HILL-JOHNSON v. MCCRAFFEY et al
Plaintiff: DACLON HILL-JOHNSON and DAELON HILL-JOHNSON
Defendant: THOMAS MCCRAFFEY, DAVID R. CASHMAN, RICH FITZGERALD, CITY OF PITTSBURGH, ALLEGHENY COUNTY SHERIFFS DEPARTMENT, ALLEGHENY COUNTY, ALLEGHENY COUNTY DISTRICT ATTORNEYS OFFICE, PENNSYLVANIA BAR ASSOCIATION and COURT OF COMMON PLEAS OF ALLEGHENY COUNTY
Case Number: 2:2019cv01430
Filed: November 5, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: Lisa Pupo Lenihan
Nature of Suit: Prisoner Civil Rights (Prison Condition)
Cause of Action: 42:1983pr
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 29, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER DENYING AS MOOT the (ECF No. #3 ) Motion to Close Complaint. Plaintiff failed to failed to include a copy of his inmate account statement with his (ECF No. #1 ) Motion to Proceed in Forma Pauperis, so the motion was denied and the case was closed. This motion, therefore is MOOT. Signed by Magistrate Judge Lisa Pupo Lenihan on 11/29/2019. Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Order of the Court or Notice on the matter. (jmb)
November 27, 2019 Filing 3 MOTION to Close Complaint by DACLON HILL-JOHNSON. (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (cel)
November 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER that plaintiffs Motion to Proceed In Forma Pauperis (ECF. No. #1 ) is DENIED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Clerk of Court is directed to mark this case closed. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the plaintiff may submit another motion to proceed in forma pauperis, along with a certified copy of the inmate account statement for the six (6) months preceding the filing of the complaint. If that resubmitted motion is granted, the case will be reopened. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the plaintiff may reopen the case by paying the $400.00 filing fee. AND IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the parties are allowed fourteen (14) days from this date to appeal this order to a district judge pursuant to Local Rule 72.C.2. Failure to appeal within fourteen (14) days may constitute waiver of the right to appeal. Signed by Magistrate Judge Lisa Pupo Lenihan on 11/27/2019. (jmb)
November 5, 2019 Filing 1 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by DACLON HILL-JOHNSON. (Attachments: #1 proposed complaint lodged pending disposition of motion to proceed in forma pauperis, #2 petition for service, #3 Envelope) (plp)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: HILL-JOHNSON v. MCCRAFFEY et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: THOMAS MCCRAFFEY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DAVID R. CASHMAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RICH FITZGERALD
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CITY OF PITTSBURGH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ALLEGHENY COUNTY SHERIFFS DEPARTMENT
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ALLEGHENY COUNTY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ALLEGHENY COUNTY DISTRICT ATTORNEYS OFFICE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PENNSYLVANIA BAR ASSOCIATION
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: COURT OF COMMON PLEAS OF ALLEGHENY COUNTY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DACLON HILL-JOHNSON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DAELON HILL-JOHNSON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?