BACHNER v. AECOM C&E, INC. et al
Plaintiff: KERRI ANN BACHNER
Defendant: AECOM CONSULT, INC., AECOM FIELD SERVICES, LLC, ABC CORPORATIONS (1-10), AECOM SPECIAL MISSIONS SERVICS, INC., AECOM SERVICES OF PA, INC., AECOM INFRASTRUCTURE, INC., URS CORPORATION, AECOM GOVERNMENT SERVICES, INC., AECOM POWER E&C, INC., AECOM SERVICES, INC., AECOM N&E TECHNICAL SERVICES, LLC, URS CORPORATION SERVICES, AECOM USA, INC., AECOM C&E, INC., AECOM MANAGEMENT SERVICES, INC., AECOM TECHNICAL SERVICES, INC. and AECOM ENERGY & CONSTRUCTION, INC.
Case Number: 2:2019cv01324
Filed: October 15, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: David S Cercone
Referring Judge: Marilyn J Horan
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 2, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 2, 2019 Filing 10 CORRECTIVE ENTRY re #9 Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer. (jgb)
December 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER granting #8 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Defendants shall have an extension up to and including 1/15/2020 to respond to Plaintiff's Complaint. Signed by Judge Marilyn J. Horan on 11/29/2019. (jgb). Document removed from public view 12/2/2019, wrong date on order. (jgb)
November 27, 2019 Filing 8 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer AECOM C&E, INC., AECOM CONSULT, INC., AECOM ENERGY & CONSTRUCTION, INC., AECOM FIELD SERVICES, LLC, AECOM GOVERNMENT SERVICES, INC., AECOM INFRASTRUCTURE, INC., AECOM MANAGEMENT SERVICES, INC., AECOM N&E TECHNICAL SERVICES, LLC, AECOM POWER E&C, INC., AECOM SERVICES OF PA, INC., AECOM SERVICES, INC., AECOM SPECIAL MISSIONS SERVICS, INC., AECOM TECHNICAL SERVICES, INC., AECOM USA, INC., URS CORPORATION, URS CORPORATION SERVICES.(Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Coles, Amy) Modified text on 11/29/2019. (cjo)
November 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 STANDING ORDER AND PROCEDURES ON CIVIL MOTION PRACTICE. Signed by Judge Marilyn J. Horan on 11/1/2019. (jgb)
October 30, 2019 Judge Marilyn J. Horan added. (mao)
October 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Judge David S. Cercone no longer assigned to case. Signed by Judge David S. Cercone on 10/23/2019. (kly) (Main Document 6 replaced on 10/23/2019) (kly)
October 22, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Ricky M Guerra on behalf of AECOM C&E, INC., AECOM CONSULT, INC., AECOM ENERGY & CONSTRUCTION, INC., AECOM FIELD SERVICES, LLC, AECOM GOVERNMENT SERVICES, INC., AECOM INFRASTRUCTURE, INC., AECOM MANAGEMENT SERVICES, INC., AECOM N&E TECHNICAL SERVICES, LLC, AECOM POWER E&C, INC., AECOM SERVICES OF PA, INC., AECOM SERVICES, INC., AECOM SPECIAL MISSIONS SERVICS, INC., AECOM TECHNICAL SERVICES, INC., AECOM USA, INC., URS CORPORATION, URS CORPORATION SERVICES. (Guerra, Ricky)
October 22, 2019 Filing 4 Stipulation for Extension of Time to Answer by AECOM USA, INC., AECOM SERVICES, INC., AECOM POWER E&C, INC., AECOM MANAGEMENT SERVICES, INC., AECOM TECHNICAL SERVICES, INC., AECOM INFRASTRUCTURE, INC., AECOM C&E, INC., AECOM SPECIAL MISSIONS SERVICS, INC., URS CORPORATION SERVICES, AECOM FIELD SERVICES, LLC, AECOM GOVERNMENT SERVICES, INC., AECOM N&E TECHNICAL SERVICES, LLC, AECOM CONSULT, INC., URS CORPORATION, AECOM SERVICES OF PA, INC., AECOM ENERGY & CONSTRUCTION, INC. Answer due from AECOM USA, INC. on 12/6/2019; AECOM SERVICES, INC. on 12/6/2019; AECOM POWER E&C, INC. on 12/6/2019; AECOM MANAGEMENT SERVICES, INC. on 12/6/2019; AECOM TECHNICAL SERVICES, INC. on 12/6/2019; AECOM INFRASTRUCTURE, INC. on 12/6/2019; AECOM C&E, INC. on 12/6/2019; AECOM SPECIAL MISSIONS SERVICS, INC. on 12/6/2019; URS CORPORATION SERVICES on 12/6/2019; AECOM FIELD SERVICES, LLC on 12/6/2019; AECOM GOVERNMENT SERVICES, INC. on 12/6/2019; AECOM N&E TECHNICAL SERVICES, LLC on 12/6/2019; AECOM CONSULT, INC. on 12/6/2019; URS CORPORATION on 12/6/2019; AECOM SERVICES OF PA, INC. on 12/6/2019; AECOM ENERGY & CONSTRUCTION, INC. on 12/6/2019. (Coles, Amy)
October 17, 2019 Filing 3 Disclosure Statement identifying None as corporate parent or other affiliate, by AECOM C&E, INC., AECOM CONSULT, INC., AECOM ENERGY & CONSTRUCTION, INC., AECOM FIELD SERVICES, LLC, AECOM GOVERNMENT SERVICES, INC., AECOM INFRASTRUCTURE, INC., AECOM MANAGEMENT SERVICES, INC., AECOM N&E TECHNICAL SERVICES, LLC, AECOM POWER E&C, INC., AECOM SERVICES OF PA, INC., AECOM SERVICES, INC., AECOM SPECIAL MISSIONS SERVICS, INC., AECOM TECHNICAL SERVICES, INC., AECOM USA, INC., URS CORPORATION, URS CORPORATION SERVICES. (Coles, Amy)
