LabMD, INC. V THE PRIVACY INSTITUTE ET AL
Plaintiff: LABMD, INC.
Defendant: ROBERT J. BOBACK, THE PRIVACY INSTITUTE, REED SMITH LLP, TIVERSA HOLDING CORP., BRIAN J. TARQUINIO and JARROD D. SHAW
Case Number: 2:2020cv00766
Filed: May 27, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: J Nicholas Ranjan
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 27, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 27, 2020 Filing 128 NOTICE of Appearance by Daniel McArdle Booker on behalf of ROBERT J. BOBACK. (Booker, Daniel)
May 27, 2020 Filing 127 NOTICE of Appearance by David J. Berardinelli on behalf of ROBERT J. BOBACK. (Berardinelli, David)
May 27, 2020 Filing 126 Case transferred in from District of Virginia Eastern; Case Number 1:19-cv-00852. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
May 18, 2020 Case transferred to District of United States District Court for the Western District of Pennsylvania. Original file, certified copy of transfer order, and docket sheet sent. (choy, )
May 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 125 ORDERED that this action be, and the same hereby is, TRANSFERRED to the United States District Court for the Western District of Pennsylvania; that Defendant Robert J. Boback's Motion to Dismiss #70 , Defendant Tiversa Holding Corp's Motion to Dismiss #72 , and Defendant Reed Smith LLP's and Jarrod Shaw's Motion to Dismiss #76 be, and the same hereby are, referred to the Western District of Pennsylvania; that the hearing on the Motions #70 #72 #76 , currently scheduled for Friday, May 22, 2020 at 10:00 a.m., be, and the same hereby is, CANCELLED. Signed by District Judge Anthony J Trenga on 05/18/2020. (choy, )(Copies sent to counsel of record on 05/18/2020)
May 13, 2020 Filing 124 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons and Amended Complaint served on Brian J. Tarquinio on May 11, 2020, filed by LabMD, Inc.. (Biss, Steven)
May 6, 2020 Filing 123 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Tiversa Holding Corp. re #122 Reply to Response to Motion (Grimsley, Douglas)
May 6, 2020 Filing 122 REPLY to Response to Motion re #72 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim , Lack of Personal Jurisdiction, and Improper Venue to filed by Tiversa Holding Corp.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Grimsley, Douglas)
May 6, 2020 Filing 121 REPLY to Response to Motion re #70 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim and for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction and Improper Venue filed by Robert J. Boback. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Ex. A, #2 Exhibit Ex. B, #3 Exhibit Ex. C, #4 Exhibit Ex. D, #5 Exhibit Ex. E, #6 Exhibit Ex. F)(Helsel, Scott)
May 6, 2020 Filing 120 CERTIFICATE of Service re #119 Reply to Response to Motion by Edward John Bennett on behalf of Reed Smith, LLP, Jarrod D. Shaw (Bennett, Edward)
May 6, 2020 Filing 119 REPLY to Response to Motion re #76 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim , Lack of Personal Jurisdiction, and Improper Venue filed by Reed Smith, LLP, Jarrod D. Shaw. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 15)(Bennett, Edward)
May 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 118 ORDERED that the Motion is GRANTED; The Clerk shall place 108 under seal. Signed by Magistrate Judge Ivan D. Davis on 05/06/2020. (choy, )(Copies sent to all counsel of record on 05/06/2020)
May 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 117 ORDERED that Defendants Reed Smith, LLPs and Jarrod Shaws Motion to Strike or, In the Alternative, For Leave to File a Surreply #110 be, and the same hereby is, GRANTED in part and DENIED in part. The motion is granted to the extent the Court accepts as filed the attached memorandum and exhibit as a sur-reply; and it is otherwise denied; that Plaintiff LabMD, Inc.s Motion to Disqualify #66 be, and the same hereby is, DENIED; that the hearing on the Motion to Disqualify #66 and Motion to Strike or, In the Alternative, For Leave to File a Surreply #110 , currently scheduled for Friday, May 22, 2020, be, and the same hereby is, CANCELLED. Signed by District Judge Anthony J Trenga on 05/04/2020. (choy, )(Copies sent to counsel on 05/04/2020)
