BERNARD v. FORD MOTOR COMPANY
Plaintiff: WALTER BERNARD
Defendant: FORD MOTOR COMPANY
Case Number: 2:2020cv00670
Filed: May 6, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: David S Cercone
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:2000e
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 30, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 30, 2020 Filing 3 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by WALTER BERNARD. FORD MOTOR COMPANY waiver sent on 5/28/2020, answer due 7/27/2020. (Coleman, Margaret)
May 18, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE that instant civil action has been designated for placement into the United States District Court's Alternative Dispute Resolution program. Parties are directed to fully complete the required 26(f) report, which includes the stipulation of selecting an ADR process. Counsel for plaintiff (or in the case of a removal action, counsel for removing defendant) shall make service of the notice on all parties. (kak)
May 16, 2020 FINAL NOTICE: In preparation of the Court's conversion to NextGen, our Court's CM/ECF system will be unavailable from 12:00 p.m. (Noon) on Friday, May 22, 2020, until 11:59 pm. Monday, May 25, 2020. Please plan accordingly. Complete information, including a checklist of actions regarding the WDPA NexGen CM/ECF implementation, can be found #here. Preparing for NextGen is a two-step process. The first step is to upgrade any legacy PACER accounts. The second step is to link that upgraded PACER account with your WDPA CM/ECF account after the Court goes live with NextGen. To link your account, you will need your current e-filing credentials from our Court. If your CM/ECF login contains any special characters (anything other than a letter or number), you will need to change it as logins with those characters will be unable to link to PACER accounts. No later than Thursday, May 21, 2020, you should log into both PACER and the current version of CM/ECF to review and record your current e-filing credentials for both, as you will need to know them in order to e-file after May 23, 2020. Please consult the Court's #administrative order for additional information on deadlines and alternative filing options during this period. (Administrator, ) (ADI)
May 6, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against FORD MOTOR COMPANY (Filing fee, including Administrative fee, $400, receipt number 0315-5597163), filed by WALTER BERNARD. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B) (cel)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: BERNARD v. FORD MOTOR COMPANY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FORD MOTOR COMPANY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: WALTER BERNARD
Represented By: Margaret Schuetz Coleman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?