1 S.A.N.T., INC. v. BERKSHIRE HATHAWAY et al
Plaintiff: 1 S.A.N.T., INC. and 1 S.A.N.T., INC. individually and on behalf of all others similarly situated also known as 1 SAINT, INC. doing business as TOWN & COUNTRY doing business as GATHERINGS BANQUET & EVENT CENTER
Defendant: BERKSHIRE HATHAWAY, INC. and NATIONAL FIRE & MARINE INSURANCE COMPANY
Case Number: 2:2020cv00862
Filed: June 11, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: William S Stickman
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 5, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 5, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER OF COURT. In light of the filing of #15 Amended Complaint, #6 and #8 Motions to Dismiss are DENIED AS MOOT. Responsive pleadings to the Amended Complaint are due by 08/18/20. Signed by Judge William S. Stickman on 08/05/20. Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Order of the Court or Notice on the matter. (eca)
August 4, 2020 Filing 15 First AMENDED COMPLAINT against BERKSHIRE HATHAWAY, INC., NATIONAL FIRE & MARINE INSURANCE COMPANY BERKSHIRE HATHAWAY, INC. answer due 8/18/2020; NATIONAL FIRE & MARINE INSURANCE COMPANY answer due 8/18/2020, filed by 1 S.A.N.T., INC.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B) (Lynch, Gary)
July 22, 2020 Filing 14 Disclosure Statement identifying National Fire & Marine Insurane Co. (a subsidiary of Berkshire Hathaway) as corporate parent or other affiliate, by BERKSHIRE HATHAWAY, INC., NATIONAL FIRE & MARINE INSURANCE COMPANY. (Greenberg, Julie)
July 20, 2020 Filing 13 NOTICE of Appearance by Julie S. Greenberg on behalf of BERKSHIRE HATHAWAY, INC.. (Greenberg, Julie)
July 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER SETTING BRIEFING SCHEDULE. Responses to #6 and #8 Motions to Dismiss due by 8/4/2020; Replies due by 8/11/2020. Page limitations outlined herein. Signed by Judge William S. Stickman on 07/14/20. (eca)
July 14, 2020 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by R. Bruce Carlson on behalf of 1 S.A.N.T., INC.. (Carlson, R.)
July 14, 2020 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Kelly K. Iverson on behalf of 1 S.A.N.T., INC.. (Iverson, Kelly)
July 13, 2020 Filing 9 BRIEF in Support re #8 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by NATIONAL FIRE & MARINE INSURANCE COMPANY. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D) (Byer, Robert)
July 13, 2020 Filing 8 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by NATIONAL FIRE & MARINE INSURANCE COMPANY. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of Meet and Confer, #2 Proposed Order) (Byer, Robert)
July 13, 2020 Filing 7 BRIEF in Support re #6 Motion to Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction,, Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim, filed by BERKSHIRE HATHAWAY, INC.. (Byer, Robert)
July 13, 2020 Filing 6 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction , MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by BERKSHIRE HATHAWAY, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit Certificate of Meet and Confer, #3 Proposed Order) (Byer, Robert)
July 2, 2020 Filing 5 Stipulation for Extension of Time to Answer by NATIONAL FIRE & MARINE INSURANCE COMPANY, BERKSHIRE HATHAWAY, INC. Answer due from NATIONAL FIRE & MARINE INSURANCE COMPANY on 7/13/2020; BERKSHIRE HATHAWAY, INC. on 7/13/2020. (Greenberg, Julie)
June 17, 2020 Filing 4 SUMMONS/Return of Service Returned Executed by 1 S.A.N.T., INC.. NATIONAL FIRE & MARINE INSURANCE COMPANY served on 6/15/2020, answer due 7/6/2020. (Lynch, Gary)
June 17, 2020 Filing 3 SUMMONS/Return of Service Returned Executed by 1 S.A.N.T., INC.. BERKSHIRE HATHAWAY, INC. served on 6/15/2020, answer due 7/6/2020. (Lynch, Gary)
June 12, 2020 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to BERKSHIRE HATHAWAY, INC., NATIONAL FIRE & MARINE INSURANCE COMPANY (Attachments: #1 Summons) (sdp)
June 11, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against BERKSHIRE HATHAWAY, INC., NATIONAL FIRE & MARINE INSURANCE COMPANY (Filing fee, including Administrative fee, $400, receipt number APAWDC-5680391), filed by 1 S.A.N.T., INC.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Civil Cover Sheet) (sdp)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: 1 S.A.N.T., INC. v. BERKSHIRE HATHAWAY et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BERKSHIRE HATHAWAY, INC.
Represented By: Julie S. Greenberg
Represented By: Robert L. Byer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NATIONAL FIRE & MARINE INSURANCE COMPANY
Represented By: Robert L. Byer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: 1 S.A.N.T., INC.
Represented By: Gary F. Lynch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: 1 S.A.N.T., INC. individually and on behalf of all others similarly situated also known as 1 SAINT, INC. doing business as TOWN & COUNTRY doing business as GATHERINGS BANQUET & EVENT CENTER
Represented By: Gary F. Lynch
Represented By: Kelly K. Iverson
Represented By: R. Bruce Carlson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?