AXA EQUITABLE LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY v. TUSCANO et al
Plaintiff: AXA EQUITABLE LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY
Defendant: CHARMAINE CLAWSON, TERESA TUSCANO, CHRISTIE HENSLER and MATTHEW HENSLER
Case Number: 2:2020cv00993
Filed: July 2, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: Mark R Hornak
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 11, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 11, 2020 Filing 10 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by AXA EQUITABLE LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY. CHARMAINE CLAWSON waiver sent on 7/7/2020, answer due 9/8/2020. (Malyk, Jaclyn)
August 11, 2020 Filing 9 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by AXA EQUITABLE LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY. TERESA TUSCANO waiver sent on 7/7/2020, answer due 9/8/2020. (Malyk, Jaclyn)
July 30, 2020 Filing 8 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by AXA EQUITABLE LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY. MATTHEW HENSLER waiver sent on 7/7/2020, answer due 9/8/2020. (Malyk, Jaclyn)
July 30, 2020 Filing 7 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by AXA EQUITABLE LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY. CHRISTIE HENSLER waiver sent on 7/7/2020, answer due 9/8/2020. (Malyk, Jaclyn)
July 7, 2020 Filing 6 AT&T SCHEDULING NOTICE FOR ALL TELEPHONIC CONFERENCES. Every Telephonic Conference conducted will be via an AT&T call-in number which requires participants to dial-in and provide an access code. When a Telephonic Conference is scheduled you will be instructed to refer back to this Notice and use either Dial-In No. 1 or Dial-In No. 2, both of which are contained in this Notice. This document has a security setting of "Case Participants Only", so only those individuals will have access to view the document. (jad)
July 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 STANDING ORDER ON CIVIL MOTION PRACTICE. Signed by Chief Judge Mark R. Hornak on 7/7/20. (jad)
July 7, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE that instant civil action has been designated for placement into the United States District Court's Alternative Dispute Resolution program. Parties are directed to fully complete the required 26(f) report, which includes the stipulation of selecting an ADR process. Counsel for plaintiff (or in the case of a removal action, counsel for removing defendant) shall make service of the notice on all parties. (jad)
July 6, 2020 Filing 3 Disclosure Statement by AXA EQUITABLE LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY. (Malyk, Jaclyn)
July 2, 2020 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to CHARMAINE CLAWSON, CHRISTIE HENSLER, MATTHEW HENSLER, TERESA TUSCANO (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons, #3 Summons) (ma)
July 2, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against CHARMAINE CLAWSON, CHRISTIE HENSLER, MATTHEW HENSLER, TERESA TUSCANO (Filing fee, including Administrative fee, $400, receipt number APAWDC-5732222), filed by AXA EQUITABLE LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I, #10 Civil Cover Sheet, #11 Summons, #12 Summons, #13 Summons, #14 Summons) (ma)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: AXA EQUITABLE LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY v. TUSCANO et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: AXA EQUITABLE LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY
Represented By: Jaclyn D. Malyk
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CHARMAINE CLAWSON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TERESA TUSCANO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CHRISTIE HENSLER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MATTHEW HENSLER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?