BLOCKI et al v. MCCULLY et al
Plaintiff: LINDSEY BLOCKI and MATTHEW BLOCKI
Defendant: PUPPY TRAVELERS, LLC a Missouri business corporation doing business as PUPPY TRAVELERS and ZACHARIAH MCCULLY
Case Number: 2:2020cv01185
Filed: August 9, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: Arthur J Schwab
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 10, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 10, 2020 Filing 10 Remark: Certified copy of the Order sent to Allegheny County Court of Common Pleas Text-only entry. No PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Order of the Court or Notice on the matter. (elt)
August 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 MEMORANDUM ORDER that this case shall be remanded to the Court of Common Pleas of Allegheny County FORTHWITH. The Clerk is to mark CASE CLOSED. Signed by Judge Arthur J. Schwab on 8/27/20. (bfm)
August 26, 2020 Filing 8 RESPONSE filed by MATTHEW BLOCKI. (Nalducci, Walter)
August 18, 2020 Filing 7 Disclosure Statement identifying None as corporate parent or other affiliate, by ZACHARIAH MCCULLY, PUPPY TRAVELERS, LLC. (Shepard, Brian)
August 13, 2020 Filing 6 Defendants' Affirmative Defenses and ANSWER to Complaint by ZACHARIAH MCCULLY, PUPPY TRAVELERS, LLC. (Shepard, Brian)
August 12, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Timothy A. Montgomery on behalf of ZACHARIAH MCCULLY, PUPPY TRAVELERS, LLC. (Montgomery, Timothy)
August 12, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by John T. Pion on behalf of ZACHARIAH MCCULLY, PUPPY TRAVELERS, LLC. (Pion, John)
August 11, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER Re: Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 12(b) Motions to Dismiss. Signed by Judge Arthur J. Schwab on 8/11/20. (ms)
August 11, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE that instant civil action has been designated for placement into the United States District Court's Alternative Dispute Resolution program. Parties are directed to fully complete the required 26(f) report, which includes the stipulation of selecting an ADR process. Counsel for plaintiff (or in the case of a removal action, counsel for removing defendant) shall make service of the notice on all parties. (ms)
August 11, 2020 CLERK'S OFFICE QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE re #1 Notice of Removal. ERROR: Party did not file disclosure statement as required pursuant L.R. 7.1.1. CORRECTION: Attorney advised to file statement within 7 days. Disclosure Statement due by 8/18/2020. (ept)
August 10, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Common Pleas of Allegheny County, case number 20-4906 Copies attached: Complaint (Filing fee, including Administrative fee, $400, receipt number APAWDC-5822109), filed by ZACHARIAH MCCULLY, PUPPY TRAVELERS, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Civil Cover Sheet) (ept)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: BLOCKI et al v. MCCULLY et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: LINDSEY BLOCKI
Represented By: Julianne Cutruzzula
Represented By: Walter J. Nalducci
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MATTHEW BLOCKI
Represented By: Julianne Cutruzzula
Represented By: Walter J. Nalducci
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PUPPY TRAVELERS, LLC a Missouri business corporation doing business as PUPPY TRAVELERS
Represented By: Brian L. Shepard
Represented By: Timothy A. Montgomery
Represented By: John T. Pion
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ZACHARIAH MCCULLY
Represented By: Brian L. Shepard
Represented By: Timothy A. Montgomery
Represented By: John T. Pion
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?