EASLEY & RIVERS, INC. v. MODERNFOLD, INC.
Plaintiff: EASLEY & RIVERS, INC.
Defendant: MODERNFOLD, INC.
Case Number: 2:2020cv01075
Filed: July 17, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: Arthur J Schwab
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 31, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 31, 2020 Filing 11 REPORT of Mediation: Case has been resolved. GARY P. HUNT terminated. Attorney Gary P. Hunt terminated. The parties are reminded of their obligation to complete the ADR questionnaire and submit within 5 days of the conclusion of the ADR process. The questionnaire can be accessed at www.pawd.uscourts.gov. Click on the ADR icon. Mediation session was held on 8/26/2020. (Hunt, Gary)
August 31, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 TEXT ORDER it appearing to the Court that the parties have agreed to an amicable resolution of this matter, IT IS ORDERED that the Clerk shall remove this case from the docket for administrative purposes. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED, that, in the event either party fails to execute the settlement agreement, the case shall be reinstated to the docket upon written request of either party for purposes of enforcement of the settlement agreement. IT IS FINALLY ORDERED that the Court shall retain jurisdiction to enforce the terms of the settlement agreement of the parties. Clerk is to mark CASE CLOSED. Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Order of Court or notice on the matter. Signed by Judge Arthur J. Schwab on 8/31/20. (ms)
August 19, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Mediation. Gary P. Hunt is appointed as mediator. Mediation is scheduled for 8/26/20. Signed by Judge Arthur J. Schwab on 8/19/20. (ms)
August 18, 2020 Filing 8 STIPULATION selecting ADR process by EASLEY & RIVERS, INC.. (Fernsler, Kurt)
August 18, 2020 Filing 7 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Fernsler, Kurt)
July 29, 2020 CLERK'S OFFICE QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE re #4 Disclosure Statement, #6 Disclosure Statement. ERROR: Documents are duplicates. CORRECTION: Duplicate document No. 4 terminated. These submissions will remain on the docket unless otherwise ordered by the Court. This message is for informational purposes only. (ept)
July 24, 2020 Filing 6 Disclosure Statement identifying dormakaba International Holding AG as corporate parent or other affiliate, by MODERNFOLD, INC.. (Koch, Nicholas)
July 24, 2020 Filing 5 ANSWER to Complaint by MODERNFOLD, INC.. (Koch, Nicholas)
July 24, 2020 Filing 4 Disclosure Statement identifying None as corporate parent or other affiliate, by MODERNFOLD, INC.. (Koch, Nicholas) Document is a duplicate of 6 and has been removed from public view. Modified on 7/29/2020 (ept).
July 17, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE that instant civil action has been designated for placement into the United States District Court's Alternative Dispute Resolution program. Parties are directed to fully complete the required 26(f) report, which includes the stipulation of selecting an ADR process. Counsel for plaintiff (or in the case of a removal action, counsel for removing defendant) shall make service of the notice on all parties. (lck)
July 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER Re: Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 12(b) Motions to Dismiss. Signed by Judge Arthur J. Schwab on 7/17/20. (lck)
July 17, 2020 CLERK'S OFFICE QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE re #1 Notice of Removal. ERROR: Party did not file disclosure statement as required pursuant to L.R. 7.1.1. CORRECTION: Attorney advised to file statement within 7 days. Disclosure Statement due by 7/24/2020. (ept)
July 17, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Common Pleas of Allegheny County, case number Gd 20-6377 Copies attached: Complaint, Affidavit of Service, Motion, Notice of Appearance, Order (Filing fee, including Administrative fee, $400, receipt number APAWDC-5771232), filed by MODERNFOLD, INC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Civil Cover Sheet) (ept)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: EASLEY & RIVERS, INC. v. MODERNFOLD, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: EASLEY & RIVERS, INC.
Represented By: Courtney C Brennan
Represented By: Kurt F. Fernsler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MODERNFOLD, INC.
Represented By: Nicholas J. Koch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?