GOOD WORKS MINISTRIES, INC. v. COUNTY COMMISSIONERS OF FAYETTE COUNTY, PENNSYLVANIA et al
Plaintiff: GOOD WORKS MINISTRIES, INC.
Defendant: COUNTY COMMISSIONERS OF FAYETTE COUNTY, PENNSYLVANIA and FAYETTE COUNTY, PENNSYLVANIA ZONING HEARING BOARD
Case Number: 2:2020cv00415
Filed: March 25, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: J Nicholas Ranjan
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Accommodations
Cause of Action: 42:12101
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 16, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 16, 2020 FINAL NOTICE: In preparation of the Court's conversion to NextGen, our Court's CM/ECF system will be unavailable from 12:00 p.m. (Noon) on Friday, May 22, 2020, until 11:59 pm. Monday, May 25, 2020. Please plan accordingly. Complete information, including a checklist of actions regarding the WDPA NexGen CM/ECF implementation, can be found #here. Preparing for NextGen is a two-step process. The first step is to upgrade any legacy PACER accounts. The second step is to link that upgraded PACER account with your WDPA CM/ECF account after the Court goes live with NextGen. To link your account, you will need your current e-filing credentials from our Court. If your CM/ECF login contains any special characters (anything other than a letter or number), you will need to change it as logins with those characters will be unable to link to PACER accounts. No later than Thursday, May 21, 2020, you should log into both PACER and the current version of CM/ECF to review and record your current e-filing credentials for both, as you will need to know them in order to e-file after May 23, 2020. Please consult the Court's #administrative order for additional information on deadlines and alternative filing options during this period. (Administrator, ) (ADI)
May 6, 2020 Filing 16 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by FAYETTE COUNTY, PENNSYLVANIA ZONING HEARING BOARD. FAYETTE COUNTY, PENNSYLVANIA ZONING HEARING BOARD waiver sent on 4/21/2020, answer due 6/22/2020. (Jones, Marie)
May 6, 2020 Filing 15 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by COUNTY COMMISSIONERS OF FAYETTE COUNTY, PENNSYLVANIA. COUNTY COMMISSIONERS OF FAYETTE COUNTY, PENNSYLVANIA waiver sent on 4/21/2020, answer due 6/22/2020. (Jones, Marie)
May 6, 2020 Filing 13 Proposed Rule 26(f) report (av)
May 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER: Telephonic Initial Case Management set for 6/9/2020 at 03:30 PM before Judge J. Nicholas Ranjan. Exchange of required Rule 26(a)(1) information due by 5/29/2020; Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 5/29/2020; Stipulation Selecting ADR Process due by 5/29/2020. Signed by Judge J. Nicholas Ranjan on 5/6/2020. (av)
May 5, 2020 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by Michael R. Lettrich on behalf of COUNTY COMMISSIONERS OF FAYETTE COUNTY, PENNSYLVANIA, FAYETTE COUNTY, PENNSYLVANIA ZONING HEARING BOARD. (Lettrich, Michael)
May 5, 2020 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Marie Milie Jones on behalf of COUNTY COMMISSIONERS OF FAYETTE COUNTY, PENNSYLVANIA, FAYETTE COUNTY, PENNSYLVANIA ZONING HEARING BOARD. (Jones, Marie)
April 29, 2020 Filing 9 REQUEST FOR WAIVER of Service sent to Zoning Hearing Board on 4/27/2020 by GOOD WORKS MINISTRIES, INC.. Waiver of Service due by 5/27/2020 (Polin, Steven)
April 29, 2020 Filing 8 REQUEST FOR WAIVER of Service sent to County Commissioners on 4/21/2020 by GOOD WORKS MINISTRIES, INC.. Waiver of Service due by 5/21/2020 (Polin, Steven)