May 1, 2020 Set Hearings Motion Hearing set for 5/22/2020 at 10:00 AM in Alexandria Courtroom 701 before District Judge Anthony J Trenga. (choy, )
May 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 116 ORDER that Tiversa Holding Corp's Consent Motion for Coordinated Hearing Date Regarding Motion to Dismiss the Amended Complaint is GRANTED; Tiversa HoldingCorp. is permitted to appear for, attend or otherwise participate in a May 22, 2020 hearing concerning its Motion to Dismiss LabMD, Inc.'s Amended Complaint through its pro hac vice counsel and without its Virginia counsel. Signed by District Judge Anthony J Trenga on 05/01/2020. (choy, )
May 1, 2020 Filing 115 NOTICE by Reed Smith, LLP, Jarrod D. Shaw re 106 MOTION to Seal , noting submission of motion on consent and without oral argument (Marx, Jared)
April 30, 2020 Filing 114 Memorandum in Opposition re #70 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim and for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction and Improper Venue, #72 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim , Lack of Personal Jurisdiction, and Improper Venue to, #76 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim , Lack of Personal Jurisdiction, and Improper Venue filed by LabMD, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit A - Declaration of Michael J. Daugherty, #2 Exhibit B - OGR Report, #3 Exhibit C - ALJ Decision, #4 Exhibit D - R&R)(Biss, Steven)
April 30, 2020 Set Deadlines as to #110 MOTION to Strike #103 Reply to Response to Motion, or for Surreply,, #66 MOTION to Disqualify Counsel . Motion Hearing set for 5/22/2020 at 10:00 AM in Alexandria Courtroom 701 before District Judge Anthony J Trenga. (clar, )
April 29, 2020 Filing 113 Notice of Hearing Date set for May 22 re #110 MOTION to Strike #103 Reply to Response to Motion, or for Surreply, (Marx, Jared)
April 29, 2020 Filing 112 Notice of Hearing Date set for May 22 re #66 MOTION to Disqualify Counsel (Marx, Jared)
April 28, 2020 Notice of Correction re 106 MOTION to Seal . The filing user has been notified to file a Notice of Hearing Date or a Notice of Waiver of Oral Argument. (choy, )
April 28, 2020 Filing 111 Memorandum in Support re #110 MOTION to Strike #103 Reply to Response to Motion, or for Surreply, PUBLIC REDACTED, filed by Reed Smith, LLP, Jarrod D. Shaw. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Robert Cary)(Marx, Jared)
April 28, 2020 Filing 110 MOTION to Strike #103 Reply to Response to Motion, or for Surreply, by Reed Smith, LLP, Jarrod D. Shaw. (Marx, Jared)
April 28, 2020 Filing 109 CERTIFICATE of Service re 108 Sealed Memorandum in Support by Jared Paul Marx on behalf of Reed Smith, LLP, Jarrod D. Shaw (Marx, Jared)
April 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 105 ORDERED that Plaintiff LabMD, Inc.'s Motion for Extension of Time to File Memoranda in Opposition to Defendants Tiversa Holding Corp., Robert J. Boback, Reed Smith, LLP and Jarrod Shaws motions to dismiss #70 #72 #76 is GRANTED; Plaintiff shall file its memoranda in opposition to Defendants motions to dismiss on or before April 30, 2020.Signed by District Judge Anthony J Trenga on 04/28/2020. (choy, )
April 24, 2020 Filing 104 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #70 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim and for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction and Improper Venue, #72 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim , Lack of Personal Jurisdiction, and Improper Venue to, #76 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim , Lack of Personal Jurisdiction, and Improper Venue (Unopposed Motion) by LabMD, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Biss, Steven)
April 21, 2020 Filing 103 REPLY to Response to Motion re #66 MOTION to Disqualify Counsel filed by LabMD, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Declaration of Michael Daugherty, #2 Exhibit B - Declaration of James Hawkins, #3 Exhibit C - Declaration of Daniel Regard, #4 Exhibit D - Pierson Email)(Biss, Steven)
