of Defendant, Ametek, Inc. against All Parties by AMETEK, INC.. (Vey, Paul)
October 31, 2019 CLERK'S OFFICE QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE re #210 Notice of Appearance. ERROR: Multiple attorneys listed on Notice; attorneys should individually sign and file Notices of Appearance. CORRECTION: Attorney Alven should sign and file her own Notice of Appearance on behalf of Howden North America, Inc. This message is for informational purposes only. (ma)
October 31, 2019 CLERK'S OFFICE QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE re #200 Notice of Appearance. ERROR: Multiple attorneys listed on Notice; attorneys should individually sign and file Notices of Appearance. CORRECTION: Attorney McMeekin should sign and file his own Notice of Appearance on behalf of Met-Pro Technologies. This message is for informational purposes only. (ma)
October 31, 2019 Filing 239 ANSWER to Complaint Affirmative Defenses, CROSSCLAIM and Answer and Affirmative Defenses to Cross-Claims against All Defendants by ECODYNE HEAT EXCHANGERS, INC.. (Margolin, Erin)
October 31, 2019 Filing 238 Disclosure Statement identifying Marmon Holdings, Inc as corporate parent or other affiliate, by ECODYNE HEAT EXCHANGERS, INC.. (Margolin, Erin)
October 31, 2019 Filing 237 NOTICE of Appearance by Erin Margolin on behalf of ECODYNE HEAT EXCHANGERS, INC.. (Margolin, Erin)
October 31, 2019 Filing 236 NOTICE of Appearance by Patrick Reilly on behalf of ECODYNE HEAT EXCHANGERS, INC.. (Reilly, Patrick)
October 31, 2019 Filing 235 Disclosure Statement identifying Schneider Electric Holdings, Inc. as corporate parent or other affiliate,. (Zukowski, Michael)
October 31, 2019 Filing 234 ANSWER to Complaint AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES, CROSSCLAIM and ANSWER TO CROSSCLAIMS against All Defendants by SCHNEIDER ELECTRIC USA, INC.. (Zukowski, Michael)
October 30, 2019 Filing 233 ANSWER to Complaint Affirmative Defenses, CROSSCLAIM against All Defendants by FLSMIDTH, INC.. (Krescanko, Ryan)
October 30, 2019 Filing 232 ANSWER to Complaint Affirmative Defenses, CROSSCLAIM against All Defendants by SUNBEAM PRODUCTS, INC.(as success-in-interest to Sunbeam Corporation). (Krescanko, Ryan)
October 30, 2019 Filing 231 Warren Pumps, LLC ANSWER to Complaint Affirmative Defenses, CROSSCLAIM against All Defendants by WARREN PUMPS, LLC. (Krescanko, Ryan)
October 30, 2019 Filing 230 Disclosure Statement identifying FLS US Holdings, Inc. as corporate parent or other affiliate, by FLSMIDTH, INC.. (Krescanko, Ryan)
October 30, 2019 Filing 229 Disclosure Statement identifying Sunbeam Americas Holdings, LLC as corporate parent or other affiliate,. (Krescanko, Ryan)
October 30, 2019 Filing 228 Disclosure Statement identifying IMO Industries, Colfax Corporation as corporate parent or other affiliate by WARREN PUMPS, LLC. (Krescanko, Ryan) Modified text on 10/31/2019. (jm)
October 30, 2019 Filing 227 Disclosure Statement identifying Weir Valves and Controls USA, Inc. The Weir Group PLC, a UK public company listed on the London Stock Exchange, is the ultimate parent entity of Weir Valves & Controls USA, Inc., and as such controls all stock of Weir Valves & Controls USA, Inc. as corporate parent or other affiliate,. (Krauth, Daniel)
October 30, 2019 Filing 226 NOTICE of Appearance. (Krauth, Daniel)
October 29, 2019 Filing 225 ANSWER to Complaint , Affirmative Defenses, and CROSSCLAIM against ABB, INC., AECOM ENERGY & CONSTRUCTION, INC., AIR & LIQUID SYSTEMS CORPORATION, AIRTEK, INC., ALFA LAVAL, INC., ALLIED GLOVE CORPORATION, AMERON INTERNATIONAL CORPORATION, AMETEK, INC., ARMSTRONG INTERNATIONAL, INC., A.O. SMITH CORPORATION, ARMSTRONG PUMPS, INC., ATWOOD & MORRILL CO., INC., A.R. WILFLEY & SONS, INC., AURORA PUMP, BAKER HUGHES(a GE Company, LLC), BEAZER EAST, INC(in its own right and as successor to Koppers Co., Inc., and other related companies, including Thiem Corporation, Beazer USA, Inc., and Beazer, PLC), BECHTEL CORPORATION, BLUE M CORPORATION, BMI REFRACTORY SERVICES, INC., BORGWARNER MORSE TEC LLC, BRAND INSULATIONS, INC., BW/IP, INC., CAMERON INTERNATIONAL CORPORATION, CARRIER CORPORATION, CARVER PUMP COMPANY, CASHCO INC., CBS CORPORATION(f/k/a Viacom, Inc., as Successor by Merger to CBS Corp., a Pennsylvania corporation, f/k/a Westinghouse Electric Corporation), CEMLINE CORPORATION, CERTAINTEED CORPORATION, CHICAGO BRIDGE & IRON COMPANY, CHICAGO PNEUMATIC TOOL COMPANY, LLC, CLARK EQUIPMENT COMPANY, CLARK RELIANCE CORPORATION(and its division Jerguson Gage and Valve), CLEAVER-BROOKS, CLYDE UNION, INC.(d/b/a Clyde Unioin Pumps, individually and as successor-by-merger to Union Pump Company), COLUMBUS MCKINNON CORP., CRANE COMPANY, INC., DEZURIK, INC., DONALD MCKAY SMITH, INC., DRAVO CORPORATION, DUQUESNE LIGHT COMPANY, EATON CORPORATION(as successor-in-interest to Cutler Hammer, Inc., n/k/a Eaton Electrical Inc.), ECODYNE HEAT EXCHANGERS, INC., EDF, INC., EICHLEAY CORPORATION, ELECTRIC BOAT CORPORATION, ELECTROLUX HOME PRODUCTS INC., ELLIOTT COMPANY, EVOQUA WATER TECHNOLOGIES, LLC(in its own right and as successor-in-interest to Wallace & Tiernan), EXELON CORPORATION, EXELON GENERATION COMPANY, LLC, EXELON NUCLEAR PARTNERS, LLC, FIRSTENERGY CORPORATION, FLORIDA POWER & LIGHT COMPANY, FLOWSERVE CORPORATION, FLOWSERVE US, INC.(solely as successor to Nordstrom Audco Inc., Edward Valves inc., Nordstrom Valves, Inc., and Rockwell Manufacturing Company), FLSMIDTH DORR-OLIVER, INC.(as successor-in-interest to Keller/Dorr-Oliver Boiler Company), FLSMIDTH, INC., FLUOR CONSTRUCTORS INTERNATIONAL, FLUOR CORPORATION, FLUOR ENTERPRISES, INC., FMC CORPORATION, FOSECO, INC., FOSTER WHEELER, LLC, GARDNER DENVER, INC., GENERAL DYNAMICS CORPORATION, GENERAL ELECTRIC COMPANY, GENUINE PARTS COMPANY, GOULD ELECTRONICS INC., GOULDS PUMPS, LLC, GREENE TWEED & COMPANY, INC., GRINNELL, LLC, HAJOCA CORPORATION, HONEYWELL INTERNATIONAL INC.(f/k/a Allied Signal, Inc., as successor-in-interest to the Bendix Corporation), HONEYWELL, INC., HOWDEN NORTH AMERICA, INC., HUNTER SALES CORPORATION, I.U. NORTH AMERICA, INC.(as successor by merger to The Garp Company, formerly known as The Gage Company, formerly known as Pittsburgh Gage and Supply Company), IMO INDUSTRIES, INC, INDUSTRIAL HOLDINGS CORPORATION, INGERSOLL-RAND CORPORATION, INSUL COMPANY, INC., ITT INDUSTRIES, INC., J-M MANUFACTURING COMPANY, INC., JOHN CRANE, INC., JOHNSON CONTROLS, INC., JOY GLOBAL SURFACE MINING, INC., JOY GLOBAL UNDERGROUND MINING, LLC, KADANT, INC., LINDBERG, LOCKHEED MARTIN CORPORATION, LONG ISLAND POWER AUTHORITY, M.S. JACOBS & ASSOCIATES, INC., MANCHESTER TANK(Division of McWane, Inc.), MARMON HOLDINGS, INC., MCCARLS, INC., MCJUNKIN REDMAN CORPORATION, MCMASTER-CARR SUPPLY CO., MCNEIL (OHIO) CORPORATION, MET-PRO TECHNOLOGIES, LLC, METROPOLITAN LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY, MILWAUKEE VALVE COMPANY, MINE SAFETY APPLIANCE COMPANY, MINNOTTE CONTRACTING CORPORATION, MORGAN ENGINEERING SYSTEMS, INC., MOYNO, INC., MUELLER STEAM SPECIALTY, MW CUSTOM PAPERS, LLC, NAGLE PUMPS, INC., NEXTERA ENERGY, INC., NORTEK GLOBAL HVAC, LLC(as successor by merger to Reznor, LLC (incorrectly named herein; correct naming as follows: Nortek Global HVAC, LLC)), NORTH AMERICAN MANUFACTURING CO., OCEAN VIEW CAPITAL, OSRAM SYLVANIA INC.(in its own right and as successor-in-interest to GTE Products Corporation, The Clark Controller Company and A.O. Smith Corporation ), PARKER-HANIFIN CORPORATION, POWER PIPING COMPANY, POWERMASTER PACIFIC PRODUCTS, RCH NEW CO., II LLC(f/k/a Robertson Ceco Corporation, an alleged successor to H.H. Robertson Company), READING CRANE AND ENGINEERING COMPANY, RESEARCH-COTTRELL, INC.(n/k/a AWT AIR COMPANY, INC., incorrectly identified as Research Cottrell Cooling, Inc., n/k/a AWT Air Company, Inc.), REUNION INDUSTRIES, INC., RILEY POWER, INC., RUST ENGINEERING & CONSTRUCTION, INC., SCHNEIDER ELECTRIC USA, INC., SIEMENS INDUSTRY, INC.(in its own right, and as successor-in-interest to I-T-E Circuit Breaker Company), SPIRAX SARCO, INC., SPX COOLING TECHNOLOGIES, INC., STERLING FLUID SYSTEMS (USA), LLC, SUNBEAM PRODUCTS, INC.(as success-in-interest to Sunbeam Corporation), SUNDYNE, LLC, SURFACE COMBUSTION, INC., THE GOODYEAR TIRE & RUBBER COMPANY, THE MARLEY-WYLAIN COMPANY(incorrectly designated as WEIL-McLAIN COMPANY), THE NASH ENGINEERING COMPANY, THE WILLIAM POWELL COMPANY, TRANE U.S. INC.(f/k/a American Standard Corporation, f/k/a/ American Radiator & Standard Sanitary, in its own right and as successor to Westinghouse Airbrake and/or WABCO), TUTHILL CORPORATION, UNION CARBIDE CORPORATION, UNION TANK CAR COMPANY, UNITED CONVEYOR CORPORATION, UNITED STATES STEEL CORPORATION, VELAN VALVE CORPORATION, VIKING PUMP, INC., WARREN PUMPS, LLC, WASHINGTON GROUP INTERNATIONAL(f/k/a Raytheon Engineers and Constructors, Inc. and all its domestic subsidiaries including The Badger Company, Inc., n/k/a URS Energy & Construction, Inc.), WATSON MCDANIEL COMPANY, WATTS REGULATOR CO., WHEELABRATOR AIR POLLUTION CONTROL, INC., WHEELING RUBBER PRODUCTS, INC., WT/HRC CORPORATION, WTI RUST HOLDINGS, INC., YORK INTERNATIONAL CORPORATION, YUBA HEAT TRANSFER, LLC, ZURN INDUSTRIES by SULZER PUMPS (US), INC.. (Hutchinson, Jenna)
October 29, 2019 Filing 224 ANSWER to Complaint , Affirmative Defenses, and CROSSCLAIM against All Parties by JOY GLOBAL SURFACE MINING, INC.. (Vey, Paul)
October 29, 2019 Filing 223 ANSWER to Complaint , Affirmative Defenses, and CROSSCLAIM against All Defendants against AHLSTROM PUMPS LLC by AHLSTROM PUMPS LLC. (Hutchinson, Jenna)