April 26, 2020 IMPORTANT NOTICE: The United States District Court for the Western District of Pennsylvania will be upgrading its current CM/ECF system to the Next Generation of CM/ECF on May 26, 2020. Complete information, including a checklist of actions regarding the WDPA NexGen CM/ECF implementation, can be found #here. Preparing for NextGen is a two-step process. The first step is to upgrade any legacy PACER accounts. Each attorney must have an individual upgraded PACER account in order to electronically file after our conversion to NextGen. The second step will be to link that upgraded PACER account with your WDPA CM/ECF account after the Court goes live with NextGen. To link your account, you will need your current e-filing credentials from our Court. If your CM/ECF login contains a special character (such as &, @, $, *), you will need to change it as logins with those characters will be unable to link to PACER accounts. No later than Thursday, May 21, 2020, you should log into both PACER and the current version of CM/ECF to (1) review and record your current e-filing credentials for both, as you will need to know them in order to e-file after May 23, 2020 and (2) ensure that your primary email address to receive Notices of Electronic Filings (NEF) is accurate. Failure to provide an accurate email address may result in a delay in receiving NEFs after the Court converts to NextGen. (Administrator, ) (ADI)
April 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 STANDING ORDER IN ALL CIVIL CASES RELATED TO CORONAVIRUS. Signed by Judge J. Nicholas Ranjan on 4/8/2020. (av)
March 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER granting #4 Motion for Steven G. Polin to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Judge J. Nicholas Ranjan on 3/30/2020. Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Order of the Court or Notice on the matter. (av)
March 27, 2020 Filing 5 Proposed Order re #4 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice by GOOD WORKS MINISTRIES, INC.. (Polin, Steven)
March 27, 2020 Filing 4 MOTION for attorney Steven G. Polin to Appear Pro Hac Vice, (Filing fee $70, Receipt # 0315-5532030) by GOOD WORKS MINISTRIES, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3) (Polin, Steven)
March 27, 2020 CLERK'S OFFICE QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE re #3 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. ERROR: Per Local Rules of Court, the attorney seeking the pro hac admission must be the one who files this motion. CORRECTION: Attorney Steven G. Polin to refile this motion using his ECF login and password. This message is for informational purposes only. (ept)
March 27, 2020 CLERK'S OFFICE QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE re #3 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. ERROR: Proposed Order was not attached. CORRECTION: Attorney is advised to file a proposed order by using the Proposed Order event and linking it to the document in question. This message is for informational purposes only. (ept)
March 27, 2020 Filing 3 MOTION for attorney Steven G. Polin to Appear Pro Hac Vice, (Filing fee $70, Receipt # 0315-5530944) by GOOD WORKS MINISTRIES, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit in Support, #2 Certificate Good Standing MD, #3 Certificate Good Standing DC, #4 Admonition) (Newman, Nancy)
March 26, 2020 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to COUNTY COMMISSIONERS OF FAYETTE COUNTY, PENNSYLVANIA, FAYETTE COUNTY, PENNSYLVANIA ZONING HEARING BOARD (Attachments: #1 Summons Zoning Board) (ept)
March 25, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against COUNTY COMMISSIONERS OF FAYETTE COUNTY, PENNSYLVANIA, FAYETTE COUNTY, PENNSYLVANIA ZONING HEARING BOARD (Filing fee, including Administrative fee, $400, receipt number 0315-5526575), filed by GOOD WORKS MINISTRIES, INC. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons County Commissioners, #3 Summons Zoning Board) (ept)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: GOOD WORKS MINISTRIES, INC. v. COUNTY COMMISSIONERS OF FAYETTE COUNTY, PENNSYLVANIA et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: GOOD WORKS MINISTRIES, INC.
Represented By: Nancy Newman
Represented By: Steven G. Polin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: COUNTY COMMISSIONERS OF FAYETTE COUNTY, PENNSYLVANIA
Represented By: Marie Milie Jones
Represented By: Michael R. Lettrich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FAYETTE COUNTY, PENNSYLVANIA ZONING HEARING BOARD
Represented By: Marie Milie Jones
Represented By: Michael R. Lettrich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?