KENNEDY v. FORCE ENVIRONMENTAL SOLUTIONS, LLC
Plaintiff: CHARLES KENNEDY
Defendant: FORCE ENVIRONMENTAL SOLUTIONS, LLC
Case Number: 2:2020cv00588
Filed: April 22, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: Robert J Colville
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Americans with Disabilities - Employment
Cause of Action: 42:12101
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 16, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 16, 2020 FINAL NOTICE: In preparation of the Court's conversion to NextGen, our Court's CM/ECF system will be unavailable from 12:00 p.m. (Noon) on Friday, May 22, 2020, until 11:59 pm. Monday, May 25, 2020. Please plan accordingly. Complete information, including a checklist of actions regarding the WDPA NexGen CM/ECF implementation, can be found #here. Preparing for NextGen is a two-step process. The first step is to upgrade any legacy PACER accounts. The second step is to link that upgraded PACER account with your WDPA CM/ECF account after the Court goes live with NextGen. To link your account, you will need your current e-filing credentials from our Court. If your CM/ECF login contains any special characters (anything other than a letter or number), you will need to change it as logins with those characters will be unable to link to PACER accounts. No later than Thursday, May 21, 2020, you should log into both PACER and the current version of CM/ECF to review and record your current e-filing credentials for both, as you will need to know them in order to e-file after May 23, 2020. Please consult the Court's #administrative order for additional information on deadlines and alternative filing options during this period. (Administrator, ) (ADI)
May 14, 2020 Filing 9 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by CHARLES KENNEDY. FORCE ENVIRONMENTAL SOLUTIONS, LLC waiver sent on 4/23/2020, answer due 6/22/2020. (Karpf, Ari)
May 14, 2020 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Amy V. Sims on behalf of FORCE ENVIRONMENTAL SOLUTIONS, LLC. (Sims, Amy)
May 14, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Dennis St. J. Mulvihill on behalf of FORCE ENVIRONMENTAL SOLUTIONS, LLC. (Mulvihill, Dennis)
May 11, 2020 Filing 6 First AMENDED COMPLAINT against FORCE ENVIRONMENTAL SOLUTIONS, LLC, filed by CHARLES KENNEDY. (Karpf, Ari)
April 26, 2020 IMPORTANT NOTICE: The United States District Court for the Western District of Pennsylvania will be upgrading its current CM/ECF system to the Next Generation of CM/ECF on May 26, 2020. Complete information, including a checklist of actions regarding the WDPA NexGen CM/ECF implementation, can be found #here. Preparing for NextGen is a two-step process. The first step is to upgrade any legacy PACER accounts. Each attorney must have an individual upgraded PACER account in order to electronically file after our conversion to NextGen. The second step will be to link that upgraded PACER account with your WDPA CM/ECF account after the Court goes live with NextGen. To link your account, you will need your current e-filing credentials from our Court. If your CM/ECF login contains a special character (such as &, @, $, *), you will need to change it as logins with those characters will be unable to link to PACER accounts. No later than Thursday, May 21, 2020, you should log into both PACER and the current version of CM/ECF to (1) review and record your current e-filing credentials for both, as you will need to know them in order to e-file after May 23, 2020 and (2) ensure that your primary email address to receive Notices of Electronic Filings (NEF) is accurate. Failure to provide an accurate email address may result in a delay in receiving NEFs after the Court converts to NextGen. (Administrator, ) (ADI)
April 22, 2020 Filing 5 AT&T SCHEDULING NOTICE FOR ALL TELEPHONIC CONFERENCES. Every Telephonic Conference conducted will be via an AT&T call-in number which requires participants to dial-in and provide an access code. When a Telephonic Conference is scheduled you will be instructed to refer back to this. This document has a security setting of "Case Participants Only," so only those individuals will have access to view the document. (jg)
April 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER RE: Rule 12(b) Motions (details more fully stated in said Order). Signed by Judge Robert J. Colville on 4/22/20. (jg)
April 22, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE that instant civil action has been designated for placement into the United States District Court's Alternative Dispute Resolution program. Parties are directed to fully complete the required 26(f) report, which includes the stipulation of selecting an ADR process. Counsel for plaintiff (or in the case of a removal action, counsel for removing defendant) shall make service of the notice on all parties. (jg)
April 22, 2020 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to FORCE ENVIRONMENTAL SOLUTIONS, LLC (ma)
April 22, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against FORCE ENVIRONMENTAL SOLUTIONS, LLC (Filing fee, including Administrative fee, $400, receipt number 0315-5572176), filed by CHARLES KENNEDY. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons) (ma)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: KENNEDY v. FORCE ENVIRONMENTAL SOLUTIONS, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CHARLES KENNEDY
Represented By: Ari R. Karpf
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FORCE ENVIRONMENTAL SOLUTIONS, LLC
Represented By: Dennis St. J. Mulvihill
Represented By: Amy V. Sims
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?