MARTIN v. WIEK et al
Plaintiff: WAYNE A. MARTIN
Defendant: UNIVERSAL TRUCKLOAD, INC., WELLS FARGO EQUIPMENT FINANCE, INC. and JAMES S. WIEK, SR.
Case Number: 2:2019cv01399
Filed: October 25, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: J Nicholas Ranjan
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 5, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER: Exchange of required Rule 26(a)(1) information due by 1/6/2020; Amended Pleadings due by 2/6/2020; Discovery due by 5/29/2020; Post-Discovery Status Conference set for 6/1/2020 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 6C before Judge J. Nicholas Ranjan. Signed by Judge J. Nicholas Ranjan on 12/4/2019. (av)
December 4, 2019 Filing 13 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge J. Nicholas Ranjan: Initial Case Management Conference held on 12/4/2019. (Court Reporter: N. Re) (av)
December 3, 2019 Filing 12 STIPULATION selecting ADR process by UNIVERSAL TRUCKLOAD, INC., JAMES S. WIEK, SR. (Hettrich, Jordan)
December 2, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE Plaintiff Rule 26(a)(1) Initial Disclosure by WAYNE A. MARTIN (Villanova, James)
November 21, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Michael F. Nerone on behalf of UNIVERSAL TRUCKLOAD, INC., JAMES S. WIEK, SR. (Nerone, Michael)
November 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER. In light of the #8 Stipulation, WELLS FARGO EQUIPMENT FINANCE, INC. is dismissed from the case without prejudice. Signed by Judge J. Nicholas Ranjan on 11/20/2019. Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Order of the Court or Notice on the matter. (av)
November 19, 2019 Filing 8 STIPULATION to Dismiss Less Than All Defendants by UNIVERSAL TRUCKLOAD, INC., JAMES S. WIEK, SR. (Hettrich, Jordan)
November 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER: Initial Case Management Conference set for 12/4/2019 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 6C before Judge J. Nicholas Ranjan. Exchange of required Rule 26(a)(1) information due by 11/29/2019; Stipulation Selecting ADR Process due by 11/29/2019. Signed by Judge J. Nicholas Ranjan on 11/8/2019. (av)
November 8, 2019 Filing 6 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Hettrich, Jordan)
November 6, 2019 Filing 5 Disclosure Statement identifying Universal Logistics Holdings, Inc. as corporate parent or other affiliate, by UNIVERSAL TRUCKLOAD, INC.. (Hettrich, Jordan)
October 30, 2019 Filing 4 Errata re #3 Notice of Appearance by UNIVERSAL TRUCKLOAD, INC., JAMES S. WIEK, SR. Reason for Correction: Correct Signing Attorney Name. (Pion, John)
October 30, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by John T. Pion on behalf of UNIVERSAL TRUCKLOAD, INC., JAMES S. WIEK, SR. (Pion, John)
October 30, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE that instant civil action has been designated for placement into the United States District Court's Alternative Dispute Resolution program. Parties are directed to fully complete the required 26(f) report, which includes the stipulation of selecting an ADR process. Counsel for plaintiff (or in the case of a removal action, counsel for removing defendant) shall make service of the notice on all parties. (av)
October 29, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from COURT OF COMMON PLEAS OF WESTMORELAND COUNTY, case number l 9-CI-02623 with BOTH Copies attached: EXHIBITS, AFFIDAVIT, ANSWER IN NEW MATTER, LOWER COURT COMPLAINT, (Filing fee, including Administrative fee, $400, receipt number 0315-5336354), filed by JAMES S. WIEK, SR, UNIVERSAL TRUCKLOAD, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit 5, #7 Exhibit 6, #8 Exhibit 7, #9 Exhibit 8, #10 Exhibit 9, #11 Exhibit 10, #12 Exhibit 11) (jd)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: MARTIN v. WIEK et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: WAYNE A. MARTIN
Represented By: James A. Villanova
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UNIVERSAL TRUCKLOAD, INC.
Represented By: Jordan Hettrich
Represented By: John T. Pion
Represented By: Michael F. Nerone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WELLS FARGO EQUIPMENT FINANCE, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JAMES S. WIEK, SR.
Represented By: Jordan Hettrich
Represented By: John T. Pion
Represented By: Michael F. Nerone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?