October 29, 2019 Filing 222 Disclosure Statement identifying Komatsu America Corp. as corporate parent or other affiliate, by JOY GLOBAL SURFACE MINING, INC.. (Vey, Paul)
October 29, 2019 Filing 221 Disclosure Statement identifying Sulzer US Holding Inc. as corporate parent or other affiliate, by SULZER PUMPS (US), INC.. (Hutchinson, Jenna)
October 29, 2019 Filing 220 Disclosure Statement identifying Sulzer US Holding Inc. as corporate parent or other affiliate,. (Hutchinson, Jenna)
October 29, 2019 Filing 219 NOTICE of Appearance by Jenna C. Hutchinson on behalf of SULZER PUMPS (US), INC.. (Hutchinson, Jenna)
October 29, 2019 Filing 218 ERROR: DUPLICATE FILING. THIS DOCUMENT HAS BEEN REMOVED FROM PUBLIC VIEW; NOTICE of Appearance. (Hutchinson, Jenna) Modified text on 10/30/2019. (cel)
October 29, 2019 Filing 217 Disclosure Statement identifying None as corporate parent or other affiliate, by COLUMBUS MCKINNON CORP.. (Ward, Kevin)
October 29, 2019 Filing 216 Tuthill Corporation ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) . (McMeekin, John)
October 29, 2019 Filing 215 Disclosure Statement identifying Eichleay Corporation, a dissolved Delaware corporation. as corporate parent or other affiliate,. (Krauth, Daniel)
October 29, 2019 Filing 214 NOTICE of Appearance. (Krauth, Daniel)
October 29, 2019 Filing 213 Disclosure Statement identifying None as corporate parent or other affiliate,. (McMeekin, John)
October 29, 2019 Filing 212 NOTICE of Appearance. (McMeekin, John)
October 29, 2019 Filing 211 Disclosure Statement identifying None as corporate parent or other affiliate, by HOWDEN NORTH AMERICA, INC. (Arriaga, Alba)
October 29, 2019 Filing 210 NOTICE of Appearance by Alba E Arriaga on behalf of HOWDEN NORTH AMERICA, INC. (Arriaga, Alba)
October 29, 2019 Filing 209 ANSWER to #208 Crossclaim with CROSSCLAIM against All Defendants by HOWDEN NORTH AMERICA, INC. (Arriaga, Alba) Modified text on 10/30/2019. (cel)
October 28, 2019 Filing 208 ANSWER to #53 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim, #61 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim, #85 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim, #160 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim, #39 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim, #99 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim, #71 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim, #189 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim, #94 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim, #163 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim, #24 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim, #149 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim, #130 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim, #93 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim, #52 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim, #60 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim, #26 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim, #55 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim, #126 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim, #90 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim, #146 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim, #165 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim, #131 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim, #79 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim, #87 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim, #206 Answer to Complaint (Notice of Removal), Crossclaim, #150 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim, #45 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim, #171 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim, #155 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim, #73 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim, #51 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim, #70 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim, #135 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim, #97 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim, #151 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim, #46 Answer to Complaint (Notice of Removal), Crossclaim, #148 Answer to Complaint,, Crossclaim, #105 Answer to Complaint (Notice of Removal), Crossclaim, #173 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim, #152 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim, #138 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim, #162 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim, #169 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim, #177 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim , ANSWER to #53 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim, #61 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim, #85 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim, #160 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim, #39 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim, #99 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim, #71 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim, #189 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim, #94 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim, #163 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim, #24 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim, #149 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim, #130 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim, #93 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim, #52 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim, #60 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim, #26 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim, #55 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim, #126 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim, #90 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim, #146 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim, #165 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim, #131 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim, #79 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim, #87 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim, #206 Answer to Complaint (Notice of Removal), Crossclaim, #150 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim, #45 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim, #171 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim, #155 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim, #73 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim, #51 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim, #70 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim, #135 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim, #97 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim, #151 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim, #46 Answer to Complaint (Notice of Removal), Crossclaim, #148 Answer to Complaint,, Crossclaim, #105 Answer to Complaint (Notice of Removal), Crossclaim, #173 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim, #152 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim, #138 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim, #162 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim, #169 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim, #177 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim , ANSWER to #53 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim, #61 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim, #85 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim, #160 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim, #39 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim, #99 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim, #71 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim, #189 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim, #94 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim, #163 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim, #24 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim, #149 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim, #130 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim, #93 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim, #52 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim, #60 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim, #26 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim, #55 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim, #126 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim, #90 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim, #146 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim, #165 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim, #131 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim, #79 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim, #87 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim, #206 Answer to Complaint (Notice of Removal), Crossclaim, #150 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim, #45 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim, #171 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim, #155 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim, #73 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim, #51 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim, #70 