GONZALEZ v. TURCHENEK
Plaintiff: HECTOR GONZALEZ
Defendant: OFFICER TURCHENEK
Case Number: 2:2020cv01059
Filed: July 15, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: Cynthia Reed Eddy
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983pr
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 6, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 6, 2020 Filing 7 Authorization permitting withdrawal of prison account funds to pay filing fee by HECTOR GONZALEZ. (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (jd)
July 31, 2020 Filing 6 TEXT ORDER granting #5 MOTION to Withdraw Lawsuit by HECTOR GONZALEZ. Pursuant to FRCP 41 this case is dismissed. Signed by Chief Magistrate Judge Cynthia Reed Eddy on 7/31/2020. Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Order of the Court or Notice on the matter. (bsc)
July 30, 2020 Filing 5 MOTION to Withdraw Lawsuit by HECTOR GONZALEZ. (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (jd)
July 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER denying without prejudice #1 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. The motion was received without an inmate account statement and a declaration from the institution's records office. Signed by Chief Magistrate Judge Cynthia Reed Eddy on 7/27/2020. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit - Authorization, #2 Exhibit - Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis) (bsc)
July 16, 2020 Filing 3 STANDING PRACTICE ORDER FOR PRO SE CIVIL RIGHTS CASES. Signed by Chief Magistrate Judge Cynthia Reed Eddy on 7/16/2020. (bsc)
July 15, 2020 Filing 2 CONSENT to Trial/Jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge OR District Judge Option, by HECTOR GONZALEZ. (jd)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: GONZALEZ v. TURCHENEK
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: OFFICER TURCHENEK
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: HECTOR GONZALEZ
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?