RUSSELL v. THD AT-HOME SERVICES, INC.
Plaintiff: KELLY RUSSELL
Defendant: THD AT-HOME SERVICES, INC. trading and doing business as HOME DEPOT, INC. trading and doing business as THE HOME DEPOT INC. trading and doing business as HOME DEPOT EXTERIORS trading and doing business as HOME DEPOT trading and doing business as THE
Case Number: 2:2020cv01071
Filed: July 16, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: J Nicholas Ranjan
Nature of Suit: Labor: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 4, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 4, 2020 Filing 8 AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by KELLY RUSSELL. (Cagle, Ashley) Modified on 9/8/2020 (jjg).
August 12, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by John E. Macdonald on behalf of THD AT-HOME SERVICES, INC.. (Macdonald, John)
August 10, 2020 Filing 6 Proposed Rule 26(f) report (av)
August 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER: Telephonic Initial Case Management Conference set for 10/20/2020 at 10:00 AM before Judge J. Nicholas Ranjan. Exchange of required Rule 26(a)(1) information due by 10/9/2020; Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 10/9/2020; Stipulation Selecting ADR process due by 10/9/2020. Signed by Judge J. Nicholas Ranjan on 8/10/2020. (av)
August 7, 2020 Update Answer Deadline: Answer due from THD AT-HOME SERVICES, INC. (jjg)
August 7, 2020 Filing 3 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by KELLY RUSSELL. Answer due from THD AT-HOME SERVICES, INC. on 10/6/20. (Cagle, Ashley) Modified on 8/7/2020 (jjg).
July 17, 2020 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to THD AT-HOME SERVICES, INC. (sdp)
July 16, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against THD AT-HOME SERVICES, INC. (Filing fee, including Administrative fee, $400, receipt number APAWDC-576885), filed by KELLY RUSSELL. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (sdp)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: RUSSELL v. THD AT-HOME SERVICES, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: THD AT-HOME SERVICES, INC. trading and doing business as HOME DEPOT, INC. trading and doing business as THE HOME DEPOT INC. trading and doing business as HOME DEPOT EXTERIORS trading and doing business as HOME DEPOT trading and doing business as THE
Represented By: John E. Macdonald
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: KELLY RUSSELL
Represented By: Ashley M. Cagle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?