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim, #135 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim, #97 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim, #151 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim, #46 Answer to Complaint (Notice of Removal), Crossclaim, #148 Answer to Complaint,, Crossclaim, #105 Answer to Complaint (Notice of Removal), Crossclaim, #173 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim, #152 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim, #138 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim, #162 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim, #169 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim, #177 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim , ANSWER to #53 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim, #61 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim, #85 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim, #160 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim, #39 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim, #99 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim, #71 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim, #189 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim, #94 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim, #163 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim, #24 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim, #149 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim, #130 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim, #93 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim, #52 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim, #60 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim, #26 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim, #55 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim, #126 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim, #90 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim, #146 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim, #165 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim, #131 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim, #79 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim, #87 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim, #206 Answer to Complaint (Notice of Removal), Crossclaim, #150 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim, #45 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim, #171 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim, #155 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim, #73 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim, #51 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim, #70 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim, #135 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim, #97 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim, #151 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim, #46 Answer to Complaint (Notice of Removal), Crossclaim, #148 Answer to Complaint,, Crossclaim, #105 Answer to Complaint (Notice of Removal), Crossclaim, #173 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim, #152 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim, #138 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim, #162 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim, #169 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim, #177 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim , ANSWER to #53 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim, #61 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim, #85 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim, #160 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim, #39 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim, #99 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim, #71 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim, #189 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim, #94 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim, #163 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim, #24 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim, #149 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim, #130 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim, #93 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim, #52 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim, #60 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim, #26 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim, #55 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim, #126 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim, #90 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim, #146 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim, #165 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim, #131 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim, #79 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim, #87 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim, #206 Answer to Complaint (Notice of Removal), Crossclaim, #150 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim, #45 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim, #171 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim, #155 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim, #73 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim, #51 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim, #70 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim, #135 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim, #97 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim, #151 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim, #46 Answer to Complaint (Notice of Removal), Crossclaim, #148 Answer to Complaint,, Crossclaim, #105 Answer to Complaint (Notice of Removal), Crossclaim, #173 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim, #152 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim, #138 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim, #162 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim, #169 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim, #177 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim , ANSWER to #53 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim, #61 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim, #85 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim, #160 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim, #39 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim, #99 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim, #71 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim, #189 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim, #94 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim, #163 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim, #24 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim, #149 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim, #130 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim, #93 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim, #52 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim, #60 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim, #26 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim, #55 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim, #126 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim, #90 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim, #146 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim, #165 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim, #131 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim, #79 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim, #87 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim, #206 Answer to Complaint (Notice of Removal), Crossclaim, #150 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim, #45 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim, #171 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim, #155 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim, #73 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim, #51 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim, #70 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim, #135 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim, #97 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim, #151 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim, #46 Answer to Complaint (Notice of Removal), Crossclaim, #148 A
October 25, 2019 Filing 207 ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) , CROSSCLAIM against All Defendants by NORTEK GLOBAL HVAC, LLC. (Turlik, John)
October 25, 2019 Filing 206 ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) , CROSSCLAIM against All Defendants by FLOWSERVE US, INC.(f/k/a Flowserve FSD Corp., successor to Valtek International). (Turlik, John)
October 25, 2019 Filing 205 NOTICE of Appearance by Daniel J. Sinclair, Esq. on behalf of CBS CORPORATION. (Sinclair, Daniel) Modified text on 10/28/2019. (jjg)
October 25, 2019 Filing 204 ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) , CROSSCLAIM against All Defendants by BW/IP, INC.. (Turlik, John)
October 25, 2019 Filing 203 Disclosure Statement identifying Natonal Amusements, Inc., GAMCO Investors, Inc. as corporate parent or other affiliate,. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service) (Sinclair, Daniel)
