MESICH, et al. v. GEICO INDEMNITY COMPANY
Plaintiff: STEPHEN MESICH and BRUNILDA RIVERA
Defendant: GEICO INDEMNITY COMPANY
Case Number: 2:2020cv01113
Filed: July 24, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: Robert J Colville
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 18, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 18, 2020 Filing 18 ANSWER to #17 Amended Complaint by GEICO INDEMNITY COMPANY. (Hudock, Joseph)
September 1, 2020 Filing 17 First AMENDED COMPLAINT against GEICO INDEMNITY COMPANY GEICO INDEMNITY COMPANY answer due 9/15/2020, filed by STEPHEN MESICH; BRUNILDA RIVERA. (Solomon, Gary)
August 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER granting #15 Stipulation to Add Plaintiff's Wife BRUNILDA RIVERA as a Plaintiff. Signed by Judge Robert J. Colville on 8/28/20. (jg)
August 27, 2020 Filing 15 STIPULATION to Add Plaintiff's Wife as a Party by STEPHEN MESICH. (Solomon, Gary)
August 26, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Mediation. The Honorable Gary Caruso is appointed as mediator; The ADR conference(s) shall be concluded before 11/17/20 unless extended by order of the Court. Signed by Judge Robert J. Colville on 1/26/20. (jg)
August 26, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 13 CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER: Motions to Amend/Add Parties due by 9/11/20; Fact Discovery ends 1/15/21; Counsel must fax to 412-208-7309, or e-mail to Karen_Verminski@pawd.uscourts.gov updated confidential position letters on or before 1/20/21; A Post-Discovery Status Conference is set for 1/25/21 at 10:00 AM in Suite 622 before Judge Robert J. Colville; Plaintiffs Expert Reports due by 4/1/21; Defendant's Expert Reports due by 6/1/21; Depositions of Plaintiff's experts shall be on or before 6/17/21; Depositions of Defendant's experts shall be on or before 6/30/21. Signed by Judge Robert J. Colville on 8/26/20. (jg)
August 26, 2020 Filing 12 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Robert J. Colville: Telephonic Initial Case Management Conference held on 8/26/20; Appropriate Orders follow. (Court Reporter: None) (jg)
August 21, 2020 Filing 11 STIPULATION selecting ADR process by STEPHEN MESICH. (Solomon, Gary)
August 11, 2020 Filing 10 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Solomon, Gary)
August 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER granting #8 Motion to Continue Initial Case Management Conference; that the Telephonic Initial Case Management Conference set for 8/27/20 at 10:30 AM is re-set for 8/26/20 at 9:00 AM before Judge Robert J. Colville. Signed by Judge Robert J. Colville on 8/6/20. Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Order of the Court or Notice on the matter. (jg)
August 6, 2020 Filing 8 MOTION to Continue Initial Case Management Conference by GEICO INDEMNITY COMPANY. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Hudock, Joseph)
July 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 MEMORANDUM ORDER indicating that the parties' Rule 26 Meeting Report and Stipulation Selecting ADR Process are due by 8/20/20; A Telephonic Initial Case Management Conference is set for 8/27/20 at 10:30 AM before Judge Robert J. Colville. Signed by Judge Robert J. Colville on 7/30/20. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B) (jg)
July 30, 2020 Filing 6 ANSWER to Complaint by GEICO INDEMNITY COMPANY. (Hudock, Joseph)
July 24, 2020 Filing 5 AT&T SCHEDULING NOTICE FOR ALL TELEPHONIC CONFERENCES. Every Telephonic Conference conducted will be via an AT&T call-in number which requires participants to dial-in and provide an access code. When a Telephonic Conference is scheduled you will be instructed to refer back to this. This document has a security setting of "Case Participants Only," so only those individuals will have access to view the document. (jg)
July 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER RE: Rule 12(b) Motions (details more fully stated in said Order). Signed by Judge Robert J. Colville on 7/24/20. (jg)
July 24, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE that instant civil action has been designated for placement into the United States District Court's Alternative Dispute Resolution program. Parties are directed to fully complete the required 26(f) report, which includes the stipulation of selecting an ADR process. Counsel for plaintiff (or in the case of a removal action, counsel for removing defendant) shall make service of the notice on all parties. (jg)
July 24, 2020 Filing 2 Disclosure Statement identifying Berkshire Hathaway, Inc. as corporate parent or other affiliate, by GEICO INDEMNITY COMPANY. (jv)
July 24, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Court of Common Pleas of Alleghey County, case number GD 20-007542 (Filing fee, including Administrative fee, $400, receipt number APAWDC-5787087), filed by GEICO INDEMNITY COMPANY. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit) (jv)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: MESICH, et al. v. GEICO INDEMNITY COMPANY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GEICO INDEMNITY COMPANY
Represented By: Joseph A. Hudock, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: STEPHEN MESICH
Represented By: Gary Solomon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BRUNILDA RIVERA
Represented By: Gary Solomon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?