April 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 102 ORDERED that the Motion is GRANTED. The Clerk shall place Dkt. Nos. 97 , 97 -1, and 97 -2 under seal. Signed by Magistrate Judge Ivan D. Davis on 04/21/2020. (choy, )
April 20, 2020 Filing 101 Memorandum in Opposition re #66 MOTION to Disqualify Counsel , PUBLIC REDACTED, filed by Reed Smith, LLP, Jarrod D. Shaw. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, Public Redacted, of Robert Cary, #2 Affidavit, Public Redacted, of Bernard J. DiMuro, Esq.)(Marx, Jared)
April 13, 2020 Filing 100 CERTIFICATE of Service re 97 Sealed Response/Reply/Opposition by Jared Paul Marx on behalf of Reed Smith, LLP, Jarrod D. Shaw (Marx, Jared)
April 13, 2020 Filing 99 Memorandum in Support re 95 MOTION to Seal filed by Reed Smith, LLP, Jarrod D. Shaw. (Marx, Jared)
April 13, 2020 Filing 98 AFFIDAVIT re 97 Sealed Response/Reply/Opposition by Reed Smith, LLP, Jarrod D. Shaw. (Marx, Jared)
April 13, 2020 Set Deadlines as to #76 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim , Lack of Personal Jurisdiction, and Improper Venue, #70 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim and for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction and Improper Venue. Motion Hearing set for 5/22/2020 at 10:00 AM in Alexandria Courtroom 701 before District Judge Anthony J Trenga. (clar, )
April 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 94 ORDER Granting #86 Motion for Pro hac vice for Thomas Brent Mason. Signed by District Judge Anthony J Trenga on 04/10/2020. (choy, )
April 10, 2020 Filing 93 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Tiversa Holding Corp. re #92 Waiver of Hearing on Consented to Motion for Coordinated Hearing Date (Grimsley, Douglas)
April 10, 2020 Filing 92 Waiver of re #90 Consent MOTION for Hearing re #82 Notice of Hearing Date Consented to Motion for Coordinated Hearing Date re Motion to Dismiss Amended Complaint by Tiversa Holding Corp. (Grimsley, Douglas)
April 10, 2020 Filing 91 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Tiversa Holding Corp. re #90 Consent MOTION for Hearing re #82 Notice of Hearing Date Consented to Motion for Coordinated Hearing Date re Motion to Dismiss Amended Complaint (Grimsley, Douglas)
April 10, 2020 Filing 90 Consent MOTION for Hearing re #82 Notice of Hearing Date Consented to Motion for Coordinated Hearing Date re Motion to Dismiss Amended Complaint by Tiversa Holding Corp.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Grimsley, Douglas)
April 10, 2020 Filing 89 CERTIFICATE of Service re #88 Notice of Hearing Date by Edward John Bennett on behalf of Reed Smith, LLP, Jarrod D. Shaw (Bennett, Edward)
April 10, 2020 Filing 88 Notice of Hearing Date re #76 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim , Lack of Personal Jurisdiction, and Improper Venue (Bennett, Edward)
April 10, 2020 Filing 87 Notice of Hearing Date re #70 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim and for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction and Improper Venue (Helsel, Scott)
April 9, 2020 Filing 86 Motion to appear Pro Hac Vice by Thomas B. Mason and Certification of Local Counsel Jared Paul Marx Filing fee $ 75, receipt number 0422-7153852. by Reed Smith, LLP, Jarrod D. Shaw. (Marx, Jared)
April 9, 2020 Filing 85 NOTICE of Appearance by Jared Paul Marx on behalf of Reed Smith, LLP, Jarrod D. Shaw (Marx, Jared)
March 27, 2020 Filing 84 Notice of Hearing Date re #70 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim and for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction and Improper Venue (Helsel, Scott)
March 27, 2020 Filing 83 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Tiversa Holding Corp. re #82 Notice of Hearing Date (Grimsley, Douglas)
March 27, 2020 Filing 82 Notice of Hearing Date Tiversa re #72 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim , Lack of Personal Jurisdiction, and Improper Venue to (Grimsley, Douglas)
March 27, 2020 Filing 81 CERTIFICATE of Service re #78 Notice of Hearing Date by Edward John Bennett on behalf of Reed Smith, LLP, Jarrod D. Shaw (Bennett, Edward)
March 27, 2020 Filing 80 CERTIFICATE of Service re #77 Memorandum in Support,, by Edward John Bennett on behalf of Reed Smith, LLP, Jarrod D. Shaw (Bennett, Edward)