October 25, 2019 Filing 202 ANSWER to Complaint by MET-PRO TECHNOLOGIES, LLC(Notice of Removal) . (Chiodo, Edward) Modified text on 10/25/2019. (jjg)
October 25, 2019 Filing 201 Disclosure Statement identifying CECO Group, Inc. as corporate parent or other affiliate by MET-PRO TECHNOLOGIES, LLC. (Chiodo, Edward) Modified text on 10/28/2019. (ma)
October 25, 2019 Filing 200 NOTICE of Appearance of Edward J. Chiodo on behalf of MET-PRO TECHNOLOGIES, LLC. (Chiodo, Edward) Modified text on 10/28/2019. (ma)
October 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 199 ORDER GRANTING #195 Motion for Katherine J. Mercer-Lawson to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Judge William S. Stickman on 10/25/19. Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Order of the Court or Notice on the matter. (eca)
October 24, 2019 Filing 198 Disclosure Statement identifying Flowserve as corporate parent or other affiliate,. (Turlik, John)
October 24, 2019 Filing 197 Disclosure Statement identifying Nortek, Inc. as corporate parent or other affiliate,. (Turlik, John)
October 24, 2019 Filing 196 Disclosure Statement identifying Flowserve Corporation as corporate parent or other affiliate,. (Turlik, John)
October 24, 2019 Filing 195 MOTION for attorney Katherine J. Mercer-Lawson to Appear Pro Hac Vice, (Filing fee $70, Receipt # 0315-5335174) by GENERAL ELECTRIC COMPANY. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Proposed Order) (Mercer-Lawson, Kate)
October 24, 2019 Filing 194 NOTICE of Appearance by James B. Insco on behalf of SIEMENS INDUSTRY, INC.. (Insco, James)
October 24, 2019 Filing 193 NOTICE of Appearance by James B. Insco on behalf of WATTS REGULATOR CO.. (Insco, James)
October 24, 2019 Filing 192 NOTICE of Appearance. (Turlik, John)
October 24, 2019 Filing 191 NOTICE of Appearance. (Turlik, John)
October 24, 2019 Filing 190 Disclosure Statement identifying Velan Inc. as corporate parent or other affiliate, by VELAN VALVE CORPORATION. (Schaper, Joseph)
October 24, 2019 Filing 189 ANSWER to Complaint Affirmative Defenses, CROSSCLAIM against All Defendants by VELAN VALVE CORPORATION. (Schaper, Joseph)
October 24, 2019 Filing 188 Disclosure Statement identifying FLSMIDTH DORR-OLIVER INC. as corporate parent or other affiliate, by FLSMIDTH DORR-OLIVER, INC.. (Schaper, Joseph)
October 24, 2019 Filing 187 ANSWER to Complaint Affirmative Defenses, CROSSCLAIM against All Defendants by FLSMIDTH DORR-OLIVER, INC.. (Schaper, Joseph)
October 24, 2019 Filing 186 NOTICE of Appearance. (Turlik, John)
October 24, 2019 Filing 185 NOTICE of Appearance by Joseph R. Schaper on behalf of FLSMIDTH DORR-OLIVER, INC.. (Schaper, Joseph)
October 24, 2019 CLERK'S OFFICE QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE re #156 Notice of Appearance. ERROR: Party did not file disclosure statement as required pursuant L.R. 7.1.1. CORRECTION: Attorney advised to file statement within 7 days. Disclosure Statement due by 10/31/2019. (jm)
October 24, 2019 Filing 184 Disclosure Statement identifying None as corporate parent or other affiliate, by READING CRANE AND ENGINEERING COMPANY. (Ryan, David)
October 24, 2019 Filing 183 NOTICE of Appearance by David F. Ryan on behalf of READING CRANE AND ENGINEERING COMPANY. (Ryan, David)
October 24, 2019 Filing 182 ANSWER to Complaint And Affirmative Defenses by SPX COOLING TECHNOLOGIES, INC. (Wimer, Matthew)
October 24, 2019 Filing 181 ANSWER to Complaint Crossclaims by SPX COOLING TECHNOLOGIES, INC. (Wimer, Matthew)
October 24, 2019 Filing 180 Disclosure Statement identifying SPX Corporation as corporate parent or other affiliate, by SPX COOLING TECHNOLOGIES, INC.. (Wimer, Matthew)
October 24, 2019 Filing 179 NOTICE of Appearance. (Wimer, Matthew)
October 23, 2019 Filing 178 Disclosure Statement identifying United Technologies Corporation as corporate parent or other affiliate, by CARRIER CORPORATION. (Cochran, Melissa)
October 23, 2019 Filing 177 ANSWER to Complaint Affirmative Defenses, CROSSCLAIM against All Defendants by CARRIER CORPORATION. (Cochran, Melissa)
October 23, 2019 Filing 176 Disclosure Statement identifying None as corporate parent or other affiliate, by FLOWSERVE CORPORATION. (Cochran, Melissa)
October 23, 2019 Filing 175 ANSWER to Complaint Affirmative Defenses, CROSSCLAIM against All Defendants by FLOWSERVE CORPORATION. (Cochran, Melissa)
October 23, 2019 Filing 174 Disclosure Statement identifying Flowserve Corporation as corporate parent or other affiliate, by FLOWSERVE CORPORATION. (Cochran, Melissa)
October 23, 2019 Filing 173 ANSWER to Complaint Affirmative Defenses, CROSSCLAIM against All Defendants by FLOWSERVE CORPORATION. (Cochran, Melissa)
October 23, 2019 Filing 172 Disclosure Statement identifying Gardner Denver Holdings, Inc. as corporate parent or other affiliate, by GARDNER DENVER, INC.. (Cochran, Melissa)
October 23, 2019 Filing 171 ANSWER to Complaint Affirmative Defenses, CROSSCLAIM against All Defendants by GARDNER DENVER, INC.. (Cochran, Melissa)
October 23, 2019 Filing 170 Disclosure Statement identifying Rexnord LLC as corporate parent or other affiliate, by ZURN INDUSTRIES. (Cochran, Melissa)
October 23, 2019 Filing 169 ANSWER to Complaint Affirmative Defenses, CROSSCLAIM against All Defendants by ZURN INDUSTRIES. (Cochran, Melissa)
October 23, 2019 Filing 168 NOTICE of Appearance. (Schollaert, John)
October 23, 2019 Filing 167 NOTICE of Appearance by John W. Bruni on behalf of DRAVO CORPORATION. (Bruni, John)
October 23, 2019 Filing 166 Disclosure Statement identifying Komatsu Mining Corp. as corporate parent or other affiliate, by JOY GLOBAL UNDERGROUND MINING, LLC. (Miller, Edward)
October 23, 2019 Filing 165 ANSWER to Complaint Affirmative Defenses, CROSSCLAIM against All Defendants by JOY GLOBAL UNDERGROUND MINING, LLC. (Miller, Edward)
October 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 164 ORDER GRANTING #132 Motion for Pro Hac Vice Admission of John A. Turlik, Esq. Signed by Judge William S. Stickman on 10/23/19. Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Order of the Court or Notice on the matter. (eca)
October 22, 2019 Filing 163 ANSWER to Complaint and Affirmative Defenses, CROSSCLAIM against All Defendants by BEAZER EAST, INC. (Leight, Robert)
October 22, 2019 Filing 162 ANSWER to Complaint , Affirmative Defenses and, CROSSCLAIM against All Defendants by THE NASH ENGINEERING COMPANY. (Smallwood, Edward)
October 22, 2019 Filing 161 Disclosure Statement identifying Nash Engineering Holdings LLC as corporate parent or other affiliate, by THE NASH ENGINEERING COMPANY. (Smallwood, Edward)
October 22, 2019 Filing 160 ANSWER to Complaint , Affirmative Defenses and, CROSSCLAIM against All Defendants by DRAVO CORPORATION. (Sechler, Michael)
October 22, 2019 Filing 159 Disclosure Statement identifying Carmeuse Lime, Inc. as corporate parent or other affiliate, by DRAVO CORPORATION. (Sechler, Michael)
October 22, 2019 Filing 158 NOTICE of Appearance by Michael J. Sechler on behalf of DRAVO CORPORATION. (Sechler, Michael)
October 22, 2019 Filing 157 Disclosure Statement identifying Duquesne Light Holdings as corporate parent or other affiliate, by DUQUESNE LIGHT COMPANY. (Gordon, Cathy)
October 22, 2019 Filing 156 NOTICE of Appearance by Paul K. Vey on behalf of AMETEK, INC.. (Vey, Paul)
October 22, 2019 Filing 155 ANSWER to Complaint with Affirmative Defenses, CROSSCLAIM and Answer to Crossclaims against All Defendants by DUQUESNE LIGHT COMPANY. (Gordon, Cathy)
October 22, 2019 Filing 154 Disclosure Statement identifying EWT Holdings III Corp., EWT Holdings II Corp., Evoqua Water Technologies Corp. as corporate parent or other affiliate, by EVOQUA WATER TECHNOLOGIES, LLC. (Warhola, Adam)
October 22, 2019 Filing 153 Disclosure Statement identifying None as corporate parent or other affiliate, by THE WILLIAM POWELL COMPANY. (Smallwood, Edward)
October 22, 2019 Filing 152 ANSWER to Complaint and Affirmative defenses, CROSSCLAIM against All Defendants by THE WILLIAM POWELL COMPANY. (Smallwood, Edward)
October 22, 2019 Filing 151 ANSWER to Complaint and Affirmative defenses, CROSSCLAIM against All Defendants by HUNTER SALES CORPORATION. (Smallwood, Edward)
October 22, 2019 Filing 150 ANSWER to Complaint and Affirmative defenses, CROSSCLAIM against All Defendants by THE WILLIAM POWELL COMPANY. (Smallwood, Edward)
October 22, 2019 Filing 149 ANSWER to Complaint and Affirmative defenses, CROSSCLAIM against All Defendants by HUNTER SALES CORPORATION. (Smallwood, Edward)
October 22, 2019 Filing 148 ANSWER to Complaint , Affirmative Defenses and, CROSSCLAIM against All Defendants by TRANE U.S. INC.(f/k/a American Standard Corporation, f/k/a/ American Radiator & Standard Sanitary, in its own right and as successor to Westinghouse Airbrake and/or WABCO). (Smith, Kelly)
October 22, 2019 Filing 147 NOTICE of Appearance by Paul K. Vey on behalf of JOY GLOBAL SURFACE MINING, INC.. (Vey, Paul)
October 22, 2019 Filing 146 ANSWER to Complaint , Affirmative Defenses and, CROSSCLAIM against All Defendants by INGERSOLL-RAND CORPORATION. (Smith, Kelly)
October 22, 2019 Filing 145 Disclosure Statement identifying None as corporate parent or other affiliate, by MINNOTTE CONTRACTING CORPORATION. (Yoskosky, Christopher)
October 22, 2019 Filing 144 NOTICE of Appearance by Christopher T. Yoskosky on behalf of MINNOTTE CONTRACTING CORPORATION. (Yoskosky, Christopher)
October 22, 2019 Filing 143 NOTICE of Appearance by Gregory C Scheuring on behalf of MINNOTTE CONTRACTING CORPORATION. (Scheuring, Gregory)
