HEALTHPLANCRM, LLC v. AVMED, INC. et al
Plaintiff: HEALTHPLANCRM, LLC
Defendant: NTT DATA SERVICES, LLC and AVMED, INC.
Case Number: 2:2019cv01357
Filed: October 21, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: J Nicholas Ranjan
Nature of Suit: Other Statutes: Arbitration
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 28, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 27, 2019 Filing 32 REPLY BRIEF to Response to Motion re #25 Motion to Compel Arbitration filed by HEALTHPLANCRM, LLC. (English, Kevin) Modified text on 12/2/2019 to and the word "brief" to entry. (jv)
November 27, 2019 Filing 31 DECLARATION re #25 MOTION to Compel Arbitration of Kevin J,. English, Esq. in Response to Defendants' AvMed and NTT Opposition and in further support of Plaintiff's Motion to Compel Arbitration by HEALTHPLANCRM, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A (9.20.19 Email), #2 Exhibit B (AAA 9.24.19 Decision)) (English, Kevin)
November 21, 2019 Filing 30 Errata re #28 Brief in Opposition to Motion by NTT DATA SERVICES, LLC. Reason for Correction: Attorney signature. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Weiner, Glenn)
November 21, 2019 CLERK'S OFFICE QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE re #28 Brief in Opposition to Motion. ERROR: Signature on document and filer do not match. CORRECTION: Attorney advised of signature requirements. Attorney to resubmit the document using the Errata event. This message is for informational purposes only. (jv)
November 20, 2019 Filing 29 BRIEF in Opposition re #25 Motion to Compel Arbitration filed by AVMED, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - 2019.10.22 Prelim. Hrg. and Scheduling Order) (Schwing, Christina)
November 20, 2019 Filing 28 BRIEF in Opposition re #25 Motion to Compel filed by NTT DATA SERVICES, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Willan, Paige)
November 6, 2019 Filing 27 BRIEF in Support re #25 Motion to Compel Arbitration filed by HEALTHPLANCRM, LLC. (English, Kevin)
November 6, 2019 Filing 26 DECLARATION re #25 MOTION to Compel Arbitration of Kevin J. English, Esq. in support of Motion to Compel Arbitration by HEALTHPLANCRM, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A (7.8.19 Letter), #2 Exhibit B (AvMed's Answer), #3 Exhibit C (AvMed's Obj. to Locale), #4 Exhibit D (8.13.19 AAA Letter), #5 Exhibit E (8.27.19 Letter)) (English, Kevin)
November 6, 2019 Filing 25 MOTION to Compel Arbitration by HEALTHPLANCRM, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order compelling Defendants AvMed, Inc. and NTT Data Services LLC to participate in Arbitration Proceedings) (English, Kevin)
October 31, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER regarding Arbitration. Signed by Judge J. Nicholas Ranjan on 10/31/2019. (av)
October 31, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 23 SCHEDULING ORDER. As discussed during the 10/30/19 telephonic status conference, the following briefing schedule shall apply to Plaintiff's forthcoming motion to compel arbitration: Plaintiff's motion and brief in support due 11/06/19. Brief not to exceed 20 pages. Defendants' briefs in opposition due 11/20/19. Opposition briefs not to exceed 30 pages. Plaintiff's reply brief due 11/27/19. Reply brief not to exceed 20 pages. To ensure a comprehensive resolution of the arbitration issue, counsel should raise all issues relevant to both arbitrability and this Court's authority to decide arbitrability in their briefing. All discovery proceedings and deadlines in this case, including deadlines to respond to the amended complaint, are stayed pending disposition of the forthcoming motion. Signed by Judge J. Nicholas Ranjan on 10/31/2019. Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Order of the Court or Notice on the matter. (av)
October 30, 2019 Filing 22 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge J. Nicholas Ranjan: Telephonic Status Conference held on 10/30/2019. (av)
October 30, 2019 Filing 21 First AMENDED COMPLAINT against AVMED, INC., NTT DATA SERVICES, LLC AVMED, INC. answer due 11/13/2019; NTT DATA SERVICES, LLC answer due 11/13/2019, filed by HEALTHPLANCRM, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 (License Agreement), #2 Exhibit 2 (End-User Agreement), #3 Exhibit 3 (1st Amendment to License Agreement), #4 Exhibit 4 (2nd Amendment to License Agreement), #5 Exhibit 5 (3rd Amendment to License Agreement), #6 Exhibit 6 (letter 11.26.18), #7 Exhibit 7 (AvMed Secure Login page), #8 Exhibit 8 (NTT User Login Details), #9 Exhibit 9 (Demand for Arbitration), #10 Exhibit 10 (Letter 8.7.19)) (English, Kevin)
October 30, 2019 Filing 20 NOTICE that instant civil action has been designated for placement into the United States District Court's Alternative Dispute Resolution program. Parties are directed to fully complete the required 26(f) report, which includes the stipulation of selecting an ADR process. Counsel for plaintiff (or in the case of a removal action, counsel for removing defendant) shall make service of the notice on all parties. (av)
October 30, 2019 Filing 19 Disclosure Statement identifying None as corporate parent or other affiliate, by HEALTHPLANCRM, LLC. (English, Kevin)
October 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER denying as moot #12 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice; denying as moot #13 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice; granting #16 Motion for Kevin J. English to Appear Pro Hac Vice; granting #17 Motion for Elizabeth A. Bove to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Judge J. Nicholas Ranjan on 10/30/2019. Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Order of the Court or Notice on the matter. (av)
