CORBIN v. CASTLE BUILDING SUPPLY AND TRUCKING, LLC
Plaintiff: RICHARD L. CORBIN
Defendant: CASTLE BUILDING SUPPLY AND TRUCKING, LLC
Case Number: 2:2020cv00463
Filed: April 2, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: J Nicholas Ranjan
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 42:2000e
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 26, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 26, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 19 CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER: Exchange of required Rule 26(a)(1) information due by 6/9/2020; Amended Pleadings due by 6/9/2020; Joinder of Parties due by 6/9/2020; Discovery due by 10/26/2020; Post-Discovery Status Conference set for 10/27/2020 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 6C before Judge J. Nicholas Ranjan. Signed by Judge J. Nicholas Ranjan on 5/26/2020. (av)
May 26, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Mediation. Kenneth J. Benson is appointed as mediator. Mediation to be completed on 8/25/2020. Signed by Judge J. Nicholas Ranjan on 5/26/2020. (av)
May 26, 2020 Filing 17 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge J. Nicholas Ranjan: Telephonic Initial Case Management Conference held on 5/26/2020. (Court Reporter: none) (av)
May 16, 2020 FINAL NOTICE: In preparation of the Court's conversion to NextGen, our Court's CM/ECF system will be unavailable from 12:00 p.m. (Noon) on Friday, May 22, 2020, until 11:59 pm. Monday, May 25, 2020. Please plan accordingly. Complete information, including a checklist of actions regarding the WDPA NexGen CM/ECF implementation, can be found #here. Preparing for NextGen is a two-step process. The first step is to upgrade any legacy PACER accounts. The second step is to link that upgraded PACER account with your WDPA CM/ECF account after the Court goes live with NextGen. To link your account, you will need your current e-filing credentials from our Court. If your CM/ECF login contains any special characters (anything other than a letter or number), you will need to change it as logins with those characters will be unable to link to PACER accounts. No later than Thursday, May 21, 2020, you should log into both PACER and the current version of CM/ECF to review and record your current e-filing credentials for both, as you will need to know them in order to e-file after May 23, 2020. Please consult the Court's #administrative order for additional information on deadlines and alternative filing options during this period. (Administrator, ) (ADI)
May 15, 2020 Filing 16 STIPULATION selecting ADR process by CASTLE BUILDING SUPPLY AND TRUCKING, LLC. (Meacham, Molly)
May 15, 2020 Filing 15 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Meacham, Molly)
May 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER. The Initial Case Management Conference set for 5/26/2020 at 10:00AM will now be held telephonically. Dial-in instructions to follow. Signed by Judge J. Nicholas Ranjan on 5/15/2020. Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Order of the Court or Notice on the matter. (av)
April 26, 2020 IMPORTANT NOTICE: The United States District Court for the Western District of Pennsylvania will be upgrading its current CM/ECF system to the Next Generation of CM/ECF on May 26, 2020. Complete information, including a checklist of actions regarding the WDPA NexGen CM/ECF implementation, can be found #here. Preparing for NextGen is a two-step process. The first step is to upgrade any legacy PACER accounts. Each attorney must have an individual upgraded PACER account in order to electronically file after our conversion to NextGen. The second step will be to link that upgraded PACER account with your WDPA CM/ECF account after the Court goes live with NextGen. To link your account, you will need your current e-filing credentials from our Court. If your CM/ECF login contains a special character (such as &, @, $, *), you will need to change it as logins with those characters will be unable to link to PACER accounts. No later than Thursday, May 21, 2020, you should log into both PACER and the current version of CM/ECF to (1) review and record your current e-filing credentials for both, as you will need to know them in order to e-file after May 23, 2020 and (2) ensure that your primary email address to receive Notices of Electronic Filings (NEF) is accurate. Failure to provide an accurate email address may result in a delay in receiving NEFs after the Court converts to NextGen. (Administrator, ) (ADI)
April 24, 2020 Filing 12 Proposed Rule 26(f) report (av)
April 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER: Initial Case Management Conference set for 5/26/2020 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 6C before Judge J. Nicholas Ranjan. Exchange of required Rule 26(a)(1) information due by 5/15/2020; Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 5/15/2020; Stipulation Selecting ADR Process due by 5/15/2020. Signed by Judge J. Nicholas Ranjan on 4/24/2020. (av)
April 23, 2020 Filing 10 Errata re #8 Notice of Appearance by CASTLE BUILDING SUPPLY AND TRUCKING, LLC. Reason for Correction: did not select box for attorney to get noticed. Court corrected problem. (Meacham, Molly) Modified text on 4/23/2020. (jv)
April 23, 2020 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Alexandra Farone on behalf of CASTLE BUILDING SUPPLY AND TRUCKING, LLC. (Farone, Alexandra)
April 23, 2020 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Molly E. Meacham on behalf of CASTLE BUILDING SUPPLY AND TRUCKING, LLC. (Meacham, Molly)
April 23, 2020 Filing 7 Disclosure Statement identifying None as corporate parent or other affiliate, by CASTLE BUILDING SUPPLY AND TRUCKING, LLC. (Meacham, Molly)
April 23, 2020 Filing 6 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by CASTLE BUILDING SUPPLY AND TRUCKING, LLC. (Meacham, Molly)
April 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 STANDING ORDER IN ALL CIVIL CASES RELATED TO CORONAVIRUS. Signed by Judge J. Nicholas Ranjan on 4/8/2020. (av)
April 7, 2020 CLERK'S OFFICE QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE re #2 Summons Issued. ERROR: Proof of service filled out when it should not have been. CORRECTION: Attorney filed #3 Errata, which in turn, court Removed from public view #2 Summons issued and summon was reissued at #4 Summons Reissued as to CASTLE BUILDING SUPPLY AND TRUCKING, LLC on 4/7/2020. This message is for informational purposes only. (jv)
April 7, 2020 Filing 4 Summons Reissued as to CASTLE BUILDING SUPPLY AND TRUCKING, LLC (jv)
April 7, 2020 Filing 3 Errata re #1 Complaint, by RICHARD L. CORBIN. Reason for Correction: Error with Summons. (Booker, Stanley)
April 6, 2020 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to CASTLE BUILDING SUPPLY AND TRUCKING, LLC (jv) Modified to remove from public view since summons was Reissued correctly as #4 Summons Reissued as to CASTLE BUILDING SUPPLY AND TRUCKING, LLC on 4/7/2020. (jv)
April 2, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against CASTLE BUILDING SUPPLY AND TRUCKING, LLC (Filing fee, including Administrative fee, $400, receipt number 0315-5542226), filed by RICHARD L. CORBIN. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Part 1, #2 Civil Cover Sheet Part 2, #3 Summons as to Castle Building Supply and Trucking, LLC) (jv)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: CORBIN v. CASTLE BUILDING SUPPLY AND TRUCKING, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: RICHARD L. CORBIN
Represented By: Stanley T. Booker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CASTLE BUILDING SUPPLY AND TRUCKING, LLC
Represented By: Alexandra Farone
Represented By: Molly E. Meacham
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?