October 22, 2019 Filing 142 Disclosure Statement identifying None as corporate parent or other affiliate, by DONALD MCKAY SMITH, INC.. (Yoskosky, Christopher)
October 22, 2019 Filing 141 NOTICE of Appearance by Christopher T. Yoskosky on behalf of DONALD MCKAY SMITH, INC.. (Yoskosky, Christopher)
October 22, 2019 Filing 140 NOTICE of Appearance by Gregory C Scheuring on behalf of DONALD MCKAY SMITH, INC.. (Scheuring, Gregory)
October 22, 2019 Filing 139 Disclosure Statement identifying National Oilwell Varco, Inc. as corporate parent or other affiliate,. (Smallwood, Edward)
October 22, 2019 Filing 138 Honeywell Inc.'s ANSWER to Complaint Affirmative Defenses, Crossclaims, and CROSSCLAIM Replies to Crossclaims against All Defendants by HONEYWELL, INC.. (Santos, Eric)
October 22, 2019 Filing 137 NOTICE of Appearance by Steven D Evans on behalf of HUNTER SALES CORPORATION. (Evans, Steven)
October 22, 2019 Filing 136 Disclosure Statement identifying None as corporate parent or other affiliate, by UNITED CONVEYOR CORPORATION. (Sopher, Jeanne)
October 22, 2019 Filing 135 Answer, Affirmative Defenses, ANSWER to Complaint , CROSSCLAIM and Answer to Crossclaims against All Defendants by UNITED CONVEYOR CORPORATION. (Sopher, Jeanne)
October 22, 2019 Filing 134 NOTICE of Appearance. (Caloyer, Mark)
October 22, 2019 Filing 133 NOTICE of Appearance. (Santos, Eric)
October 22, 2019 Filing 132 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Admission by John A. Turlik, Esq. for Nortek Global HVAC, LLC, Flowserve Corporation f/k/a Valtek, Inc. and BW/IP, Inc.. Fee: $70,00, Receipt #0315-5329963(Turlik, John) Modified text on 10/22/2019. (jjg)
October 22, 2019 Filing 131 ANSWER to Complaint Affirmative Defenses, Answer to All Crossclaims, CROSSCLAIM against All Defendants by GREENE TWEED & COMPANY, INC.. (Wolford, Dennis)
October 22, 2019 Filing 130 ANSWER to Complaint and Affirmative defenses, CROSSCLAIM against All Defendants by REUNION INDUSTRIES, INC.. (Smallwood, Edward)
October 22, 2019 Filing 129 ANSWER to Complaint Affirmative Defenses, Answer to All Crossclaims, CROSSCLAIM against FOSTER WHEELER, LLC by FOSTER WHEELER, LLC. (Wolford, Dennis)
October 22, 2019 Filing 128 Disclosure Statement identifying None as corporate parent or other affiliate,. (Smallwood, Edward)
October 22, 2019 Filing 127 Disclosure Statement identifying None as corporate parent or other affiliate,. (Smallwood, Edward)
October 22, 2019 Filing 126 ANSWER to Complaint and Affirmative defenses, CROSSCLAIM against All Defendants by WHEELING RUBBER PRODUCTS, INC.. (Smallwood, Edward)
October 22, 2019 Filing 125 ANSWER to Complaint and Affirmative defenses, CROSSCLAIM against All Defendants by AMERON INTERNATIONAL CORPORATION. (Smallwood, Edward)
October 22, 2019 Filing 124 Disclosure Statement identifying None as corporate parent or other affiliate, by AIRTEK, INC.. (Polley, Richard)
October 22, 2019 Filing 123 NOTICE of Appearance. (Watson, Jennifer)
October 22, 2019 Filing 122 NOTICE of Appearance by Jennifer E. Watson on behalf of SAINT-GOBAIN ABRASIVES, INC.. (Watson, Jennifer)
October 22, 2019 Filing 121 NOTICE of Appearance. (Watson, Jennifer)
October 22, 2019 Filing 120 NOTICE of Appearance by Jennifer E. Watson on behalf of AECOM ENERGY & CONSTRUCTION, INC.. (Watson, Jennifer)
October 22, 2019 Filing 119 NOTICE of Appearance by Jennifer E. Watson on behalf of EXELON CORPORATION. (Watson, Jennifer)
October 22, 2019 Filing 118 NOTICE of Appearance by Jennifer E. Watson on behalf of I.U. NORTH AMERICA, INC.. (Watson, Jennifer)
October 22, 2019 Filing 117 NOTICE of Appearance by Jennifer E. Watson on behalf of MCCARLS, INC.. (Watson, Jennifer)
October 22, 2019 Filing 116 NOTICE of Appearance by Jennifer E. Watson on behalf of MILWAUKEE VALVE COMPANY. (Watson, Jennifer)
October 22, 2019 Filing 115 NOTICE of Appearance by Jennifer E. Watson on behalf of RCH NEW CO., II LLC. (Watson, Jennifer)
October 21, 2019 Filing 114 NOTICE of Appearance by Katherine A. Lowery on behalf of UNION CARBIDE CORPORATION. (Lowery, Katherine)
October 21, 2019 Filing 113 NOTICE of Appearance by Katherine A. Lowery on behalf of STERLING FLUID SYSTEMS (USA), LLC. (Lowery, Katherine)
October 21, 2019 Filing 112 NOTICE of Appearance by Katherine A. Lowery on behalf of CARVER PUMP COMPANY. (Lowery, Katherine)
October 21, 2019 Filing 111 NOTICE of Appearance by Katherine A. Lowery on behalf of ALFA LAVAL, INC.. (Lowery, Katherine)
October 21, 2019 Filing 110 NOTICE of Appearance by Katherine A. Lowery on behalf of FMC CORPORATION. (Lowery, Katherine)
October 21, 2019 Filing 109 ANSWER to Complaint , Affirmative Defenses, Answer to Crossclaims, CROSSCLAIM against All Defendants by GOULD ELECTRONICS INC.. (Jones, Christopher)
October 21, 2019 Filing 108 NOTICE of Appearance by Christopher H. Jones on behalf of GOULD ELECTRONICS INC.. (Jones, Christopher)
October 21, 2019 Filing 107 ANSWER to Complaint Affirmative Defenses, Answer to Crossclaims, CROSSCLAIM against All Defendants by THE MARLEY-WYLAIN COMPANY(incorrectly designated as WEIL-McLAIN COMPANY). (Jones, Christopher)
October 21, 2019 Filing 106 NOTICE of Appearance by Christopher H. Jones on behalf of The Marley-Wylain Company. (Jones, Christopher)
October 21, 2019 Filing 105 ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) and Affirmative Defenses, and CROSSCLAIM against All Defendants by CAMERON INTERNATIONAL CORPORATION. (Koch, Nicholas)
October 21, 2019 Filing 104 Disclosure Statement identifying None as corporate parent or other affiliate, by GENUINE PARTS COMPANY. (Arriaga, Alba)
October 21, 2019 Filing 103 LOCAL RULE 7.1 CERTIFICATE by CAMERON INTERNATIONAL CORPORATION . (Koch, Nicholas)
October 21, 2019 Filing 102 NOTICE of Appearance. (Hewitt, Patrick)
October 21, 2019 Filing 101 NOTICE of Appearance by Nicholas J. Koch on behalf of CAMERON INTERNATIONAL CORPORATION. (Koch, Nicholas)
October 21, 2019 Filing 100 NOTICE of Appearance. (Arriaga, Alba)
October 21, 2019 Filing 99 ANSWER to Complaint Affirmative Defenses and, CROSSCLAIM against All Defendants by EVOQUA WATER TECHNOLOGIES, LLC. (Warhola, Adam)
October 21, 2019 Filing 98 NOTICE of Appearance by Adam J. Warhola on behalf of EVOQUA WATER TECHNOLOGIES, LLC. (Warhola, Adam)
October 21, 2019 Filing 97 ANSWER to Complaint Affirmative Defenses and, CROSSCLAIM against All Defendants by AIRTEK, INC.. (Polley, Richard)
October 21, 2019 Filing 96 NOTICE of Appearance by Richard C. Polley on behalf of AIRTEK, INC.. (Polley, Richard)
October 21, 2019 Filing 95 Disclosure Statement identifying John Wood Group, plc (Scotland) as corporate parent or other affiliate, by FOSTER WHEELER, LLC. (Wolford, Dennis)
October 21, 2019 Filing 94 ANSWER to Complaint Affirmative Defenses and, CROSSCLAIM against All Defendants by CHICAGO BRIDGE & IRON COMPANY. (Neft, Bryan)
October 21, 2019 Filing 93 ANSWER to Complaint Affirmative Defeses and, CROSSCLAIM against All Defendants by GENERAL ELECTRIC COMPANY. (Neft, Bryan)
October 21, 2019 Filing 92 Disclosure Statement identifying None as corporate parent or other affiliate, by NAGLE PUMPS, INC.. (Polley, Richard)
October 21, 2019 Filing 91 NOTICE of Appearance by Jeanne Welch Sopher on behalf of UNITED CONVEYOR CORPORATION. (Sopher, Jeanne)
October 21, 2019 Filing 90 ANSWER to Complaint Affirmative Defenses and, CROSSCLAIM against All Defendants by NAGLE PUMPS, INC.. (Polley, Richard)
October 21, 2019 Filing 89 NOTICE of Appearance by Richard C. Polley on behalf of NAGLE PUMPS, INC.. (Polley, Richard)
October 21, 2019 Filing 88 Disclosure Statement identifying None as corporate parent or other affiliate, by BLUE M CORPORATION. (Schaper, Joseph)
October 21, 2019 Filing 87 ANSWER to Complaint , Affirmative Defenses, CROSSCLAIM and Reply to Cross-Claims against All Defendants by BLUE M CORPORATION. (Schaper, Joseph)
October 21, 2019 Filing 86 Disclosure Statement identifying None as corporate parent or other affiliate, by ARMSTRONG INTERNATIONAL, INC.. (Polley, Richard)
October 21, 2019 Filing 85 ANSWER to Complaint Affirmative Defenses and, CROSSCLAIM against All Defendants by ARMSTRONG INTERNATIONAL, INC.. (Polley, Richard)
October 21, 2019 Filing 84 Disclosure Statement identifying Greene Tweed of Delaware,LLC as corporate parent or other affiliate, by GREENE TWEED & COMPANY, INC.. (Wolford, Dennis)
October 21, 2019 Filing 83 NOTICE of Appearance by Richard C. Polley on behalf of ARMSTRONG INTERNATIONAL, INC.. (Polley, Richard)
October 21, 2019 Filing 82 NOTICE of Appearance by Dennis F. Wolford on behalf of FOSTER WHEELER, LLC. (Wolford, Dennis)
October 21, 2019 Filing 81 NOTICE of Appearance by Dennis F. Wolford on behalf of GREENE TWEED & COMPANY, INC.. (Wolford, Dennis)
October 21, 2019 Filing 80 Disclosure Statement identifying Lehman Brothers Holdings Inc. as corporate parent or other affiliate, by INDUSTRIAL HOLDINGS CORPORATION. (Schaper, Joseph)
October 21, 2019 Filing 79 ANSWER to Complaint , Affirmative Defenses, CROSSCLAIM and Reply to Cross-Claims against All Defendants by INDUSTRIAL HOLDINGS CORPORATION. (Schaper, Joseph)
October 21, 2019 Filing 78 NOTICE of Appearance by Donald H. Smith on behalf of HONEYWELL, INC.. (Smith, Donald)
October 21, 2019 Filing 77 Disclosure Statement identifying None as corporate parent or other affiliate, by AJAX MAGNETHERMIC CORPORATION. (Witte, William)
October 21, 2019 Filing 76 NOTICE of Appearance by William J. Witte on behalf of AJAX MAGNETHERMIC CORPORATION. (Witte, William)
