HUNTINGTON TECHNOLOGY FINANCE, INC. v. SURGEM, LLC et al
Plaintiff: HUNTINGTON TECHNOLOGY FINANCE, INC.
Defendant: SURGEM, LLC, SURGICARE OF BOCA RATON, LLC, SURGICARE SURGICAL ASSOCIATES OF JERSEY CITY, LLC and DR. JOHN H. HAJJAR
Case Number: 2:2019cv01505
Filed: November 20, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: William S Stickman
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 15, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER DISMISSING CASE without prejudice. Signed by Judge William S. Stickman on 1/15/2020. (rgm)
January 15, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal without prejudice. The Clerk of Court is directed to mark this case administratively closed. (rgm) Document removed from public view and redocketed at #7 . Modified text on 1/17/2020. (ept)
January 14, 2020 Filing 5 STIPULATION of Dismissal Without Prejudice by HUNTINGTON TECHNOLOGY FINANCE, INC.. (Tuskan, Justin)
December 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER GRANTING #3 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Defendants shall file their response to the complaint by 01/15/20. Signed by Judge William S. Stickman on 12/17/19. (eca)
December 16, 2019 Filing 3 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint,, filed by HUNTINGTON TECHNOLOGY FINANCE, INC. by JOHN H. HAJJAR, SURGEM, LLC, SURGICARE OF BOCA RATON, LLC, SURGICARE SURGICAL ASSOCIATES OF JERSEY CITY, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Blake, Geff)
November 21, 2019 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to JOHN H. HAJJAR, SURGEM, LLC, SURGICARE OF BOCA RATON, LLC, SURGICARE SURGICAL ASSOCIATES OF JERSEY CITY, LLC (jm)
November 20, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against JOHN H. HAJJAR, SURGEM, LLC, SURGICARE OF BOCA RATON, LLC, SURGICARE SURGICAL ASSOCIATES OF JERSEY CITY, LLC (Filing fee, including Administrative fee, $400, receipt number 0315-5367932), filed by HUNTINGTON TECHNOLOGY FINANCE, INC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Civil Cover Sheet, #9 Summons HAJJAR, #10 Summons SURGICARE, #11 Summons SURGICARE JERSEY CITY, #12 Summons SURGEM) (jm)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: HUNTINGTON TECHNOLOGY FINANCE, INC. v. SURGEM, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SURGEM, LLC
Represented By: Geff Blake
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SURGICARE OF BOCA RATON, LLC
Represented By: Geff Blake
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SURGICARE SURGICAL ASSOCIATES OF JERSEY CITY, LLC
Represented By: Geff Blake
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DR. JOHN H. HAJJAR
Represented By: Geff Blake
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: HUNTINGTON TECHNOLOGY FINANCE, INC.
Represented By: Justin M. Tuskan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?