BUKA v. ALLEGHENY COUNTY, PENNSYLVAINA et al
Plaintiff: STEPHANIE BUKA
Defendant: ALLEGHENY COUNTY, PENNSYLVANIA and ALLEGHENY COUNTY, OFFICE OF COUNTY COUNCIL
Case Number: 2:2020cv00669
Filed: May 6, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: Robert J Colville
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 42:12101
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 23, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 23, 2020 Filing 13 BRIEF in Support re #12 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by ALLEGHENY COUNTY, PENNSYLVANIA. (Scott, Virginia)
June 23, 2020 Filing 12 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by ALLEGHENY COUNTY, PENNSYLVANIA. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A: Org Chart, #2 Proposed Order) (Scott, Virginia) Modified on 6/23/2020 (cel).
June 22, 2020 Filing 11 BRIEF in Support re #10 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by ALLEGHENY COUNTY, OFFICE OF COUNTY COUNCIL. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C) (Cambest, John) Modified on 6/23/2020 (cel).
June 22, 2020 Filing 10 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by ALLEGHENY COUNTY, OFFICE OF COUNTY COUNCIL. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Cambest, John)
June 15, 2020 Filing 9 Stipulation for Extension of Time to Answer by ALLEGHENY COUNTY, PENNSYLVANIA Answer due from ALLEGHENY COUNTY, PENNSYLVANIA, ALLEGHENY COUNTY, OFFICE OF COUNTY COUNCIL. (Scott, Virginia)
May 16, 2020 FINAL NOTICE: In preparation of the Court's conversion to NextGen, our Court's CM/ECF system will be unavailable from 12:00 p.m. (Noon) on Friday, May 22, 2020, until 11:59 pm. Monday, May 25, 2020. Please plan accordingly. Complete information, including a checklist of actions regarding the WDPA NexGen CM/ECF implementation, can be found #here. Preparing for NextGen is a two-step process. The first step is to upgrade any legacy PACER accounts. The second step is to link that upgraded PACER account with your WDPA CM/ECF account after the Court goes live with NextGen. To link your account, you will need your current e-filing credentials from our Court. If your CM/ECF login contains any special characters (anything other than a letter or number), you will need to change it as logins with those characters will be unable to link to PACER accounts. No later than Thursday, May 21, 2020, you should log into both PACER and the current version of CM/ECF to review and record your current e-filing credentials for both, as you will need to know them in order to e-file after May 23, 2020. Please consult the Court's #administrative order for additional information on deadlines and alternative filing options during this period. (Administrator, ) (ADI)
May 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER granting #7 Joint Motion to Stay; that this case is hereby stayed to 6/15/20; that the deadline for defendants to answer or otherwise respond is likewise extended to 6/15/20. Signed by Judge Robert J. Colville on 5/14/20. Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Order of the Court or Notice on the matter. (jg)
May 13, 2020 Filing 7 Joint MOTION to Stay by ALLEGHENY COUNTY, OFFICE OF COUNTY COUNCIL, ALLEGHENY COUNTY, PENNSYLVANIA. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Scott, Virginia)
May 8, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by John F. Cambest on behalf of ALLEGHENY COUNTY, OFFICE OF COUNTY COUNCIL. (Cambest, John)
May 7, 2020 Filing 4 AT&T SCHEDULING NOTICE FOR ALL TELEPHONIC CONFERENCES. Every Telephonic Conference conducted will be via an AT&T call-in number which requires participants to dial-in and provide an access code. When a Telephonic Conference is scheduled you will be instructed to refer back to this. This document has a security setting of "Case Participants Only," so only those individuals will have access to view the document. (jg)
May 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER RE: Rule 12(b) Motions (details more fully stated in said Order). Signed by Judge Robert J. Colville on 5/7/20. (jg)
May 7, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE that instant civil action has been designated for placement into the United States District Court's Alternative Dispute Resolution program. Parties are directed to fully complete the required 26(f) report, which includes the stipulation of selecting an ADR process. Counsel for plaintiff (or in the case of a removal action, counsel for removing defendant) shall make service of the notice on all parties. (jg)
May 7, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from ALLEGHENY COUNTY COURT OF COMMON PLEAS, case number GD-20-003585 with BOTH Copies attached: LOWER COURT COMPLAINT, EXHIBITS (Filing fee, including Administrative fee, $400, receipt number 0315-5596529), filed by ALLEGHENY COUNTY, OFFICE OF COUNTY COUNCIL, ALLEGHENY COUNTY, PENNSYLVANIA. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Civil Cover Sheet) (jd)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: BUKA v. ALLEGHENY COUNTY, PENNSYLVAINA et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ALLEGHENY COUNTY, PENNSYLVANIA
Represented By: Virginia Spencer Scott
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ALLEGHENY COUNTY, OFFICE OF COUNTY COUNCIL
Represented By: Virginia Spencer Scott
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: STEPHANIE BUKA
Represented By: Vincent J. Mersich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?