March 27, 2020 Filing 79 CERTIFICATE of Service re #76 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim , Lack of Personal Jurisdiction, and Improper Venue by Edward John Bennett on behalf of Reed Smith, LLP, Jarrod D. Shaw (Bennett, Edward)
March 27, 2020 Filing 78 Notice of Hearing Date re #76 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim , Lack of Personal Jurisdiction, and Improper Venue (Bennett, Edward)
March 27, 2020 Filing 77 Memorandum in Support re #76 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim , Lack of Personal Jurisdiction, and Improper Venue filed by Reed Smith, LLP, Jarrod D. Shaw. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Declaration of Peter Kennedy, #2 Affidavit Declaration of Jarrod Shaw, #3 Affidavit Declaration of Edward Bennett, #4 Exhibit 1, #5 Exhibit 2, #6 Exhibit 3, #7 Exhibit 4, #8 Exhibit 5, #9 Exhibit 6, #10 Exhibit 7, #11 Exhibit 8, #12 Exhibit 9, #13 Exhibit 10, #14 Exhibit 11, #15 Exhibit 12, #16 Exhibit 13, #17 Exhibit 14)(Bennett, Edward)
March 27, 2020 Filing 76 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim , Lack of Personal Jurisdiction, and Improper Venue by Reed Smith, LLP, Jarrod D. Shaw. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Bennett, Edward)
March 27, 2020 Filing 75 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Tiversa Holding Corp. re #74 Memorandum in Support, (Grimsley, Douglas)
March 27, 2020 Filing 74 Memorandum in Support re #72 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim , Lack of Personal Jurisdiction, and Improper Venue to filed by Tiversa Holding Corp.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Griffin Schultz)(Grimsley, Douglas)
March 27, 2020 Filing 73 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Tiversa Holding Corp. re #72 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim , Lack of Personal Jurisdiction, and Improper Venue to (Grimsley, Douglas)
March 27, 2020 Filing 72 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim , Lack of Personal Jurisdiction, and Improper Venue to by Tiversa Holding Corp.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Grimsley, Douglas)
March 27, 2020 Filing 71 Memorandum in Support re #70 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim and for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction and Improper Venue filed by Robert J. Boback. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I, #10 Exhibit J, #11 Exhibit K, #12 Exhibit L, #13 Exhibit M, #14 Exhibit N, #15 Exhibit O)(Helsel, Scott)
March 27, 2020 Notice of Correction re #70 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim and for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction and Improper Venue. The filing user has been notified to file a Notice of Hearing Date or a Notice of Waiver of Oral Argument. (choy, )
March 27, 2020 Filing 70 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim and for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction and Improper Venue by Robert J. Boback. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Helsel, Scott)
March 19, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 69 ORDERED that Defendant Reed Smith LLP's and Jarrod Shaw's Motion to Dismiss #28 be, and the same hereby is, DENIED as moot; that Defendant Robert J. Boback's Motion to Dismiss Complaint Under Rules 12(b)(2), (3), and (6) #34 be, and the same hereby is, DENIED as moot; that Defendant Tiversa Holding Corp. Motion to Dismiss Pursuant to Federal Rules of Civil Procedure 12(b)(2), 12(b)(3), and 12(b)(6) #42 be, and the same hereby is, DENIED as moot; that the hearing on Motions [28,34,42], currently scheduled for Friday, April 10, 2020 at 10:00 a.m., be and the same, hereby is, CANCELLED. Signed by District Judge Anthony J Trenga on 03/19/2020. (choy, )
March 16, 2020 Notice of Correction re #66 MOTION to Disqualify Counsel . The filing user has been notified to file a Notice of Hearing Date or a Notice of Waiver of Oral Argument (choy, )
March 16, 2020 Filing 68 AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by LabMD, Inc..(Biss, Steven)
March 16, 2020 Filing 67 Memorandum in Support re #66 MOTION to Disqualify Counsel filed by LabMD, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Cary Email, #2 Exhibit B - 7.16.19 Email)(Biss, Steven)
