SHAKIR v. CAPOZZA
Petitioner: YA-SIN EL-AMIN SHAKIR
Respondent: MARK CAPOZZA
Case Number: 2:2019cv01652
Filed: December 20, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: Patricia L Dodge
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2254
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 21, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 31, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 SUMMONS/Return of Service Returned Executed by YA-SIN EL-AMIN SHAKIR. MARK CAPOZZA served on 1/27/2020, answer due 2/18/2020. Beaver County DA on 1-27-20. (sdp)
January 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER DIRECTING that the United States Marshal shall make service of this order, together with a copy of the petition, upon the respondents by certified mail, costs to be advanced by the United States. Within 21 days of service of this order, respondent and the District Attorney shall respond to the allegations of the petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus. Signed by Magistrate Judge Patricia L. Dodge on 1/16/2020. (mqe)
January 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus (Filing fee $5, receipt number 246680060548), filed by YA-SIN EL-AMIN SHAKIR. (Attachments: #1 Part 2) (sdp)
January 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Filing fee: $5.00, receipt number 246680060548 (sdp)
January 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 DECLARATION by YA-SIN EL-AMIN SHAKIR in support of Motion to Proceed IFP. (sdp)
January 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER denying Petitioner's #1 motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis. He must pay the $5.00 filing fee by 2/5/20. Signed by Magistrate Judge Patricia L. Dodge on 1/3/20. Order mailed to Petitioner at his address of record. (jpe)
December 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 1 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by YA-SIN EL-AMIN SHAKIR. (Attachments: #1 INMATE ACCOUNT STATEMENT, #2 HABEAS CORP PETITION LODGED PENDING IFP, #3 PETITION CONT'D, #4 Envelope) (elt) (Additional attachment(s) added on 1/7/2020: #5 Last page of habeas corpus petition) (sdp)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: SHAKIR v. CAPOZZA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: MARK CAPOZZA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: YA-SIN EL-AMIN SHAKIR
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?