RIVERA v. OBERLANDER et al
Petitioner: RAYMOND J. RIVERA
Respondent: ATTORNEY GENERAL OF THE STATE OF PENNSYLVANIA, DEREK F. OBERLANDER and DISTRICT ATTORNEY OF WESTMORELAND COUNTY
Case Number: 2:2020cv01070
Filed: July 16, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: Patricia L Dodge
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2254
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 1, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 1, 2020 Filing 18 CONSENT to Trial/Jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge OR District Judge Option, by RAYMOND J. RIVERA. (Attachments: #1 correspondence, #2 Envelope) (plp)
September 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER granting #16 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer to Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus by DISTRICT ATTORNEY OF WESTMORELAND COUNTY, DEREK F. OBERLANDER. DISTRICT ATTORNEY OF WESTMORELAND COUNTY answer due 11/13/2020 and DEREK F. OBERLANDER answer due 11/13/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Patricia L. Dodge on 9/1/2020. Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Order of the Court or Notice on the matter. (mqe)
August 31, 2020 Filing 16 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer to Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus by DISTRICT ATTORNEY OF WESTMORELAND COUNTY, DEREK F. OBERLANDER. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Rubin, Amanda)
August 31, 2020 Filing 15 CONSENT to Trial/Jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge OR District Judge Option, by DISTRICT ATTORNEY OF WESTMORELAND COUNTY, DEREK F. OBERLANDER. (Rubin, Amanda)
August 31, 2020 Filing 14 NOTICE of Appearance by Amanda Marie Rubin on behalf of DISTRICT ATTORNEY OF WESTMORELAND COUNTY, DEREK F. OBERLANDER. (Rubin, Amanda)
August 10, 2020 Filing 12 Correspondence to the Court from RAYMOND RIVERA concerning filing fee. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Envelope) (plp)
August 7, 2020 Filing 13 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus (Filing fee $5, receipt number 24668063988) filed by RAYMOND J. RIVERA. (Attachments: #1 Correspondence, #2 A1, #3 A2, #4 A3, #5 A4, #6 A5, #7 A6, #8 B, #9 B1, #10 B2, #11 B3, #12 B4, #13 C, #14 C1, #15 C2, #16 C3, #17 D, #18 D1, #19 E, #20 E1, #21 E2, #22 E3, #23 E4, #24 E5, #25 E6, #26 E7, #27 E8, #28 F, #29 F1, #30 F2, #31 G, #32 G1, #33 G2, #34 G3, #35 G4, #36 H, #37 H1, #38 I, #39 I2, #40 I3, #41 I4, #42 Envelope) (cel)
August 7, 2020 Filing 11 Filing fee: $5.00, receipt number 24668063988 (plp)
August 5, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER: In accordance with the case management system in place in this district, this case has been assigned to the undersigned for all pretrial matters. Therefore, it is ORDERED that on or before 9/8/2020, the Petitioner shall complete an election form either consenting to jurisdiction by the Magistrate Judge or electing to have a District Judge assigned to the case, and shall file the form with the Clerk's Office. A copy of the form can be found on this Court's website at: http://www.pawd.uscourts.gov/sites/pawd/files/Consent-to-Mag.pdf. Signed by Magistrate Judge Patricia L. Dodge on 8/5/2020. (mqe)
August 5, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER DIRECTING that the United States Marshal shall make service of this order, together with a copy of the petition, upon the respondents by certified mail, costs to be advanced by the United States. Signed by Magistrate Judge Patricia L. Dodge on 8/5/2020. (mqe)
August 5, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER denying as moot Petitioner's #4 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis because he paid the $5.00 filing fee. Signed by Magistrate Judge Patricia L. Dodge on 8/5/20. Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Order of the Court or Notice on the matter. (jpe)
August 4, 2020 Filing 6 Certification of Records Officer at SCI Forest. (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (plp)
August 4, 2020 Filing 5 Authorization permitting withdrawal of prison account funds to pay filing fee by RAYMOND J. RIVERA. (plp)
August 4, 2020 Filing 4 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by RAYMOND J. RIVERA. (Attachments: #1 inmate account statement, #2 Exhibit, #3 Envelope) (plp)
July 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER administratively closing the case and advising the petitioner that he may reopen it if, by 8/24/20, he pays the filing fee or files a motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis. Signed by Magistrate Judge Patricia L. Dodge on 7/23/20. (jpe)
July 16, 2020 Filing 1 Petition for Writ Of Habeas Corpus lodged pending disposition of the filing fee. (Attachments: #1 correspondence, #2 Exhibit A-1, #3 Exhibit A-2, #4 Exhibit A-3, #5 Exhibit A-4, #6 Exhibit A-5, #7 Exhibit A-6, #8 Exhibit B, #9 Exhibit B-1, #10 Exhibit B-2, #11 Exhibit B-3, #12 Exhibit B-4, #13 Exhibit C, #14 Exhibit C-1, #15 Exhibit C-2, #16 Exhibit C-3, #17 Exhibit D, #18 Exhibit D-1, #19 Exhibit D-2, #20 Exhibit E, #21 Exhibit E-1, #22 Exhibit E-2, #23 Exhibit E-3, #24 Exhibit E-4, #25 Exhibit E-5, #26 Exhibit E-6, #27 Exhibit E-7, #28 Exhibit E-8, #29 Exhibit F, #30 Exhibit F-1, #31 Exhibit F-2, #32 Exhibit G, #33 Exhibit G-1, #34 Exhibit G-2, #35 Exhibit G-3, #36 Exhibit G-4, #37 Exhibit H, #38 Exhibit H-1, #39 Exhibit I-1, #40 Exhibit I-2, #41 Exhibit I-3, #42 Exhibit I-4, #43 Envelope) (plp)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: RIVERA v. OBERLANDER et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: ATTORNEY GENERAL OF THE STATE OF PENNSYLVANIA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: DEREK F. OBERLANDER
Represented By: Amanda Marie Rubin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: DISTRICT ATTORNEY OF WESTMORELAND COUNTY
Represented By: Amanda Marie Rubin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: RAYMOND J. RIVERA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?