October 21, 2019 Filing 75 Disclosure Statement identifying None as corporate parent or other affiliate, by LINDBERG. (Schaper, Joseph)
October 21, 2019 Filing 74 Disclosure Statement identifying None as corporate parent or other affiliate, by YUBA HEAT TRANSFER, LLC. (Cerrone, Shannan)
October 21, 2019 Filing 73 ANSWER to Complaint , Affirmative Defenses, CROSSCLAIM and Reply to Cross-Claims against All Defendants by LINDBERG. (Schaper, Joseph)
October 21, 2019 Filing 72 Disclosure Statement identifying None as corporate parent or other affiliate, by DEZURIK, INC.. (Schaper, Joseph)
October 21, 2019 Filing 71 ANSWER to Complaint Affirmative Defenses, and, CROSSCLAIM against All Defendants by YUBA HEAT TRANSFER, LLC. (Cerrone, Shannan)
October 21, 2019 Filing 70 ANSWER to Complaint , Affirmative Defenses, CROSSCLAIM and Reply to Cross-Claims against All Defendants by DEZURIK, INC.. (Schaper, Joseph)
October 21, 2019 Filing 69 NOTICE of Appearance by Edward A. Smallwood on behalf of WHEELING RUBBER PRODUCTS, INC.. (Smallwood, Edward)
October 21, 2019 Filing 68 NOTICE of Appearance by Edward A. Smallwood on behalf of THE WILLIAM POWELL COMPANY. (Smallwood, Edward)
October 21, 2019 Filing 67 NOTICE of Appearance by Shannan Cerrone on behalf of YUBA HEAT TRANSFER, LLC. (Cerrone, Shannan)
October 21, 2019 Filing 66 NOTICE of Appearance by Edward A. Smallwood on behalf of THE NASH ENGINEERING COMPANY. (Smallwood, Edward)
October 21, 2019 Filing 65 NOTICE of Appearance by Edward A. Smallwood on behalf of REUNION INDUSTRIES, INC.. (Smallwood, Edward)
October 21, 2019 Filing 64 Disclosure Statement identifying None as corporate parent or other affiliate, by AURORA PUMP. (Schaper, Joseph)
October 21, 2019 Filing 63 Disclosure Statement identifying Fives North American Combustion as corporate parent or other affiliate, by NORTH AMERICAN MANUFACTURING CO.. (Cerrone, Shannan)
October 21, 2019 Filing 62 NOTICE of Appearance by Edward A. Smallwood on behalf of AMERON INTERNATIONAL CORPORATION. (Smallwood, Edward)
October 21, 2019 Filing 61 ANSWER to Complaint Affirmative Defenses, CROSSCLAIM and Reply to Cross-Claims against All Defendants by AURORA PUMP. (Schaper, Joseph)
October 21, 2019 Filing 60 ANSWER to Complaint Affirmative Defenses and, CROSSCLAIM against All Defendants by NORTH AMERICAN MANUFACTURING CO.. (Cerrone, Shannan)
October 21, 2019 Filing 59 NOTICE of Appearance by Shannan Cerrone on behalf of NORTH AMERICAN MANUFACTURING CO.. (Cerrone, Shannan)
October 21, 2019 Filing 58 Disclosure Statement identifying State Street Corporation as corporate parent or other affiliate, by LOCKHEED MARTIN CORPORATION. (Polley, Richard)
October 21, 2019 Filing 57 Disclosure Statement identifying Spirax-Sarco Engineering, plc as corporate parent or other affiliate, by SPIRAX SARCO, INC.. (Busatto, Max)
October 21, 2019 Filing 56 Disclosure Statement identifying AB Electrolux as corporate parent or other affiliate, by ELECTROLUX HOME PRODUCTS INC.. (Busatto, Max)
October 21, 2019 Filing 55 ANSWER to Complaint Affirmative Defenses and, CROSSCLAIM against All Defendants by LOCKHEED MARTIN CORPORATION. (Polley, Richard)
October 21, 2019 Filing 54 Disclosure Statement identifying None as corporate parent or other affiliate, by CLARK RELIANCE CORPORATION. (Busatto, Max)
October 21, 2019 Filing 53 ANSWER to Complaint Affirmative Defenses, and CROSSCLAIM against All Defendants by CLARK RELIANCE CORPORATION. (Busatto, Max)
October 21, 2019 Filing 52 ANSWER to Complaint Affirmative Defenses, and CROSSCLAIM against All Defendants by ELECTROLUX HOME PRODUCTS INC.. (Busatto, Max)
October 21, 2019 Filing 51 ANSWER to Complaint Affirmative Defenses, and CROSSCLAIM against All Defendants by SPIRAX SARCO, INC.. (Busatto, Max)
October 21, 2019 Filing 50 NOTICE of Appearance by Richard C. Polley on behalf of LOCKHEED MARTIN CORPORATION. (Polley, Richard)
October 21, 2019 Filing 49 NOTICE of Appearance by Max T. Busatto on behalf of SPIRAX SARCO, INC.. (Busatto, Max)
October 21, 2019 Filing 48 NOTICE of Appearance by Max T. Busatto on behalf of CLARK RELIANCE CORPORATION. (Busatto, Max)
October 21, 2019 Filing 47 NOTICE of Appearance by Max T. Busatto on behalf of ELECTROLUX HOME PRODUCTS INC.. (Busatto, Max)
October 21, 2019 Filing 46 ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) and Affirmative Defenses, Answer to Co-Defendants' Crossclaims, CROSSCLAIM against All Defendants by MINE SAFETY APPLIANCE COMPANY. (Butcher, Joseph)
October 21, 2019 Filing 45 ANSWER to Complaint , CROSSCLAIM and Answer to Crossclaims against All Defendants by UNITED STATES STEEL CORPORATION. (Clements, Scott)
October 21, 2019 Filing 44 Disclosure Statement identifying MetLife Ins. as corporate parent or other affiliate, by METROPOLITAN LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY. (Daugherty, Ronald)
October 21, 2019 Filing 43 ANSWER to Complaint by METROPOLITAN LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY. (Daugherty, Ronald)
October 21, 2019 Filing 42 NOTICE of Appearance by Ronald L. Daugherty on behalf of METROPOLITAN LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY. (Daugherty, Ronald)
October 21, 2019 Filing 41 Disclosure Statement identifying Veolia Environnement S.A. as corporate parent or other affiliate, by RESEARCH-COTTRELL, INC.. (Orszulak, Joseph)
October 21, 2019 Filing 40 NOTICE of Appearance by Joseph L. Orszulak, II on behalf of RESEARCH-COTTRELL, INC.. (Orszulak, Joseph)
October 21, 2019 Filing 39 ANSWER to Complaint , CROSSCLAIM against All Defendants by KADANT, INC.. (Reinhart, Laura)
October 21, 2019 Filing 38 Disclosure Statement identifying Ingersoll-Rand Plc as corporate parent or other affiliate, by TRANE U.S. INC.. (Smith, Kelly)
October 21, 2019 Filing 37 Disclosure Statement identifying none as corporate parent or other affiliate, by KADANT, INC.. (Reinhart, Laura)
October 21, 2019 Filing 36 Disclosure Statement identifying Ingersoll-Rand Plc as corporate parent or other affiliate, by INGERSOLL-RAND CORPORATION. (Smith, Kelly)
October 21, 2019 Filing 35 Disclosure Statement identifying None as corporate parent or other affiliate, by HUNTER SALES CORPORATION. (Smith, Kelly)
October 21, 2019 Filing 34 NOTICE of Appearance by Michael J. Sechler on behalf of TRANE U.S. INC.. (Sechler, Michael)
October 21, 2019 Filing 33 NOTICE of Appearance by Michael J. Sechler on behalf of INGERSOLL-RAND CORPORATION. (Sechler, Michael)
October 21, 2019 Filing 32 NOTICE of Appearance by Kelly L Smith on behalf of TRANE U.S. INC.. (Smith, Kelly)
October 21, 2019 Filing 31 NOTICE of Appearance by Kelly L Smith on behalf of INGERSOLL-RAND CORPORATION. (Smith, Kelly)
October 21, 2019 Filing 30 NOTICE of Appearance by Kelly L Smith on behalf of HUNTER SALES CORPORATION. (Smith, Kelly)
October 21, 2019 Filing 29 NOTICE of Appearance by Edward A. Smallwood on behalf of TRANE U.S. INC.. (Smallwood, Edward)
October 21, 2019 Filing 28 NOTICE of Appearance by Edward A. Smallwood on behalf of INGERSOLL-RAND CORPORATION. (Smallwood, Edward)
October 21, 2019 Filing 27 NOTICE of Appearance by Edward A. Smallwood on behalf of HUNTER SALES CORPORATION. (Smallwood, Edward)
October 18, 2019 Filing 26 CBS Corporation's ANSWER to Complaint Affirmative Defenses and, CROSSCLAIM s against All Defendants by CBS CORPORATION. (Sinclair, Daniel)
October 18, 2019 Filing 25 LOCAL RULE 7.1 CERTIFICATE by BECHTEL CORPORATION . (Viola, Alison )
October 18, 2019 Filing 24 Defendant Bechtel Corporation's ANSWER to Complaint Affirmative Defenses, and CROSSCLAIM s against All Defendants by BECHTEL CORPORATION. (Viola, Alison )
October 18, 2019 Filing 23 Disclosure Statement identifying McDermott International, Inc. as corporate parent or other affiliate, by CHICAGO BRIDGE & IRON COMPANY. (Neft, Bryan)
October 18, 2019 Filing 22 NOTICE of Appearance by Bryan S. Neft on behalf of CHICAGO BRIDGE & IRON COMPANY. (Neft, Bryan)
October 18, 2019 Filing 21 NOTICE of Appearance by Charles J. McLeigh on behalf of CARL E. GAY. (McLeigh, Charles)
October 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER DENYING #8 Motion to Adopt Certain Provisions of Pa. R.C.P. 1041.1 in the Management of this Action. Signed by Judge William S. Stickman on 10/18/19. (eca)
October 18, 2019 Filing 19 NOTICE of Appearance by Hunter A. McGeary, Jr on behalf of BORGWARNER MORSE TEC LLC. (McGeary, Hunter)
October 18, 2019 Filing 18 NOTICE of Appearance by Mark A. Fiorilli on behalf of BEAZER EAST, INC. (Fiorilli, Mark)
October 18, 2019 Filing 17 Disclosure Statement identifying HBMA Holdings, LLC, HeidelbergCement AG as corporate parent or other affiliate, by BEAZER EAST, INC. (Leight, Robert)
October 18, 2019 Filing 16 NOTICE of Appearance by Robert R. Leight on behalf of BEAZER EAST, INC. (Leight, Robert)
October 18, 2019 Filing 15 Disclosure Statement identifying None as corporate parent or other affiliate, by GENERAL ELECTRIC COMPANY. (Neft, Bryan)
October 18, 2019 Filing 14 NOTICE of Appearance by Patrick R. Malone on behalf of SURFACE COMBUSTION, INC.. (Malone, Patrick)
October 18, 2019 Filing 13 Disclosure Statement identifying MSA Safety Incorporated as corporate parent or other affiliate, by MINE SAFETY APPLIANCE COMPANY. (Butcher, Joseph)
October 18, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by Joseph F. Butcher on behalf of MINE SAFETY APPLIANCE COMPANY. (Butcher, Joseph)
October 17, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by J. Lawson Johnston on behalf of UNITED STATES STEEL CORPORATION. (Johnston, J.)