March 16, 2020 Filing 66 MOTION to Disqualify Counsel by LabMD, Inc.. (Biss, Steven)
March 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 65 Order Rule 16(b) Scheduling Order. Because the parties' Proposed Amended Joint Discovery Plan #64 adequately addresses the matters that would be discussed during the initial pretrial conference and counsel consent to waiving their appearances at the initial pretrial conference, the initial pretrial conference scheduled for March 18, 2020, pursuant to Rule 16(b) and this Court's February 25, 2020, Order, is cancelled. Upon consideration of the representations made by the parties in their Proposed Amended Joint Discovery Plan, the Court makes the following rulings: The parties' Amended Joint Discovery Plan is approved and shall control discovery to the extent of its application unless further modified by the Court. See order for further details. Signed by Magistrate Judge Ivan D. Davis on 3/16/2020. (lgue, )
March 16, 2020 Filing 64 [Proposed] Amended Joint Discovery Plan by Robert J. Boback.(Helsel, Scott)
March 11, 2020 Filing 63 [Proposed] Joint Discovery Plan by Robert J. Boback.(Helsel, Scott)
March 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 62 ORDER Granting #59 Motion for Pro hac vice for David Randall Jeffrey Riskin. Signed by District Judge Anthony J Trenga on 03/02/2020. (choy, )
March 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 61 ORDER Granting #58 Motion for Pro hac vice for Andrew Wheeler Rudge. Signed by District Judge Anthony J Trenga on 03/02/2020. (choy, )
March 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 60 ORDER Granting #57 Motion for Pro hac vice for Margaret Anne Keeley. Signed by District Judge Anthony J Trenga on 03/02/2020. (choy, )
February 28, 2020 Filing 59 Motion to appear Pro Hac Vice by David R.J. Riskin and Certification of Local Counsel Edward Bennett Filing fee $ 75, receipt number 0422-7098183. by Reed Smith, LLP, Jarrod D. Shaw. (Bennett, Edward)
February 28, 2020 Filing 58 Motion to appear Pro Hac Vice by Andrew W. Rudge and Certification of Local Counsel Edward Bennett Filing fee $ 75, receipt number 0422-7098182. by Reed Smith, LLP, Jarrod D. Shaw. (Bennett, Edward)
February 28, 2020 Filing 57 Motion to appear Pro Hac Vice by Margaret A. Keeley and Certification of Local Counsel Edward Bennett Filing fee $ 75, receipt number 0422-7098176. by Reed Smith, LLP, Jarrod D. Shaw. (Bennett, Edward)
February 26, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 56 ORDER Granting #49 Motion for Pro hac vice for Brett Wray Farrar. Signed by District Judge Anthony J Trenga on 02/26/2020. (choy, )
February 26, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 55 ORDER Granting #37 Motion for Pro hac vice for David John Berardinelli. Signed by District Judge Anthony J Trenga on 02/26/2020. (choy, )
February 26, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 54 ORDER Granting #50 Motion for Pro hac vice for Steven William Zoffer. Signed by District Judge Anthony J Trenga on 02/26/2020. (choy, )
February 26, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 53 ORDER Granting #39 Motion for Pro hac vice for Daniel McArdle Booker.. Signed by District Judge Anthony J Trenga on 02/26/2020. (choy, )
February 25, 2020 Filing 52 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Tiversa Holding Corp. re #50 Motion to appear Pro Hac Vice by Steven W. Zoffer and Certification of Local Counsel Douglas M. Grimsley Filing fee $ 75, receipt number 0422-7090978. (Grimsley, Douglas)
February 25, 2020 Filing 51 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Tiversa Holding Corp. re #49 Motion to appear Pro Hac Vice by Brett W. Farrar and Certification of Local Counsel Dougas M. Grimsley Filing fee $ 75, receipt number 0422-7090920. (Grimsley, Douglas)
February 25, 2020 Filing 50 Motion to appear Pro Hac Vice by Steven W. Zoffer and Certification of Local Counsel Douglas M. Grimsley Filing fee $ 75, receipt number 0422-7090978. by Tiversa Holding Corp.. (Grimsley, Douglas)
