D'AMICO DRY D.A.C. v. XCOAL ENERGY AND RESOURCES GMBH
Plaintiff: D'AMICO DRY D.A.C.
Defendant: XCOAL ENERGY AND RESOURCES GMBH
Case Number: 2:2020cv00661
Filed: May 5, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: Cathy Bissoon
Nature of Suit: Contract: Marine
Cause of Action: 28:1333
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 16, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 16, 2020 FINAL NOTICE: In preparation of the Court's conversion to NextGen, our Court's CM/ECF system will be unavailable from 12:00 p.m. (Noon) on Friday, May 22, 2020, until 11:59 pm. Monday, May 25, 2020. Please plan accordingly. Complete information, including a checklist of actions regarding the WDPA NexGen CM/ECF implementation, can be found #here. Preparing for NextGen is a two-step process. The first step is to upgrade any legacy PACER accounts. The second step is to link that upgraded PACER account with your WDPA CM/ECF account after the Court goes live with NextGen. To link your account, you will need your current e-filing credentials from our Court. If your CM/ECF login contains any special characters (anything other than a letter or number), you will need to change it as logins with those characters will be unable to link to PACER accounts. No later than Thursday, May 21, 2020, you should log into both PACER and the current version of CM/ECF to review and record your current e-filing credentials for both, as you will need to know them in order to e-file after May 23, 2020. Please consult the Court's #administrative order for additional information on deadlines and alternative filing options during this period. (Administrator, ) (ADI)
May 13, 2020 Filing 9 STIPULATION for Voluntary Dismissal with Prejudice by D'AMICO DRY D.A.C.. (McQuiston, David)
May 12, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER granting #5 Motion for Order Appointing Special Process Server Pursuant to F.R.C.P. Rule 4(C). See contents of this filing.Signed by Judge Cathy Bissoon on 5/12/2020. (scl)
May 12, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER granting #4 Motion for Order Directing Process of Maritime Attachment. See contents of this filing. Signed by Judge Cathy Bissoon on 5/12/2020. (scl)
May 11, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Michael A. Shiner on behalf of PNC BANK, NATIONAL ASSOCIATION. (Shiner, Michael)
May 6, 2020 Filing 5 MOTION FOR ORDER APPOINTING SPECIAL PROCESS SERVER PURSUANT TO F.R.C.P. RULE 4(C) by D'AMICO DRY D.A.C.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1) (McQuiston, David)
May 6, 2020 Filing 4 MOTION FOR ORDER DIRECTING PROCESS OF MARITIME ATTACHMENT by D'AMICO DRY D.A.C.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2) (McQuiston, David)
May 5, 2020 Filing 3 Disclosure Statement identifying D' Amico Societa di Navigazione SpA, corporate parent;D' Amico International S.A, Corporate Parent ; Medbulk Maritime Ltd., Subsidiary; Medi Supra Pool Management Ltd., Subsidiary; Medi PMax Pool Management Ltd., Subsidiary as corporate parent or other affiliate, by D'AMICO DRY D.A.C.. (McQuiston, David)
May 5, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER re Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 12(b)Motions to Dismiss, more fully state in said order. Signed by Judge Cathy Bissoon on 5/5/20. (jhi)
May 5, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against XCOAL ENERGY AND RESOURCES GMBH (Filing fee, including Administrative fee, $400, receipt number 0315-5595215), filed by D'AMICO DRY D.A.C.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Declaration, #6 Civil Cover Sheet) (jjg)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: D'AMICO DRY D.A.C. v. XCOAL ENERGY AND RESOURCES GMBH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: D'AMICO DRY D.A.C.
Represented By: David M. McQuiston
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: XCOAL ENERGY AND RESOURCES GMBH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?