BENSON v. FLEETPRIDE INC.
Plaintiff: CHARLENE BENSON
Defendant: FLEETPRIDE INC.
Case Number: 2:2020cv00456
Filed: April 2, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: Cynthia Reed Eddy
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Americans with Disabilities - Employment
Cause of Action: 42:12101
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 26, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 26, 2020 Filing 7 Disclosure Statement identifying ASP Intermediate Holdings, Inc. as corporate parent or other affiliate, by FLEETPRIDE INC. (Berry, John)
May 16, 2020 FINAL NOTICE: In preparation of the Court's conversion to NextGen, our Court's CM/ECF system will be unavailable from 12:00 p.m. (Noon) on Friday, May 22, 2020, until 11:59 pm. Monday, May 25, 2020. Please plan accordingly. Complete information, including a checklist of actions regarding the WDPA NexGen CM/ECF implementation, can be found #here. Preparing for NextGen is a two-step process. The first step is to upgrade any legacy PACER accounts. The second step is to link that upgraded PACER account with your WDPA CM/ECF account after the Court goes live with NextGen. To link your account, you will need your current e-filing credentials from our Court. If your CM/ECF login contains any special characters (anything other than a letter or number), you will need to change it as logins with those characters will be unable to link to PACER accounts. No later than Thursday, May 21, 2020, you should log into both PACER and the current version of CM/ECF to review and record your current e-filing credentials for both, as you will need to know them in order to e-file after May 23, 2020. Please consult the Court's #administrative order for additional information on deadlines and alternative filing options during this period. (Administrator, ) (ADI)
May 15, 2020 CLERK'S OFFICE QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE re #5 Notice of Appearance, #6 Waiver of Service Executed. ERROR: Party did not file disclosure statement as required pursuant L.R. 7.1.1. CORRECTION: Attorney advised to file statement within 7 days. Disclosure Statement due by 5/22/2020. (jmm)
May 14, 2020 Filing 6 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by FLEETPRIDE INC. FLEETPRIDE INC. waiver sent on 4/21/2020, answer due 6/22/2020. (Berry, John)
May 14, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by John J. Berry on behalf of FLEETPRIDE INC. (Berry, John)
May 7, 2020 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to FLEETPRIDE INC. (jmm)
May 6, 2020 Filing 3 PRAECIPE to Issue Summons by CHARLENE BENSON (Attachments: #1 Summons) (Sugiura, Sammy)
April 26, 2020 IMPORTANT NOTICE: The United States District Court for the Western District of Pennsylvania will be upgrading its current CM/ECF system to the Next Generation of CM/ECF on May 26, 2020. Complete information, including a checklist of actions regarding the WDPA NexGen CM/ECF implementation, can be found #here. Preparing for NextGen is a two-step process. The first step is to upgrade any legacy PACER accounts. Each attorney must have an individual upgraded PACER account in order to electronically file after our conversion to NextGen. The second step will be to link that upgraded PACER account with your WDPA CM/ECF account after the Court goes live with NextGen. To link your account, you will need your current e-filing credentials from our Court. If your CM/ECF login contains a special character (such as &, @, $, *), you will need to change it as logins with those characters will be unable to link to PACER accounts. No later than Thursday, May 21, 2020, you should log into both PACER and the current version of CM/ECF to (1) review and record your current e-filing credentials for both, as you will need to know them in order to e-file after May 23, 2020 and (2) ensure that your primary email address to receive Notices of Electronic Filings (NEF) is accurate. Failure to provide an accurate email address may result in a delay in receiving NEFs after the Court converts to NextGen. (Administrator, ) (ADI)
April 7, 2020 Filing 2 STANDING ORDER ON RULE 12(b) MOTIONS. Signed by Chief Magistrate Judge Cynthia Reed Eddy on 4/7/2020. (nll)
April 2, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against FLEETPRIDE INC. (Filing fee, including Administrative fee, $400, receipt number 0315-5542493), filed by CHARLENE BENSON. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (jv)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: BENSON v. FLEETPRIDE INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CHARLENE BENSON
Represented By: Sammy Y. Sugiura
Represented By: Sammy Y Sugiura
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FLEETPRIDE INC.
Represented By: John J. Berry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?