STONE v. SPECIALIZED LOAN SERVICING LLC
Plaintiff: CAITLIN STONE
Defendant: SPECIALIZED LOAN SERVICING LLC
Case Number: 2:2020cv00476
Filed: April 6, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: Cathy Bissoon
Nature of Suit: Banks and Banking
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 4, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 4, 2020 Set Hearing Deadline: Case Management Conference set for 7/16/2020 at 10:30 AM in Suite 3250 before Judge Cathy Bissoon. (jhi)
June 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER. All counsel of record in this case must read the attached article on mediation prior to the initial Case Management Conference, and share the same with their client(s). The attached article is being disseminated with permission of the author and The Pennsylvania Lawyer. Signed by Judge Cathy Bissoon on 6/4/20. (Attachments: #1 (Exhibit, Article re Mediation) (jhi)
June 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER, setting Case Management Conference in Suite 3250 before Judge Cathy Bissoon, more fully stated in said order. Signed by Judge Cathy Bissoon on 6/4/20. (jhi)
June 3, 2020 Filing 10 ANSWER to Complaint AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES by SPECIALIZED LOAN SERVICING LLC. (Soven, Andrew)
May 16, 2020 FINAL NOTICE: In preparation of the Court's conversion to NextGen, our Court's CM/ECF system will be unavailable from 12:00 p.m. (Noon) on Friday, May 22, 2020, until 11:59 pm. Monday, May 25, 2020. Please plan accordingly. Complete information, including a checklist of actions regarding the WDPA NexGen CM/ECF implementation, can be found #here. Preparing for NextGen is a two-step process. The first step is to upgrade any legacy PACER accounts. The second step is to link that upgraded PACER account with your WDPA CM/ECF account after the Court goes live with NextGen. To link your account, you will need your current e-filing credentials from our Court. If your CM/ECF login contains any special characters (anything other than a letter or number), you will need to change it as logins with those characters will be unable to link to PACER accounts. No later than Thursday, May 21, 2020, you should log into both PACER and the current version of CM/ECF to review and record your current e-filing credentials for both, as you will need to know them in order to e-file after May 23, 2020. Please consult the Court's #administrative order for additional information on deadlines and alternative filing options during this period. (Administrator, ) (ADI)
May 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER. The parties have filed a Stipulation that purports to extend the time for Defendant to respond to the Complaint, (Doc. #8 ). The Local Rule allowing for a one-time stipulation is inapplicable here, where this is the second extension and the additional time sought is greater than 45 days from the original due date. See Local Rule 7.E. Nevertheless, the Court will construe the Stipulation as a Motion for Extension of Time, and that Motion is GRANTED. Defendant shall answer, plead or otherwise respond on or before 6/3/20. The Court does not envision further extensions. Signed by Judge Cathy Bissoon on 5/1/20. Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Order of the Court or Notice on the matter. (wss)
May 1, 2020 Filing 8 Stipulation for Extension of Time to Answer by SPECIALIZED LOAN SERVICING LLC Answer due from SPECIALIZED LOAN SERVICING LLC. (Soven, Andrew)
May 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER approving #6 Stipulation of Specialized Loan Servicing, LLC for Substitution of Counsel. Andrew Soven of Holland & Knight LLP is substituted in the place of Gerald J. Schirato, Jr. of Duane Morris LLP as attorney for Specialized Loan Servicing, LLC. Gerald J. Schirato, Jr. is terminated as counsel for Specialized Loan Servicing, LLC. Signed by Judge Cathy Bissoon on 5/1/20. Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Order of the Court or Notice on the matter. (wss)
April 30, 2020 CLERK'S OFFICE QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE re #6 Stipulation. ERROR: ATTORNEY FILED STIPULATION FOR SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL. CORRECTION: ATTORNEY ADVISED THAT SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL MAY ONLY BE MADE IF ATTORNEYS ARE IN THE SAME FIRM, THIS MUST BE FILED AS A MOTION FOR SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL WITH PROPOSED ORDER ATTACHED. (jd)
April 29, 2020 Filing 6 STIPULATION FOR SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL and Certificate of Service by SPECIALIZED LOAN SERVICING LLC. (Soven, Andrew)
April 26, 2020 IMPORTANT NOTICE: The United States District Court for the Western District of Pennsylvania will be upgrading its current CM/ECF system to the Next Generation of CM/ECF on May 26, 2020. Complete information, including a checklist of actions regarding the WDPA NexGen CM/ECF implementation, can be found #here. Preparing for NextGen is a two-step process. The first step is to upgrade any legacy PACER accounts. Each attorney must have an individual upgraded PACER account in order to electronically file after our conversion to NextGen. The second step will be to link that upgraded PACER account with your WDPA CM/ECF account after the Court goes live with NextGen. To link your account, you will need your current e-filing credentials from our Court. If your CM/ECF login contains a special character (such as &, @, $, *), you will need to change it as logins with those characters will be unable to link to PACER accounts. No later than Thursday, May 21, 2020, you should log into both PACER and the current version of CM/ECF to (1) review and record your current e-filing credentials for both, as you will need to know them in order to e-file after May 23, 2020 and (2) ensure that your primary email address to receive Notices of Electronic Filings (NEF) is accurate. Failure to provide an accurate email address may result in a delay in receiving NEFs after the Court converts to NextGen. (Administrator, ) (ADI)
April 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER granting #4 Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint. Defendant Specialized Loan Servicing LLC shall answer, plead, or otherwise respond to the Complaint on or before 5/4/20. Signed by Judge Cathy Bissoon on 4/10/20. Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Order of the Court or Notice on the matter. (wss)
April 10, 2020 Filing 4 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Notice of Removal, filed by SPECIALIZED LOAN SERVICING LLC by SPECIALIZED LOAN SERVICING LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Schirato, Gerald)
April 8, 2020 Filing 3 Disclosure Statement identifying Computershare Limited as corporate parent or other affiliate, by SPECIALIZED LOAN SERVICING LLC. (Schirato, Gerald)
April 8, 2020 CLERK'S OFFICE QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE re #1 Notice of Removal ERROR: Party did not file disclosure statement as required pursuant L.R. 7.1.1. CORRECTION: Attorney advised to file statement within 7 days. Disclosure Statement due by 4/15/2020. (ma) Modified text on 4/8/2020. (ma)
April 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER re Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 12(b) Motions to Dismiss, more fully stated in said order. Signed by Judge Cathy Bissoon on 4/6/20. (jhi)
April 6, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Court of Common Pleas of Allegheny County, case number GD-20-003466 Copies attached: State Court Complaint (Filing fee, including Administrative fee, $400, receipt number 0315-5546176), filed by SPECIALIZED LOAN SERVICING LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Civil Cover Sheet) (ma)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: STONE v. SPECIALIZED LOAN SERVICING LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CAITLIN STONE
Represented By: Robert P. Cocco
Represented By: Robert P Cocco
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SPECIALIZED LOAN SERVICING LLC
Represented By: Gerald J. Schirato, Jr.
Represented By: Andrew J. Soven
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?