February 25, 2020 Filing 49 Motion to appear Pro Hac Vice by Brett W. Farrar and Certification of Local Counsel Dougas M. Grimsley Filing fee $ 75, receipt number 0422-7090920. by Tiversa Holding Corp.. (Grimsley, Douglas)
February 25, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 48 SCHEDULING ORDER: Initial Pretrial Conference set for 3/18/2020 at 11:00 AM in Alexandria Courtroom 301 before Magistrate Judge Ivan D. Davis. Final Pretrial Conference set for 7/16/2020 at 10:00 AM in Alexandria Courtroom 701 before District Judge Anthony J. Trenga. Discovery due by 7/10/2020. Signed by District Judge Anthony J. Trenga on 2/25/2020. (Attachments: #1 Magistrate Consent, #2 Pretrial Notice)(dzir)
February 25, 2020 Set Deadlines as to #42 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim , Lack of Personal Jurisdiction, and Improper Venue. Motion Hearing set for 4/10/2020 at 10:00 AM in Alexandria Courtroom 701 before District Judge Anthony J Trenga. (klau, )
February 25, 2020 Set Deadlines as to #34 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim and For Lack of Personal Jurisdiction and Improper Venue. Motion Hearing set for 4/10/2020 at 10:00 AM in Alexandria Courtroom 701 before District Judge Anthony J Trenga. (klau, )
February 25, 2020 Set Deadlines as to #28 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim . Motion Hearing set for 4/10/2020 at 10:00 AM in Alexandria Courtroom 701 before District Judge Anthony J Trenga. (klau, )
February 24, 2020 Filing 47 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Tiversa Holding Corp. re #46 Notice of Hearing Date (Grimsley, Douglas)
February 24, 2020 Filing 46 Notice of Hearing Date set for April 10, 2020 re #42 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim , Lack of Personal Jurisdiction, and Improper Venue (Grimsley, Douglas)
February 24, 2020 Filing 45 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Tiversa Holding Corp. re #44 Memorandum in Support, (Grimsley, Douglas)
February 24, 2020 Filing 44 Memorandum in Support re #42 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim , Lack of Personal Jurisdiction, and Improper Venue filed by Tiversa Holding Corp.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Griffin Schultz)(Grimsley, Douglas)
February 24, 2020 Filing 43 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Tiversa Holding Corp. re #42 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim , Lack of Personal Jurisdiction, and Improper Venue (Grimsley, Douglas)
February 24, 2020 Filing 42 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim , Lack of Personal Jurisdiction, and Improper Venue by Tiversa Holding Corp.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Grimsley, Douglas)
February 24, 2020 Filing 41 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Tiversa Holding Corp. re #40 Corporate Disclosure Statement (Grimsley, Douglas)
February 24, 2020 Filing 40 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Tiversa Holding Corp.. (Grimsley, Douglas)
February 24, 2020 Filing 39 Motion to appear Pro Hac Vice by Daniel McArdle Booker and Certification of Local Counsel Scott D. Helsel Filing fee $ 75, receipt number 0422-7089110. by Robert J. Boback. (Helsel, Scott)
February 24, 2020 Filing 38 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Tiversa Holding Corp. re #27 Notice of Appearance (Grimsley, Douglas)
February 24, 2020 Filing 37 Motion to appear Pro Hac Vice by David John Berardinelli and Certification of Local Counsel Scott D. Helsel Filing fee $ 75, receipt number 0422-7089098. by Robert J. Boback. (Helsel, Scott)
February 24, 2020 Filing 36 Notice of Hearing Date re #34 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim and For Lack of Personal Jurisdiction and Improper Venue (Helsel, Scott)
February 24, 2020 Filing 35 Memorandum in Support re #34 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim and For Lack of Personal Jurisdiction and Improper Venue filed by Robert J. Boback. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Ex. A, #2 Exhibit Ex. B, #3 Exhibit Ex. C, #4 Exhibit Ex. D)(Helsel, Scott)
February 24, 2020 Filing 34 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim and For Lack of Personal Jurisdiction and Improper Venue by Robert J. Boback. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Helsel, Scott)
