DAY et al v. WAL-MART STORES EAST, LP
Plaintiff: AGNITA DAY and EDWARD E. DAY
Defendant: WAL-MART STORES EAST, LP
Case Number: 2:2019cv01383
Filed: October 24, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: Cathy Bissoon
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 25, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER. All counsel of record in this case must read the attached article on mediation prior to the initial Case Management Conference, and share the same with their client(s). The attached article is being disseminated with permission of the author and The Pennsylvania Lawyer. Signed by Judge Cathy Bissoon on 11/25/19. (Attachments: #1 (Exhibit, Article re Mediation) (jhi)
November 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER, Setting Case Management Conference in Suite 3250 before Judge Cathy Bissoon, more fully stated in said order. Signed by Judge Cathy Bissoon on 11/25/19. (jhi)
November 13, 2019 Filing 5 REPLY TO NEW MATTER filed by AGNITA DAY, EDWARD E. DAY. (Halesey, Christopher)
October 31, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Brook T. Dirlam on behalf of WAL-MART STORES EAST, LP. (Dirlam, Brook)
October 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER re Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 12(b) Motions to Dismiss, more fully stated in said order. Signed by Judge Cathy Bissoon on 10/25/19. (jhi)
October 24, 2019 Filing 2 Disclosure Statement identifying Wal-Mart, Inc. as corporate parent or other affiliate, by WAL-MART STORES EAST, LP. (cjo)
October 24, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Court of Common Pleas of Allegheny County, case number GD-19-013699 Copies attached: Civil Cover Sheet, Exhibit A: State Court Complaint, Exhibit B: State Court Certificate of Service, Exhibit C: Defendant's Answer to State Court Complaint (Filing fee, including Administrative fee, $400, receipt number 0315-5334313), filed by WAL-MART STORES EAST, LP. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A: State Court Complaint, #3 Exhibit B: State Court Certificate of Service, #4 Exhibit C: Defendants Answer to Complaint in State Court) (cjo)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: DAY et al v. WAL-MART STORES EAST, LP
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: AGNITA DAY
Represented By: Christopher M. Halesey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: EDWARD E. DAY
Represented By: Christopher M. Halesey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WAL-MART STORES EAST, LP
Represented By: Rebecca Sember Izsak
Represented By: Brook T. Dirlam
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?