BEST MEDICAL INTERNATIONAL, INC. v. BUCHANAN INGERSOLL & ROONEY PC
Plaintiff: BEST MEDICAL INTERNATIONAL, INC. doing business as BEST NOMOS
Defendant: BUCHANAN INGERSOLL & ROONEY PC
Case Number: 2:2020cv01077
Filed: July 16, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: Patricia L Dodge
Referring Judge: W Scott Hardy
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 14, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 11, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER OF RECUSAL. It is hereby ORDERED that pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 455 Judge Marilyn J. Horan recuses from this case and the Clerk is directed to reassign this case to another member of the Court. Judge Marilyn J. Horan recused. Signed by Judge Marilyn J. Horan on 9/11/2020. (jgb)
September 11, 2020 W. Scott Hardy presiding. (jmm)
August 31, 2020 Filing 21 First AMENDED COMPLAINT against BUCHANAN INGERSOLL & ROONEY PC BUCHANAN INGERSOLL & ROONEY PC answer due 9/14/2020, filed by BEST MEDICAL INTERNATIONAL, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit) (Sommer, Brad)
August 31, 2020 Filing 20 AMENDED DOCUMENT UNREDACTED COMPLAINT PER COURT ORDER (ECF No. 2) by BEST MEDICAL INTERNATIONAL, INC. Amendment to #1 Complaint. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit) (Sommer, Brad) Modified on 9/1/2020 (ma).
August 28, 2020 CLERK'S OFFICE QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE re 18 Notice. ERROR: Wrong event selected. CORRECTION: Re-docketed as CONSENT to Trial/Jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge OR District Judge Option at #19 . This message is for informational purposes only. (ma)
August 27, 2020 Judge Marilyn J. Horan presiding. Magistrate Judge Patricia L. Dodge referred. (nll)
August 27, 2020 Magistrate Judge Patricia L. Dodge no longer presiding in case. (nll)
August 26, 2020 Filing 19 CONSENT to Trial/Jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge OR District Judge Option, by BEST MEDICAL INTERNATIONAL, INC.. (ma)
August 26, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER denying as moot #3 Motion to Amend Order (ECF No. 2) Requesting Defendant Be Directed To Keep Unredacted Complaint Confidential Until Final Ruling On Motion To Seal by BEST MEDICAL INTERNATIONAL, INC. Signed by Magistrate Judge Patricia L. Dodge on 8/26/2020. Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Order of the Court or Notice on the matter. (mqe)
August 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 16 MEMORANDUM ORDER denying #5 Motion for Leave to File the Complaint, the Agreement (Exhibit "A") and Documents Under Seal Pursuant to LCvR 5.2(H) by BEST MEDICAL INTERNATIONAL, INC. Signed by Magistrate Judge Patricia L. Dodge on 8/24/2020. (mqe)
August 11, 2020 Filing 15 REPLY BRIEF to #12 Defendant's Opposition to #5 Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to File Complaint, Agreement (Exhibit A) and Documents Under Seal Pursuant to LCVR 5.2(H) filed by BEST MEDICAL INTERNATIONAL, INC.. (Sommer, Brad) Modified on 8/17/2020 (ma).
August 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 14 Order granting Plaintiff's 13 oral motion to file a Reply in support of its Motion for Leave to File the Complaint, Agreement and Documents Under Seal. Plaintiff may file a Reply by August 11, 2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Patricia L. Dodge on 8/4/2020. Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Order of the Court or Notice on the matter. (mqe)
August 4, 2020 Filing 13 ORAL MOTION to file a Reply in support of its Motion for Leave to File the Complaint, Agreement and Documents Under Seal by BEST MEDICAL INTERNATIONAL, INC. (mqe)
August 4, 2020 Minute entry: A telephone conference with the parties was held on August 4, 2020. Plaintiff requested and will be given the opportunity to file a reply brief in support of his motion to seal. An order will be issued to that effect. Resolution of the motion to seal and preserving the status quo were discussed. Plaintiff's counsel will contact the Court if plaintiff wishes to explore the concepts discussed during the conference and if necessary, the Court will schedule another status conference. Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes a Minute of the Court or Notice on the matter. (mqe)
July 29, 2020 Filing 12 BRIEF in Opposition re #5 Motion for Leave to File filed by BUCHANAN INGERSOLL & ROONEY PC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Moorhead, William)
July 29, 2020 Filing 11 RESPONSE to Motion re #3 MOTION to Amend Order Requesting Defendant Be Directed To Keep Unredacted Complaint Confidential Until Final Ruling On Motion To Seal filed by BUCHANAN INGERSOLL & ROONEY PC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Moorhead, William)
July 24, 2020 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Sydney Rochelle Normil on behalf of BUCHANAN INGERSOLL & ROONEY PC. (Normil, Sydney)
July 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER Telephonic Status Conference set for 8/4/2020 at 10:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Patricia L. Dodge. Signed by Magistrate Judge Patricia L. Dodge on 7/24/2020. Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Order of the Court or Notice on the matter. (mqe)
July 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER Response Schedule re #3 Motion to Amend Order (ECF No. 2) Requesting Defendant Be Directed To Keep Unredacted Complaint Confidential Until Final Ruling On Motion To Seal by BEST MEDICAL INTERNATIONAL, INC. Response to Motion due by 7/31/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Patricia L. Dodge on 7/24/2020. Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Order of the Court or Notice on the matter. (mqe) Modified on 7/28/2020 (ma).
July 23, 2020 Filing 6 BRIEF in Support re #5 Motion for Leave to File the Complaint, the Agreement (Exhibit "A") and Documents Under Seal Pursuant to LCvR 5.2(H) filed by BEST MEDICAL INTERNATIONAL, INC.. (Sommer, Brad)
July 23, 2020 Filing 5 MOTION for Leave to File the Complaint, the Agreement (Exhibit "A") and Documents Under Seal Pursuant to LCvR 5.2(H) by BEST MEDICAL INTERNATIONAL, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Proposed Order) (Sommer, Brad)
July 23, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by William J. Moorhead, Jr on behalf of BUCHANAN INGERSOLL & ROONEY PC. (Moorhead, William)
July 23, 2020 Filing 3 MOTION to Amend Order (ECF No. 2) Requesting Defendant Be Directed To Keep Unredacted Complaint Confidential Until Final Ruling On Motion To Seal by BEST MEDICAL INTERNATIONAL, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Sommer, Brad) Modified on 7/28/2020 (ma).
July 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER that no later than July 23, 2020, Plaintiff shall either file an unredacted version of the Complaint or file a motion to seal pursuant to Local Rule 5.2. In either event, Plaintiff shall also provide Defendant with a copy of the unredacted Complaint as well as any motion to seal. Signed by Magistrate Judge Patricia L. Dodge on 7/21/2020. Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Order of the Court or Notice on the matter. (mqe)
July 16, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against BUCHANAN INGERSOLL & ROONEY PC (Filing fee, including Administrative fee, $400, receipt number APAWDC-5768633), filed by BEST MEDICAL INTERNATIONAL, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Civil Cover Sheet) (ma)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: BEST MEDICAL INTERNATIONAL, INC. v. BUCHANAN INGERSOLL & ROONEY PC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BEST MEDICAL INTERNATIONAL, INC. doing business as BEST NOMOS
Represented By: Brad N. Sommer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BUCHANAN INGERSOLL & ROONEY PC
Represented By: Sydney Rochelle Normil
Represented By: William J. Moorhead, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?