UMAMI PITTSBURGH, LLC v. MOTORISTS COMMERCIAL MUTUAL INSURANCE COMPANY
Plaintiff: UMAMI PITTSBURGH, LLC and UMAMI PITTSBURGH, LLC d/b/a UMAMI
Defendant: MOTORISTS COMMERCIAL MUTUAL INSURANCE COMPANY
Case Number: 2:2020cv00999
Filed: July 3, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: David S Cercone
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 31, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 31, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER re #18 Motion for Reconsideration filed by MOTORISTS COMMERCIAL MUTUAL INSURANCE COMPANY, Plaintiff shall file a Response to Motion on or before 9/8/2020. Signed by Judge David S. Cercone on 8/31/2020. Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Order of the Court or Notice on the matter. (jmc)
August 28, 2020 Filing 19 BRIEF in Support re #18 Motion for Reconsideration and Amendment filed by MOTORISTS COMMERCIAL MUTUAL INSURANCE COMPANY. (Meyers, Matthew)
August 28, 2020 Filing 18 MOTION for Reconsideration re #17 Order on Motion to Remand, and Amendment by MOTORISTS COMMERCIAL MUTUAL INSURANCE COMPANY. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Proposed Order) (Meyers, Matthew)
August 26, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 17 MEMORANDUM ORDER granting #6 Motion to Remand. This matter shall be REMANDED to the Court of Common Pleas of Allegheny County, forthwith. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Clerk of Courts mark this case CLOSED and serve a certified copy of this Order on the Prothonotary for the Court of Common Pleas of Allegheny County, forthwith. Signed by Judge David S. Cercone on 8/26/2020. (jmc)
August 19, 2020 Filing 16 BRIEF in Opposition re #6 Motion to Remand filed by MOTORISTS COMMERCIAL MUTUAL INSURANCE COMPANY. (Meyers, Matthew)
August 19, 2020 Filing 15 RESPONSE IN OPPOSITION to #6 Motion to Remand, filed by MOTORISTS COMMERCIAL MUTUAL INSURANCE COMPANY. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Meyers, Matthew)
August 19, 2020 CLERK'S OFFICE QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE re 13 Notice. ERROR: Document filed in wrong case. CORRECTION: Document removed from Public View, this is not a case in the Western District. The incorrect submission will remain on the docket unless otherwise ordered by the Court. This message is for informational purposes only. (jd)
August 19, 2020 Filing 14 NOTICE OF SUPPLEMENTAL AUTHORITY by UMAMI PITTSBURGH, LLC (Goodrich, John)
August 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER Response/Briefing Schedule re #10 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim and #11 Brief in Support of Motion. Response to Motion due by 9/9/2020. Reply brief may be filed by 9/16/2020. Signed by Judge David S. Cercone on 8/13/2020. (kly)
August 12, 2020 Filing 11 BRIEF in Support re #10 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by MOTORISTS COMMERCIAL MUTUAL INSURANCE COMPANY. (Meyers, Matthew)
August 12, 2020 Filing 10 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by MOTORISTS COMMERCIAL MUTUAL INSURANCE COMPANY. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Proposed Order) (Meyers, Matthew)
July 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER Response/Briefing Schedule re #6 Motion to Remand and #7 Brief in Support of Motion.Defendant's Response to Motion due by 8/26/2020. Signed by Judge David S. Cercone on 7/30/2020. (kly)
July 29, 2020 Filing 8 First AMENDED COMPLAINT against MOTORISTS COMMERCIAL MUTUAL INSURANCE COMPANY MOTORISTS COMMERCIAL MUTUAL INSURANCE COMPANY answer due 8/12/2020, filed by UMAMI PITTSBURGH, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A) (Cooper, Scott)
July 29, 2020 Filing 7 BRIEF in Support re #6 Motion to Remand filed by UMAMI PITTSBURGH, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Proposed Order, #4 Certificate of Service, #5 Certificate of Concurrence/Compliance) (Cooper, Scott)
July 29, 2020 Filing 6 First MOTION to Remand by UMAMI PITTSBURGH, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Proposed Order, #5 Certificate of Service, #6 Certificate of Concurrence/Complaince) (Cooper, Scott)
July 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER Response/Briefing Schedule re #3 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim and #4 Brief in Support of Motion. Response to Motion due by 8/7/2020. Reply may be filed by 8/14/2020. Signed by Judge David S. Cercone on 7/13/2020. (kly)
July 10, 2020 Filing 4 BRIEF in Support re #3 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by MOTORISTS COMMERCIAL MUTUAL INSURANCE COMPANY. (Meyers, Matthew)
July 10, 2020 Filing 3 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by MOTORISTS COMMERCIAL MUTUAL INSURANCE COMPANY. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Proposed Order) (Meyers, Matthew)
July 9, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE that instant civil action has been designated for placement into the United States District Court's Alternative Dispute Resolution program. Parties are directed to fully complete the required 26(f) report, which includes the stipulation of selecting an ADR process. Counsel for plaintiff (or in the case of a removal action, counsel for removing defendant) shall make service of the notice on all parties. (kak)
July 3, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from ALLEGHENY COUNTY COURT OF COMMON PLEAS, case number GD-20-6549 Copies attached: LOWER COURT COMPLAINT, DOCKET SHEET, EXHIBITS (Filing fee, including Administrative fee, $400, receipt number APAWDC-5734549), filed by MOTORISTS COMMERCIAL MUTUAL INSURANCE COMPANY. (Attachments: #1 EXHIBIT 1, #2 EXHIBIT 2, #3 EXHIBIT 3, #4 EXHIBIT 4, #5 EXHIBIT 5, #6 EXHIBIT 6, #7 EXHIBIT 7, #8 EXHIBIT 8, #9 EXHIBIT 9, #10 Civil Cover Sheet) (jd)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: UMAMI PITTSBURGH, LLC v. MOTORISTS COMMERCIAL MUTUAL INSURANCE COMPANY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: UMAMI PITTSBURGH, LLC
Represented By: John P. Goodrich
Represented By: Jonathan Shub
Represented By: Scott B. Cooper
Represented By: James C. Haggerty
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: UMAMI PITTSBURGH, LLC d/b/a UMAMI
Represented By: John P. Goodrich
Represented By: Jonathan Shub
Represented By: Scott B. Cooper
Represented By: James C. Haggerty
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MOTORISTS COMMERCIAL MUTUAL INSURANCE COMPANY
Represented By: Matthew A. Meyers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?