GLOVA et al v. THE TRAVELERS HOME AND MARINE INSURANCE COMPANY
Plaintiff: M. NICHOLAS GLOVA and JUDITH GLOVA
Defendant: THE TRAVELERS HOME AND MARINE INSURANCE COMPANY
Case Number: 2:2020cv01151
Filed: July 31, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: Cathy Bissoon
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 12, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 12, 2020 Filing 8 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal Pursuant to F.R.C.P. 41(a)(1)(A)(i) by JUDITH GLOVA, M. NICHOLAS GLOVA (Rudert, Erin)
August 7, 2020 CLERK'S OFFICE QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE re #5 Stipulation. ERROR: Wrong event selected. CORRECTION: Re-docketed as Stipulation for Extension of Time to Answer. This message is for informational purposes only. (jjg)
August 7, 2020 Filing 7 Stipulation for Extension of Time to Answer by JUDITH GLOVA, M. NICHOLAS GLOVA, THE TRAVELERS HOME AND MARINE INSURANCE COMPANY. Answer due from THE TRAVELERS HOME AND MARINE INSURANCE COMPANY on 9/4/2020. (jjg)
August 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER approving #4 Stipulation to Dismiss Count IV of Plaintiffs' Complaint. Count IV (only) of Plaintiffs' Complaint is DISMISSED. Signed by Judge Cathy Bissoon on 8/7/20. Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Order of the Court or Notice on the matter. (wss)
August 7, 2020 Filing 5 STIPULATION Pursuant to Local Rule 7(E) by THE TRAVELERS HOME AND MARINE INSURANCE COMPANY. (Miller, Alan)
August 7, 2020 Filing 4 STIPULATION to Dismiss Count IV of Plaintiffs' Complaint by THE TRAVELERS HOME AND MARINE INSURANCE COMPANY. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Miller, Alan)
August 3, 2020 Filing 3 Disclosure Statement identifying The Travelers Companies, Inc. is the only publicly held company in the Travelers corporate family. No individual or corporation owns 10% or more of the stock of The Travelers Companies, Inc. as corporate parent or other affiliate, by THE TRAVELERS HOME AND MARINE INSURANCE COMPANY. (Miller, Alan)
August 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER re Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 12(b) Motions to Dismiss, more fully stated in said order. Signed by Judge Cathy Bissoon on 8/3/20. (jhi)
August 3, 2020 CLERK'S OFFICE QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE re #1 Notice of Removal. ERROR: Party did not file disclosure statement as required pursuant L.R. 7.1.1. CORRECTION: Attorney advised to file statement within 7 days. This message is for informational purposes only. Disclosure Statement due by 8/10/2020. (jjg)
July 31, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Allegheny County Court of Common Pleas, case number G.D. 20-007165 with Jury Demand. Copies attached: Complaint (Filing fee, including Administrative fee, $400, receipt number APAWDC-5803356), filed by THE TRAVELERS HOME AND MARINE INSURANCE COMPANY. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Civil Cover Sheet) (jjg)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: GLOVA et al v. THE TRAVELERS HOME AND MARINE INSURANCE COMPANY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: M. NICHOLAS GLOVA
Represented By: Erin K. Rudert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JUDITH GLOVA
Represented By: Erin K. Rudert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: THE TRAVELERS HOME AND MARINE INSURANCE COMPANY
Represented By: Alan S. Miller
Represented By: Amber L. Reiner Skovdal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?