KURDILLA v. UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Plaintiff: ALYSIA G. KURDILLA
Defendant: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Case Number: 2:2020cv00824
Filed: June 4, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: Mark R Hornak
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Med. Malpractice
Cause of Action: 28:2671
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 10, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER APPROVING #15 Stipulation to Extend Time to Respond to Complaint. Defendant's answer to the Complaint is due on or before 9/9/20. Signed by Chief Judge Mark R. Hornak on 7/10/20. Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Order of the Court or Notice on the matter. (jad)
July 10, 2020 Filing 15 Stipulation for Extension of Time to Answer by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA Answer due from UNITED STATES OF AMERICA on 9/9/2020. (McHale, Matthew)
July 10, 2020 Filing 14 NOTICE of Appearance by Matthew McHale on behalf of UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. (McHale, Matthew)
June 24, 2020 Filing 13 SUMMONS/Return of Service Returned Executed by ALYSIA G. KURDILLA. UNITED STATES OF AMERICA served on 6/15/2020, answer due 8/14/2020. (Sturtevant, Glen)
June 9, 2020 Filing 12 Errata re #11 Summons Issued by ALYSIA G. KURDILLA. Reason for Correction: Populating second summons. (jv)
June 9, 2020 Filing 11 Summons Issued as to UNITED STATES OF AMERICA (jv)
June 9, 2020 CLERK'S OFFICE QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE re #2 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, #3 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. ERROR: Proposed Order was not attached. CORRECTION: Attorney is advised that all future motions require a proposed order as an attachment. This message is for informational purposes only. (jv)
June 8, 2020 Filing 10 CERTIFICATE of Merit as to the Defendant by Glen Howard Sturtevant, Jr on behalf of ALYSIA G. KURDILLA (Sturtevant, Glen)
June 8, 2020 Filing 9 PRAECIPE to Issue Summons by ALYSIA G. KURDILLA (Attachments: #1 Summons) (Scanlon, Matthew)
June 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER GRANTING #3 Motion for Glen H. Sturtevant, Jr. to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Chief Judge Mark R. Hornak on 6/8/20. Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Order of the Court or Notice on the matter. (jad)
June 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER GRANTING #2 Motion for Brewster S. Rawls to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Chief Judge Mark R. Hornak on 6/8/20. Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Order of the Court or Notice on the matter. (jad)
June 8, 2020 Filing 6 AT&T SCHEDULING NOTICE FOR ALL TELEPHONIC CONFERENCES. Every Telephonic Conference conducted will be via an AT&T call-in number which requires participants to dial-in and provide an access code. When a Telephonic Conference is scheduled you will be instructed to refer back to this Notice and use either Dial-In No. 1 or Dial-In No. 2, both of which are contained in this Notice. This document has a security setting of "Case Participants Only", so only those individuals will have access to view the document. (jad)
June 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 STANDING ORDER ON CIVIL MOTION PRACTICE. Signed by Chief Judge Mark R. Hornak on 6/8/20. (jad)
June 8, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE that instant civil action has been designated for placement into the United States District Court's Alternative Dispute Resolution program. Parties are directed to fully complete the required 26(f) report, which includes the stipulation of selecting an ADR process. Counsel for plaintiff (or in the case of a removal action, counsel for removing defendant) shall make service of the notice on all parties. (jad)
June 5, 2020 Filing 3 MOTION for attorney Glen H. Sturtevant, Jr. to Appear Pro Hac Vice, (Filing fee $70, Receipt # APAWDC-5664871) by ALYSIA G. KURDILLA. (Attachments: #1 Supplement Declaration of Glen H. Sturtevant, Jr. in Support of Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice) (Sturtevant, Glen)
June 5, 2020 Filing 2 MOTION for attorney Brewster S. Rawls to Appear Pro Hac Vice, (Filing fee $70, Receipt # APAWDC-5664845) by ALYSIA G. KURDILLA. (Attachments: #1 Supplement Declaration of Brewster S. Rawls in Support of Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice) (Rawls, Brewster)
June 4, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against UNITED STATES OF AMERICA (Filing fee, including Administrative fee, $400, receipt number APAWDC-5660642), filed by ALYSIA G. KURDILLA. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D) (jv)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: KURDILLA v. UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ALYSIA G. KURDILLA
Represented By: Matthew J. Scanlon
Represented By: Brewster S. Rawls
Represented By: Glen Howard Sturtevant, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Represented By: Matthew McHale
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?