October 17, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Kevin M. Eddy on behalf of AECOM C&E, INC., AECOM CONSULT, INC., AECOM ENERGY & CONSTRUCTION, INC., AECOM FIELD SERVICES, LLC, AECOM GOVERNMENT SERVICES, INC., AECOM INFRASTRUCTURE, INC., AECOM MANAGEMENT SERVICES, INC., AECOM N&E TECHNICAL SERVICES, LLC, AECOM POWER E&C, INC., AECOM SERVICES OF PA, INC., AECOM SERVICES, INC., AECOM SPECIAL MISSIONS SERVICS, INC., AECOM TECHNICAL SERVICES, INC., AECOM USA, INC., URS CORPORATION, URS CORPORATION SERVICES. (Eddy, Kevin)
October 15, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Court of Common Pleas of Allegheny County, case number GD 19 11908 Copies attached: Exhibit 1: State Court Complaint, Exhibits 2-9 and Civil Cover Sheet (Filing fee, including Administrative fee, $400, receipt number 0315-5321243), filed by AECOM USA, INC., AECOM SERVICES, INC., AECOM POWER E&C, INC., AECOM MANAGEMENT SERVICES, INC., AECOM TECHNICAL SERVICES, INC., AECOM INFRASTRUCTURE, INC., AECOM C&E, INC., AECOM SPECIAL MISSIONS SERVICS, INC., URS CORPORATION SERVICES, AECOM FIELD SERVICES, LLC, AECOM GOVERNMENT SERVICES, INC., AECOM N&E TECHNICAL SERVICES, LLC, AECOM CONSULT, INC., URS CORPORATION, AECOM SERVICES OF PA, INC., AECOM ENERGY & CONSTRUCTION, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1: State Court Complaint, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Civil Cover Sheet) (cjo)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: BACHNER v. AECOM C&E, INC. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AECOM CONSULT, INC.
Represented By: Kevin M. Eddy
Represented By: Amy Joseph Coles
Represented By: Ricky M Guerra
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AECOM FIELD SERVICES, LLC
Represented By: Kevin M. Eddy
Represented By: Amy Joseph Coles
Represented By: Ricky M Guerra
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ABC CORPORATIONS (1-10)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AECOM SPECIAL MISSIONS SERVICS, INC.
Represented By: Kevin M. Eddy
Represented By: Amy Joseph Coles
Represented By: Ricky M Guerra
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AECOM SERVICES OF PA, INC.
Represented By: Kevin M. Eddy
Represented By: Amy Joseph Coles
Represented By: Ricky M Guerra
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AECOM INFRASTRUCTURE, INC.
Represented By: Kevin M. Eddy
Represented By: Amy Joseph Coles
Represented By: Ricky M Guerra
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: URS CORPORATION
Represented By: Kevin M. Eddy
Represented By: Amy Joseph Coles
Represented By: Ricky M Guerra
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AECOM GOVERNMENT SERVICES, INC.
Represented By: Kevin M. Eddy
Represented By: Amy Joseph Coles
Represented By: Ricky M Guerra
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AECOM POWER E&C, INC.
Represented By: Kevin M. Eddy
Represented By: Amy Joseph Coles
Represented By: Ricky M Guerra
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AECOM SERVICES, INC.
Represented By: Kevin M. Eddy
Represented By: Amy Joseph Coles
Represented By: Ricky M Guerra
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AECOM N&E TECHNICAL SERVICES, LLC
Represented By: Kevin M. Eddy
Represented By: Amy Joseph Coles
Represented By: Ricky M Guerra
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: URS CORPORATION SERVICES
Represented By: Kevin M. Eddy
Represented By: Amy Joseph Coles
Represented By: Ricky M Guerra
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AECOM USA, INC.
Represented By: Kevin M. Eddy
Represented By: Amy Joseph Coles
Represented By: Ricky M Guerra
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AECOM C&E, INC.
Represented By: Kevin M. Eddy
Represented By: Amy Joseph Coles
Represented By: Ricky M Guerra
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AECOM MANAGEMENT SERVICES, INC.
Represented By: Kevin M. Eddy
Represented By: Amy Joseph Coles
Represented By: Ricky M Guerra
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AECOM TECHNICAL SERVICES, INC.
Represented By: Kevin M. Eddy
Represented By: Amy Joseph Coles
Represented By: Ricky M Guerra
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AECOM ENERGY & CONSTRUCTION, INC.
Represented By: Kevin M. Eddy
Represented By: Amy Joseph Coles
Represented By: Ricky M Guerra
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: KERRI ANN BACHNER
Represented By: Robert J. Mongeluzzi
Represented By: Elizabeth A. Bailey
Represented By: David L. Kwass
Represented By: Lawrence E. Gurrera, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?