February 24, 2020 Filing 33 CERTIFICATE of Service re #30 Notice of Hearing Date by Edward John Bennett on behalf of Reed Smith, LLP, Jarrod D. Shaw (Bennett, Edward)
February 24, 2020 Filing 32 CERTIFICATE of Service re #29 Memorandum in Support,, by Edward John Bennett on behalf of Reed Smith, LLP, Jarrod D. Shaw (Bennett, Edward)
February 24, 2020 Filing 31 CERTIFICATE of Service re #28 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by Edward John Bennett on behalf of Reed Smith, LLP, Jarrod D. Shaw (Bennett, Edward)
February 24, 2020 Filing 30 Notice of Hearing Date April 10, 2020 re #28 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim (Bennett, Edward)
February 24, 2020 Filing 29 Memorandum in Support re #28 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Reed Smith, LLP, Jarrod D. Shaw. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Declaration of Peter Kennedy, #2 Affidavit Declaration of Jarrod Shaw, #3 Affidavit Declaration of Edward Bennett, #4 Exhibit 1, #5 Exhibit 2, #6 Exhibit 3, #7 Exhibit 4, #8 Exhibit 5, #9 Exhibit 6, #10 Exhibit 7, #11 Exhibit 8, #12 Exhibit 9, #13 Exhibit 10, #14 Exhibit 11, #15 Exhibit 12, #16 Exhibit 13, #17 Exhibit 14)(Bennett, Edward)
February 24, 2020 Filing 28 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by Reed Smith, LLP, Jarrod D. Shaw. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Bennett, Edward)
February 24, 2020 Filing 27 NOTICE of Appearance by Douglas Michael Grimsley on behalf of Tiversa Holding Corp. (Grimsley, Douglas)
January 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 26 SO ORDERED that the Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer is GRANTED; that Boback, Tiversa, Reed Smith, and Shaw shall respond to the complaint #1 by February 24, 2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Ivan D. Davis on 01/14/2020. (choy, )(Copies mailed to counsel of record on 01/14/2020)
January 11, 2020 Filing 25 CERTIFICATE of Service re #24 Notice of Hearing Date by Edward John Bennett on behalf of Robert J. Boback, Reed Smith, LLP, Jarrod D. Shaw, Tiversa Holding Corp. (Bennett, Edward)
January 11, 2020 Filing 24 Notice of Hearing Date (Waiver) re #22 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, (Bennett, Edward)
January 11, 2020 Filing 23 CERTIFICATE of Service re #22 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, by Edward John Bennett on behalf of Robert J. Boback, Reed Smith, LLP, Jarrod D. Shaw, Tiversa Holding Corp. (Bennett, Edward)
January 11, 2020 Filing 22 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, by Robert J. Boback, Reed Smith, LLP, Jarrod D. Shaw, Tiversa Holding Corp.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Bennett, Edward)
December 24, 2019 Filing 21 NOTICE by LabMD, Inc. Regarding Service of Process (Biss, Steven)
December 6, 2019 Filing 20 Summons Issued as to Robert J. Boback, Reed Smith, LLP, Jarrod D. Shaw, Brian J. Tarquinio, The Privacy Institute, Tiversa Holding Corp.. NOTICE TO ATTORNEY: Print out two Electronically issued summons and one copy of the attachments for each defendant to be served with the complaint. (Attachments: #1 Notice to Attorney)(choy, )
December 5, 2019 Filing 19 Proposed Summons re #1 Complaint, by LabMD, Inc.. (Biss, Steven)
December 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDERED that Plaintiff, within twenty-one (21) days of the date of this Order, file proofs of service, indicating service to the defendants named in this action, and absent such filings, this action will be dismissed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P.4(m). Signed by District Judge Anthony J Trenga on 12/03/2019. (choy, )(c/s)
November 29, 2019 Filing 17 Response to #16 Order to Show Cause filed by LabMD, Inc.. (Biss, Steven)
November 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDERED that the Plaintiff, within ten (10) days of the date of this Order, show cause, if any there be, why this case should not be dismissed pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P.4(m). Signed by District Judge Anthony J Trenga on 11/18/2019. (choy, )