October 17, 2019 Filing 10 Disclosure Statement identifying None as corporate parent or other affiliate, by UNITED STATES STEEL CORPORATION. (Clements, Scott)
October 17, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Scott D. Clements on behalf of UNITED STATES STEEL CORPORATION. (Clements, Scott)
October 17, 2019 Filing 8 MOTION to Adopt Certain Provisions of Pa. R.C.P. 1041.1 in the Management of this Action by GENERAL ELECTRIC COMPANY. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Exhibit) (Neft, Bryan)
October 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER GRANTING #3 Motion for Leave to Depose Plaintiff. Signed by Judge William S. Stickman on 10/16/19. (eca)
October 16, 2019 Filing 3 MOTION for Leave to Depose Plaintiff by CARL E. GAY. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Proposed Order) (Shipp, Jason)
October 16, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Jason T. Shipp on behalf of CARL E. GAY. (Shipp, Jason)
October 15, 2019 Filing 7 JOINDER of GENERAL DYNAMICS CORPORATION to #1 Notice of Removal. (jjg)
October 15, 2019 Filing 6 JOINDER of ELECTRIC BOAT CORPORATION to #1 Notice of Removal. (jjg)
October 15, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by James B. Insco on behalf of ELECTRIC BOAT CORPORATION. (jjg)
October 11, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Allegheny County Court of Common Pleas, case number GD 19-012689 with Jury Demand. (Filing fee, including Administrative fee, $400, receipt number 0315-5318529). (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit A2, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit B2, #5 Exhibit B3, #6 Exhibit B4, #7 Exhibit B5, #8 Exhibit B6, #9 Exhibit B7, #10 Exhibit B8, #11 Exhibit B9, #12 Exhibit B10, #13 Exhibit B11, #14 Exhibit B12, #15 Exhibit B13, #16 Exhibit C, #17 Exhibit D, #18 Exhibit D2, #19 Exhibit E, #20 Exhibit F, #21 Exhibit G, #22 Exhibit H, #23 Exhibit I, #24 Exhibit J, #25 Civil Cover Sheet) (jjg)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: GAY v. A.O. SMITH CORPORATION et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: POWERMASTER PACIFIC PRODUCTS
Represented By: Julie Nord Friedman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ZURN INDUSTRIES
Represented By: Edward A. Miller
Represented By: Melissa Devich Cochran
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FLUOR CONSTRUCTORS INTERNATIONAL
Represented By: Joseph R. Petrina
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MW CUSTOM PAPERS, LLC
Represented By: Ryan M. Krescanko
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NORTH AMERICAN MANUFACTURING CO.
Represented By: Shannan Cerrone
Represented By: Richard C. Polley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BRAND INSULATIONS, INC.
Represented By: Michael Magee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: INGERSOLL-RAND CORPORATION
Represented By: Edward A. Smallwood
Represented By: Michael J. Sechler
Represented By: Kelly L Smith
Represented By: Leo G. Daly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WATTS REGULATOR CO.
Represented By: James B. Insco
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GENUINE PARTS COMPANY
Represented By: Patrick A. Hewitt
Represented By: Alba E Arriaga
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RILEY POWER, INC.
Represented By: Julie Nord Friedman
Represented By: Eric K. Falk
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RCH NEW CO., II LLC
Represented By: Jennifer E. Watson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HONEYWELL, INC.
Represented By: Trisha R. Hudkins
Represented By: Mark T. Caloyer
Represented By: Eric W. Santos
Represented By: Donald H. Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AHLSTROM PUMPS LLC
Represented By: Jenna C. Hutchinson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BMI REFRACTORY SERVICES, INC.
Represented By: Concetta A. Silvaggio
Represented By: Ronald J. Richert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MET-PRO TECHNOLOGIES, LLC
Represented By: John C. McMeekin, II
Represented By: Edward J. Chiodo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AMETEK, INC.
Represented By: Paul K. Vey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LONG ISLAND POWER AUTHORITY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOHN CRANE, INC.
Represented By: Edward A. Schenck
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CARVER PUMP COMPANY
Represented By: Katherine A. Lowery
Represented By: James M. Leety
Represented By: Christopher S. Arnold
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GRINNELL, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RESEARCH-COTTRELL, INC.
Represented By: Joseph L. Orszulak, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MANCHESTER TANK
Represented By: Patrick Reilly
Represented By: Erin Margolin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TRANE U.S. INC.
Represented By: Edward A. Smallwood
Represented By: Michael J. Sechler
Represented By: Kelly L Smith
Represented By: Leo G. Daly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: EDF, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MILWAUKEE VALVE COMPANY
Represented By: Jennifer E. Watson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MINNOTTE CONTRACTING CORPORATION
Represented By: Christopher T. Yoskosky
Represented By: Gregory C Scheuring
Represented By: Joni M. Mangino
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: VIKING PUMP, INC.
Represented By: Jennifer E. Watson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ABB, INC.
Represented By: Concetta A. Silvaggio
Represented By: Ronald J. Richert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GENERAL DYNAMICS CORPORATION
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: THE GOODYEAR TIRE & RUBBER COMPANY
Represented By: John C. McMeekin, II
Represented By: Julie Nord Friedman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WHEELABRATOR AIR POLLUTION CONTROL, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SUNBEAM PRODUCTS, INC.
Represented By: Ryan M. Krescanko
Represented By: Michael A. Karaffa
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GOULD ELECTRONICS, INC.
Represented By: Christopher H. Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: THE MARLEY-WYLAIN COMPANY
Represented By: Christopher H. Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: YUBA HEAT TRANSFER, LLC
Represented By: Shannan Cerrone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CRANE COMPANY, INC.
Represented By: Stephen R. Mlinac
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CARRIER CORPORATION
Represented By: Edward A. Miller
Represented By: Melissa Devich Cochran
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: EVOQUA WATER TECHNOLOGIES, LLC
Represented By: Adam J. Warhola
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NEXTERA ENERGY, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOHNSON CONTROLS, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: METROPOLITAN LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY
Represented By: Stewart R. Singer
Represented By: Ronald L. Daugherty
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: EXELON CORPORATION
Represented By: Jennifer E. Watson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: OSRAM SYLVANIA INC.
Represented By: Vincent P. Lamperski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: READING CRANE AND ENGINEERING COMPANY
Represented By: David F. Ryan
Represented By: Christian W. Wrabley
Represented By: Joni M. Mangino
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UNION TANK CAR COMPANY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: EICHLEAY CORPORATION
Represented By: Mallory P. Gold
Represented By: Daniel E. Krauth
Represented By: Samantha Quinn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AURORA PUMP
Represented By: Joseph R. Schaper
Represented By: James P. Hadden
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WHEELING RUBBER PRODUCTS, INC.
Represented By: Edward A. Smallwood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CHICAGO PNEUMATIC TOOL COMPANY, LLC
Represented By: Joni M. Mangino
Represented By: Ryan Anthony Zeli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FLUOR CORPORATION
Represented By: Joseph R. Petrina
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: THE WILLIAM POWELL COMPANY
Represented By: Edward A. Smallwood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FOSTER WHEELER, LLC
Represented By: Kathryn L. Johnston
Represented By: Dennis F. Wolford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UNITED STATES STEEL CORPORATION
Represented By: Scott D. Clements
Represented By: J. Lawson Johnston
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LINDBERG
Represented By: Joseph R. Schaper
Represented By: James P. Hadden
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BEAZER EAST, INC
Represented By: Mark A. Fiorilli
Represented By: Robert R. Leight
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: THE NASH ENGINEERING COMPANY
Represented By: Edward A. Smallwood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SULZER PUMPS (US), INC.
Represented By: Jenna C. Hutchinson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HUNTER SALES CORPORATION
Represented By: Edward A. Smallwood
Represented By: Kelly L Smith
Represented By: Steven D. Evans
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: KADANT, INC.
Represented By: Laura L. Reinhart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOY GLOBAL SURFACE MINING, INC.
Represented By: Paul K. Vey
Represented By: David E. Lamm
Represented By: David Emil Lamm
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AIRTEK, INC.
Represented By: Richard C. Polley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: IMO INDUSTRIES, INC
Represented By: Julie Nord Friedman
Represented By: Eric K. Falk
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FMC CORPORATION
Represented By: W. Matthew Reber
Represented By: Katherine A. Lowery
Represented By: Eric A. Fischer
Represented By: James M. Leety
Represented By: Christopher S. Arnold
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HAJOCA CORPORATION
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DONALD MCKAY SMITH, INC.
Represented By: Christopher T. Yoskosky
Represented By: Gregory C Scheuring
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MCJUNKIN REDMAN CORPORATION
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AMERON INTERNATIONAL CORPORATION
Represented By: Edward A. Smallwood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GOULDS PUMPS, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CBS CORPORATION
Represented By: Daniel J. Sinclair
Represented By: Eric L. Horne
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GREENE TWEED & COMPANY, INC.
Represented By: Kathryn L. Johnston
Represented By: Dennis F. Wolford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ELLIOTT COMPANY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UNITED CONVEYOR CORPORATION
Represented By: Jeanne Welch Sopher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AIR & LIQUID SYSTEMS CORPORATION
Represented By: Jennifer E. Watson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SCHNEIDER ELECTRIC USA, INC.
Represented By: Michael J. Zukowski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SAINT-GOBAIN ABRASIVES, INC.
Represented By: Jennifer E. Watson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NAGLE PUMPS, INC.
Represented By: Adam J. Warhola
Represented By: Richard C. Polley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ARMSTRONG INTERNATIONAL, INC.
