MILLER v. CACH, LLC et al
Plaintiff: DAVID MILLER
Defendant: CACH, LLC and RESURGENT CAPITAL SERVICES, L.P.
Case Number: 2:2020cv01156
Filed: August 3, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: Patricia L Dodge
Nature of Suit: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 15:1692
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 18, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Mediation. Judge Kenneth J. Benson is appointed as mediator. Party KENNETH J. BENSON added. Signed by Magistrate Judge Patricia L. Dodge on 9/18/2020. Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Order of the Court or Notice on the matter. (mqe)
September 16, 2020 Filing 13 STIPULATION selecting ADR process by CACH, LLC, RESURGENT CAPITAL SERVICES, L.P.. (Burnette, Lauren)
September 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER Implementing Federal Rule of Evidence 502(d) Pursuant to LCvR 16.1.D. Signed by Magistrate Judge Patricia L. Dodge on 9/15/2020. (mqe)
September 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER: Exchange of required Rule 26(a)(1) information due by 9/29/2020, Amended Pleadings due by 12/14/2020, Joinder of Parties due by 12/14/2020, and Discovery due by 2/12/2021. Telephonic Post-Discovery Status Conference set for 2/17/2021 at 10:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Patricia L. Dodge. Signed by Magistrate Judge Patricia L. Dodge on 9/15/2020. (mqe)
September 15, 2020 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Patricia L. Dodge: Telephonic Initial Case Management Conference held on 9/15/2020. Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes a Minute of the Court or Notice on the matter. (mqe)
September 8, 2020 Filing 10 STIPULATION selecting ADR process by DAVID MILLER. (Abramowicz, Kevin)
September 8, 2020 Filing 9 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Abramowicz, Kevin)
September 2, 2020 Filing 8 CONSENT to Trial/Jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge OR District Judge Option, by CACH, LLC, RESURGENT CAPITAL SERVICES, L.P.. (Burnette, Lauren)
September 2, 2020 Filing 7 CONSENT to Trial/Jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge OR District Judge Option, by DAVID MILLER. (Abramowicz, Kevin)
August 12, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 INITIAL LOCAL RULE 16.1 SCHEDULING ORDER: Rule 26 Meeting to be conducted on or before 9/1/2020, Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 9/8/2020, Stipulation Selecting ADR Process due by 9/8/2020, and Willingness to proceed before Magistrate Judge due by 9/2/2020. Telephonic Initial Case Management set for 9/15/2020 at 02:30 PM before Magistrate Judge Patricia L. Dodge. Instructions for the telephone conference will be provided to counsel in advance. Signed by Magistrate Judge Patricia L. Dodge on 8/12/2020. (mqe)
August 11, 2020 Filing 4 Disclosure Statement identifying Alegis Group, LLC; Resurgent Holdings, LLC as corporate parent or other affiliate, by RESURGENT CAPITAL SERVICES, L.P.. (Burnette, Lauren)
August 11, 2020 Filing 3 Disclosure Statement identifying LVNV Funding, LLC as corporate parent or other affiliate, by CACH, LLC. (Burnette, Lauren)
August 11, 2020 Filing 2 ANSWER to Complaint with Affirmative Defenses by CACH, LLC, RESURGENT CAPITAL SERVICES, L.P.. (Burnette, Lauren)
August 3, 2020 CLERK'S OFFICE QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE re #1 Notice of Removal. ERROR: Party did not file disclosure statement as required pursuant L.R. 7.1.1. CORRECTION: Attorney advised to file statement within 7 days. This message is for informational purposes only. Disclosure Statement due by 8/10/2020. (jjg)
August 3, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Washington County Court of Common Pleas, case number 2020-2973 with Jury Demand. Copies attached: Complaint (Filing fee, including Administrative fee, $400, receipt number APAWDC-5806368), filed by RESURGENT CAPITAL SERVICES, L.P., CACH, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Civil Cover Sheet) (jjg)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: MILLER v. CACH, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CACH, LLC
Represented By: Lauren M. Burnette
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RESURGENT CAPITAL SERVICES, L.P.
Represented By: Lauren M. Burnette
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DAVID MILLER
Represented By: Kevin Abramowicz
Represented By: Kevin W. Tucker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?