MOSES v. UNITED STATES STEEL CORPORATION
Plaintiff: KENNETH MOSES
Defendant: UNITED STATES STEEL CORPORATION
Case Number: 2:2020cv00752
Filed: May 22, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: Robert J Colville
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 42:1981
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 29, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER granting #8 Plaintiff's Consent Motion to Continue; that the Telephonic Initial Case Management set for 6/22/20 at 11:00 AM is re-set for 7/14/20 at 11:00 AM before Judge Robert J. Colville. All remaining deadlines set forth in the Memorandum Order Setting Preliminary Conference of Counsel remain in effect. Signed by Judge Robert J. Colville on 5/29/20. (jg)
May 29, 2020 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Allison N. Genard on behalf of KENNETH MOSES. (Genard, Allison)
May 29, 2020 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Andrew J. Horowitz on behalf of KENNETH MOSES. (Horowitz, Andrew)
May 29, 2020 Filing 8 MOTION to Continue by KENNETH MOSES. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Fox, Bruce)
May 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 MEMORANDUM ORDER indicating that the parties' Rule 26 Meeting Report and Stipulation Selecting ADR Process are due by 6/15/20; A Telephonic Initial Case Management Conference is set for 6/22/20 at 11:00 AM. At least 3 business days prior to the Initial Case Management Conference, counsel for each party shall fax directly to this Courts Chambers at (412) 208-7309, a confidential position letter not to exceed 3 pages. See Hon. Robert J. Colville Practices and Procedures, III.A.2. Signed by Judge Robert J. Colville on 5/28/20. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B) (jg)
May 27, 2020 Filing 6 ANSWER to Complaint by UNITED STATES STEEL CORPORATION. (Reynolds, Samuel)
May 27, 2020 Filing 5 Disclosure Statement identifying None as corporate parent or other affiliate, by UNITED STATES STEEL CORPORATION. (Reynolds, Samuel)
May 26, 2020 Filing 4 AT&T SCHEDULING NOTICE FOR ALL TELEPHONIC CONFERENCES. Every Telephonic Conference conducted will be via an AT&T call-in number which requires participants to dial-in and provide an access code. When a Telephonic Conference is scheduled you will be instructed to refer back to this. This document has a security setting of "Case Participants Only," so only those individuals will have access to view the document. (jg)
May 26, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER RE: Rule 12(b) Motions (details more fully stated in said Order). Signed by Judge Robert J. Colville on 5/26/20. (jg)
May 26, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE that instant civil action has been designated for placement into the United States District Court's Alternative Dispute Resolution program. Parties are directed to fully complete the required 26(f) report, which includes the stipulation of selecting an ADR process. Counsel for plaintiff (or in the case of a removal action, counsel for removing defendant) shall make service of the notice on all parties. (jg)
May 22, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Allegheny County, case number GD19-16834 with jury demand (Filing fee, including Administrative fee, $400, receipt number 315-5620013), filed by UNITED STATES STEEL CORPORATION. (Attachments: #1 Notice of filing, #2 Praecipe to issue writ, #3 County complaint, #4 Civil Cover Sheet) (sdp)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: MOSES v. UNITED STATES STEEL CORPORATION
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UNITED STATES STEEL CORPORATION
Represented By: Samuel F. Reynolds, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: KENNETH MOSES
Represented By: Andrew J. Horowitz
Represented By: Allison N. Genard
Represented By: Bruce C. Fox
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?