Represented By: Shannan Cerrone
Represented By: Richard C. Polley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BAKER HUGHES
Represented By: Philip P. Keating
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FLSMIDTH, INC.
Represented By: Ryan M. Krescanko
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CLARK RELIANCE CORPORATION
Represented By: Max T. Busatto
Represented By: Vincent Scaglione, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HOWDEN NORTH AMERICA, INC.
Represented By: Sandra L. Alven
Represented By: Alba E Arriaga
Represented By: Anne M. McFadden
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FLUOR ENTERPRISES, INC.
Represented By: Joseph R. Petrina
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MUELLER STEAM SPECIALTY
Represented By: Vincent P. Lamperski
Represented By: Andrew F. Adomitis
Represented By: Leo G. Daly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MEAD
Represented By: Ryan M. Krescanko
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WT/HRC CORPORATION
Represented By: Concetta A. Silvaggio
Represented By: Ronald J. Richert
Represented By: Glenn A. Huetter, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ECODYNE HEAT EXCHANGERS, INC.
Represented By: Patrick Reilly
Represented By: Erin Margolin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CAMERON INTERNATIONAL CORPORATION
Represented By: Nicholas J. Koch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ELECTROLUX HOME PRODUCTS INC.
Represented By: Max T. Busatto
Represented By: Vincent Scaglione, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WASHINGTON GROUP INTERNATIONAL
Represented By: Kyle T. McGee
Represented By: Richard E. Bliss
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FLOWSERVE CORPORATION
Represented By: Edward A. Miller
Represented By: Melissa Devich Cochran
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MINE SAFETY APPLIANCE COMPANY
Represented By: Joseph F. Butcher
Represented By: Gregory C Scheuring
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SPX COOLING TECHNOLOGIES, INC.
Represented By: Matthew R. Wimer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DUQUESNE LIGHT COMPANY
Represented By: Cathy R. Gordon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AJAX MAGNETHERMIC CORPORATION
Represented By: William J. Witte
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MCCARLS, INC.
Represented By: Jennifer E. Watson
Represented By: John M. Schollaert
Represented By: Daniel R. Bentz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CLEAVER-BROOKS
Represented By: Vincent P. Lamperski
Represented By: Andrew F. Adomitis
Represented By: Leo G. Daly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CERTAINTEED CORPORATION
Represented By: Jennifer E. Watson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MCMASTER-CARR SUPPLY CO.
Represented By: Concetta A. Silvaggio
Represented By: Ronald J. Richert
Represented By: Glenn A. Huetter, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WARREN PUMPS, LLC
Represented By: Ryan M. Krescanko
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BLUE M CORPORATION
Represented By: Joseph R. Schaper
Represented By: James P. Hadden
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PARKER-HANIFIN CORPORATION
Represented By: Julie Nord Friedman
Represented By: Eric K. Falk
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOY GLOBAL UNDERGROUND MINING, LLC
Represented By: Edward A. Miller
Represented By: Melissa Devich Cochran
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GOULD ELECTRONICS INC.
Represented By: Christopher H. Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FIRSTENERGY CORPORATION
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: EXELON GENERATION COMPANY, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BW/IP, INC.
Represented By: John A. Turlik
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CASHCO INC.
Represented By: Erin Margolin
Represented By: Michael A. Karaffa
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FLOWSERVE US, INC.
Represented By: Christine M. Crimarki
Represented By: John A. Turlik
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MOYNO, INC.
Represented By: Concetta A. Silvaggio
Represented By: Ronald J. Richert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CEMLINE CORPORATION
Represented By: Margolis Edelstein
Represented By: Kyle T. McGee
Represented By: Richard E. Bliss
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WTI RUST HOLDINGS, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: YORK INTERNATIONAL CORPORATION
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HONEYWELL INTERNATIONAL INC.
Represented By: Julie Nord Friedman
Represented By: Eric K. Falk
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BECHTEL CORPORATION
Represented By: Alison R. Viola
Represented By: Daniel J. Sinclair
Represented By: Dennis R. McEwen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RUST ENGINEERING & CONSTRUCTION, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ELECTRIC BOAT CORPORATION
Represented By: James B. Insco
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CLARK EQUIPMENT COMPANY
Represented By: Erin Margolin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FLSMIDTH DORR-OLIVER, INC.
Represented By: Joseph R. Schaper
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: VELAN VALVE CORPORATION
Represented By: Joseph R. Schaper
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: COLUMBUS MCKINNON CORP.
Represented By: Kevin M. Ward
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: EATON CORPORATION
Represented By: Patrick Reilly
Represented By: Erin Margolin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AECOM ENERGY & CONSTRUCTION, INC.
Represented By: Jennifer E. Watson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DRAVO CORPORATION
Represented By: John W. Bruni
Represented By: Hilary C. Bonenberger
Represented By: Michael J. Sechler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: I.U. NORTH AMERICA, INC.
Represented By: Jennifer E. Watson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: OCEAN VIEW CAPITAL
Represented By: Vincent P. Lamperski
Represented By: Andrew F. Adomitis
Represented By: Leo G. Daly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SUNDYNE, LLC
Represented By: Concetta A. Silvaggio
Represented By: Ronald J. Richert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LOCKHEED MARTIN CORPORATION
Represented By: Richard C. Polley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ALLIED GLOVE CORPORATION
Represented By: Concetta A. Silvaggio
Represented By: Ronald J. Richert
Represented By: Glenn A. Huetter, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: STERLING FLUID SYSTEMS (USA), LLC
Represented By: W. Matthew Reber
Represented By: Katherine A. Lowery
Represented By: Christopher S. Arnold
Represented By: Matthew J. Doz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CLYDE UNION, INC.
Represented By: Vincent P. Lamperski
Represented By: Andrew F. Adomitis
Represented By: Leo G. Daly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SIEMENS INDUSTRY INC
Represented By: James B. Insco
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: POWER PIPING COMPANY
Represented By: Concetta A. Silvaggio
Represented By: Ronald J. Richert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: A.O. SMITH CORPORATION
Represented By: Andrew F. Adomitis
Represented By: Leo G. Daly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: EXELON NUCLEAR PARTNERS, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GENERAL ELECTRIC COMPANY
Represented By: Kate Mercer-Lawson
Represented By: Bryan S. Neft
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DEZURIK, INC.
Represented By: Joseph R. Schaper
Represented By: James P. Hadden
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ARMSTRONG PUMPS, INC.
Represented By: Adam J. Warhola
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CHICAGO BRIDGE & IRON COMPANY
Represented By: Bryan S. Neft
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MORGAN ENGINEERING SYSTEMS, INC.
Represented By: Joni M. Mangino
Represented By: Ryan Anthony Zeli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: A.R. WILFLEY & SONS, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: INSUL COMPANY, INC.
Represented By: Joni M. Mangino
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: INDUSTRIAL HOLDINGS CORPORATION
Represented By: Joseph R. Schaper
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MCNEIL (OHIO) CORPORATION
Represented By: Concetta A. Silvaggio
Represented By: Ronald J. Richert
Represented By: Glenn A. Huetter, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: REUNION INDUSTRIES, INC.
Represented By: Edward A. Smallwood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SURFACE COMBUSTION, INC.
Represented By: Patrick R. Malone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WATSON MCDANIEL COMPANY
Represented By: Richard E. Bliss
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J-M MANUFACTURING COMPANY, INC.
Represented By: Sarah Boehme
Represented By: John M. Schollaert
Represented By: Daniel R. Bentz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FOSECO, INC.
Represented By: Terry A. Schrock
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ALFA LAVAL, INC.
Represented By: Katherine A. Lowery
Represented By: James M. Leety
Represented By: Christopher S. Arnold
Represented By: Matthew J. Doz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SPIRAX SARCO, INC.
Represented By: Max T. Busatto
Represented By: Vincent Scaglione, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UNION CARBIDE CORPORATION
Represented By: Richard L. Walker
Represented By: Katherine A. Lowery
Represented By: Eric A. Fischer
Represented By: James M. Leety
Represented By: Christopher S. Arnold
Represented By: Matthew J. Doz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NORTEK GLOBAL HVAC, LLC
Represented By: John A. Turlik
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TUTHILL CORPORATION
Represented By: John C. McMeekin, II
Represented By: Edward J. Chiodo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ERIE CITY IRON WORKS
Represented By: Edward A. Miller
Represented By: Melissa Devich Cochran
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MARMON HOLDINGS, INC.
Represented By: Patrick Reilly
Represented By: Erin Margolin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BROWN BOVERI, INC.
Represented By: Glenn A. Huetter, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SIEMENS INDUSTRY, INC.
Represented By: James B. Insco
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FLORIDA POWER & LIGHT COMPANY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: M.S. JACOBS & ASSOCIATES, INC.
Represented By: Joni M. Mangino
Represented By: Daniel J. Cuddy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GARDNER DENVER, INC.
Represented By: Edward A. Miller
Represented By: Melissa Devich Cochran
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BORGWARNER MORSE TEC LLC
Represented By: Hunter A. McGeary, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ITT INDUSTRIES, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ATWOOD & MORRILL CO., INC.
Represented By: Daniel E. Krauth
Represented By: Samantha Quinn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PACIFIC PARTS
Represented By: Julie Nord Friedman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CARL E. GAY
Represented By: Jason T. Shipp
Represented By: Leif J. Ocheltree
Represented By: Charles J. McLeigh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?