October 29, 2019 Filing 17 MOTION for attorney Elizabeth A. Bove to Appear Pro Hac Vice, (Filing fee $70, Receipt # 0315-5339916) by HEALTHPLANCRM, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Elizabeth A. Bove, Esq. with Ex A (Certificate of Good Standing), #2 Proposed Order) (Bove, Elizabeth)
October 29, 2019 Filing 16 MOTION for attorney Kevin J. English to Appear Pro Hac Vice, (Filing fee $70, Receipt # 0315-5339804) by HEALTHPLANCRM, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Kevin J. English, Esq. with Ex. A (Certificate of Good Standing), #2 Proposed Order) (English, Kevin)
October 28, 2019 CLERK'S OFFICE QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE re #12 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, #13 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. ERROR: Incorrect filer selected. CORRECTION: Attorneys Kevin J. English #12 and Elizabeth A. Bove #13 are required to sign and file their own pro hac motions. (ma)
October 28, 2019 Filing 15 STIPULATION re #1 Notice of Removal, Joint Stipulation to Extend the Time to Respond to the Complaint by AVMED, INC. (Schwing, Christina)
October 28, 2019 Filing 14 Disclosure Statement identifying None as corporate parent or other affiliate, by AVMED, INC. (Schwing, Christina)
October 25, 2019 Filing 13 MOTION for attorney Elizabeth A. Bove to Appear Pro Hac Vice, (Filing fee $70, Receipt # 0315-5337056) by HEALTHPLANCRM, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Proposed Order) (Sakoian, Haig)
October 25, 2019 Filing 12 MOTION for attorney Kevin J. English to Appear Pro Hac Vice, (Filing fee $70, Receipt # 0315-5337048) by HEALTHPLANCRM, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Proposed Order) (Sakoian, Haig)
October 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER granting #7 Motion for Glenn A. Weiner to Appear Pro Hac Vice; granting #9 Motion for Christina M. Schwing to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Judge J. Nicholas Ranjan on 10/24/2019. Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Order of the Court or Notice on the matter. (av)
October 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER granting #8 Motion to Continue. The Telephonic Status Conference is hereby RESCHEDULED for 10/30/2019 at 10:30AM. Signed by Judge J. Nicholas Ranjan on 10/24/2019. Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Order of the Court or Notice on the matter. (av)
October 23, 2019 Filing 9 MOTION for attorney Christina M. Schwing to Appear Pro Hac Vice, (Filing fee $70, Receipt # 0315-5333442) by AVMED, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Declaration of Christina M. Schwing, #2 Proposed Order Proposed Order) (Schwing, Christina)
October 23, 2019 Filing 8 Unopposed MOTION to Continue Status Conference by NTT DATA SERVICES, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Willan, Paige)
October 23, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION for attorney Glenn A. Weiner to Appear Pro Hac Vice, (Filing fee $70, Receipt # 0315-5332586) by NTT DATA SERVICES, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Proposed Order, #3 Certificate of Service) (Weiner, Glenn)
October 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER. Telephonic Status Conference set for 10/24/2019 at 03:00 PM before Judge J. Nicholas Ranjan. Attorneys are advised to see the upcoming NOTICE REGARDING TELEPHONE PROCEEDINGS. Signed by Judge J. Nicholas Ranjan on 10/23/2019. Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Order of the Court or Notice on the matter. (av)
October 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER granting #3 Motion for Paige M. Willan to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Judge J. Nicholas Ranjan on 10/23/2019. Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Order of the Court or Notice on the matter. (av)
October 22, 2019 Filing 3 MOTION for attorney Paige M. Willan to Appear Pro Hac Vice, (Filing fee $70, Receipt # 0315-5331573) by NTT DATA SERVICES, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Paige M. Willan, #2 Proposed Order) (Willan, Paige)
October 22, 2019 Filing 2 Disclosure Statement identifying NTT DATA Corporation as corporate parent or other affiliate, by NTT DATA SERVICES, LLC. (Harvey, William)
October 22, 2019 CLERK'S OFFICE QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE re #1 Notice of Removal. ERROR: Party did not file disclosure statement as required pursuant L.R. 7.1.1. CORRECTION: Attorney advised to file statement within 7 days. Disclosure Statement due by 10/29/2019. (ma)
October 21, 2019 Filing 1 JOINT NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Court of Common Pleas of Allegheny County, case number GD-19-012389 (Filing fee, including Administrative fee, $400, receipt number 0315-5329235), filed by NTT DATA SERVICES, LLC, AVMED, INC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Civil Cover Sheet) (ma) Modified text on 10/22/2019. (ma)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: HEALTHPLANCRM, LLC v. AVMED, INC. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: HEALTHPLANCRM, LLC
Represented By: Ronald J. Chleboski
Represented By: Haig M. Sakoian
Represented By: Elizabeth Ann Bove
Represented By: Kevin J. English
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NTT DATA SERVICES, LLC
Represented By: William Harvey
Represented By: Paige Willan
Represented By: Glenn A. Weiner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AVMED, INC.
Represented By: Christina T. Tellado
Represented By: Christina M. Schwing
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?