July 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER denying without prejudice #8 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Signed by Magistrate Judge Ivan D. Davis on 7/23/2019. (rban, )
July 23, 2019 Filing 14 NOTICE of Appearance by Dane Hal Butswinkas on behalf of Reed Smith, LLP, Jarrod D. Shaw (Butswinkas, Dane)
July 22, 2019 Filing 13 Memorandum in Opposition re #8 First MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, filed by LabMD, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Biss, Steven)
July 18, 2019 Filing 12 Financial Interest Disclosure Statement (Local Rule 7.1) by LabMD, Inc.. (Biss, Steven)
July 18, 2019 Notice of Correction re #11 Certificate of Service, #9 Certificate of Service An incomplete, document was filed(clar, )
July 18, 2019 MOTIONS REFERRED to Magistrate Judge: Davis. #8 First MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, (clar, )
July 18, 2019 Set Deadlines as to #8 First MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, . Motion Hearing set for 7/26/2019 at 10:00 AM in Alexandria Courtroom 301 before Magistrate Judge Ivan D. Davis. (clar, )
July 17, 2019 Filing 11 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Reed Smith, LLP re #10 Notice of Hearing Date (Bennett, Edward)
July 17, 2019 Filing 10 Notice of Hearing Date re #8 First MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, (Bennett, Edward)
July 17, 2019 Filing 9 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Reed Smith, LLP re #8 First MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, (Bennett, Edward)
July 17, 2019 Filing 8 First MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, by Reed Smith, LLP. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Bennett, Edward)
July 17, 2019 Filing 7 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Reed Smith, LLP re #6 Corporate Disclosure Statement (Bennett, Edward)
July 17, 2019 Filing 6 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Reed Smith, LLP. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit List of Reed Smith Professionals)(Bennett, Edward)
July 17, 2019 Filing 5 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Jarrod D. Shaw re #3 Notice of Appearance (Bennett, Edward)
July 17, 2019 Filing 4 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Reed Smith, LLP re #2 Notice of Appearance (Bennett, Edward)
July 17, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Edward John Bennett on behalf of Jarrod D. Shaw (Bennett, Edward)
July 17, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Edward John Bennett on behalf of Reed Smith, LLP (Bennett, Edward)
June 26, 2019 Initial Case Assignment to District Judge Anthony J Trenga and Magistrate Judge Ivan D. Davis. (choy, )
June 26, 2019 Electronic Fee Payment - as to #1 Complaint by LabMD, Inc.. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0422-6710236.. (Biss, Steven)
June 26, 2019 Filing 1 Complaint against Tiversa Holding Corp., The Privacy Institute, Brian J. Tarquinio, Jarrod D. Shaw, Reed Smith, LLP and Robert J. Boback , filed by LabMD, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Biss, Steven) Modified on 6/26/2019 to add Deft parties. (choy, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: LabMD, INC. V THE PRIVACY INSTITUTE ET AL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ROBERT J. BOBACK
Represented By: Daniel McArdle Booker
Represented By: David J. Berardinelli
Represented By: Scott D. Helsel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: THE PRIVACY INSTITUTE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: REED SMITH LLP
Represented By: Dane Hal Butswinkas
Represented By: Edward John Bennett
Represented By: Jared Paul Marx
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TIVERSA HOLDING CORP.
Represented By: Douglas Michael Grimsley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BRIAN J. TARQUINIO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JARROD D. SHAW
Represented By: Dane Hal Butswinkas
Represented By: Edward John Bennett
Represented By: Jared Paul Marx
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: LABMD, INC.
Represented By: Steven Scott Biss
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?