SIBLEY-BEY et al v. CITY OF NEW CASTLE et al
Plaintiff: SAH RA Y'HUDI-BEY, AL YAHUDIM DYNASTY VAST ESTATE PURE EXPRESS TRUST, THE MOORISH AMERICAN CONSULATE, MOORISH DIVINE AND NATIONAL MOVEMENT OF THE WORLD, MOORISH SCIENCE TEMPLE OF AMERICA and BRITTANY SIBLEY-BEY
Defendant: CITY OF NEW CASTLE, ROBERT SALEM, JASON HILTON, RICHARD A. RUSSO, RICHARD A. CONTI, BRYAN COVERT, COUNTY OF LAWRENCE, COMMONWEALTH OF PENNSYLVANIA, PERRY QUAHLIERO d/b/a CHEIF DEPUTY SHERIFF OF LAWRENCE COUNTY, TOM WOLF d/b/a GOVERNOR OF THE COMMONWEAL TH OF PENNSYLVANIA, JERRY CARTWRIGHT, NEW CASTLE CITY POLICE DEPARTMENT, CHRIS FRYE d/b/a MAYOR OF THE CITY OF NEW CASTLE, AUDIE MERTZ, THOMAS M. WICKLINE, AMANDA VENTURA, (OFFICER) SIPE, UNIONTOWNSHIP POLICE DEPARTMENT, MARK A. MANOS, (LIEUTENANT) KING, MARK JULIAN and (OFFICER) MILLER
Case Number: 2:2020cv01232
Filed: August 19, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: Robert J Colville
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 30, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 30, 2020 Filing 8 COMPLAINT against (LIEUTENANT) KING, (OFFICER) MILLER, (OFFICER) SIPE, JERRY CARTWRIGHT, CITY OF NEW CASTLE, COMMONWEALTH OF PENNSYLVANIA, RICHARD A. CONTI, COUNTY OF LAWRENCE, BRYAN COVERT, CHRIS FRYE, JASON HILTON, MARK JULIAN, MARK A. MANOS, AUDIE MERTZ, NEW CASTLE CITY POLICE DEPARTMENT, PERRY QUAHLIERO, RICHARD A. RUSSO, ROBERT SALEM, UNIONTOWNSHIP POLICE DEPARTMENT, AMANDA VENTURA, THOMAS M. WICKLINE, TOM WOLF ), filed by SAH RA Y'HUDI-BEY. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 amendment, #3 Envelope) (sdp)
September 30, 2020 Filing 7 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by SAH RA Y'HUDI-BEY. (sdp)
September 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 MEMORANDUM ORDER indicating that, for reasons more fully stated within, Plaintiff's Motion for Reconsideration #5 is denied; Plaintiff's "Amendment" is dismissed and shall be stricken and removed from view on the public docket; Plaintiff may file an amended complaint by no later than 10/1/20. Any such filing must be accompanied by a completed Application to Proceed in District Court Without Prepaying Fees or Costs for this Courts consideration, or the payment of the requisite filing fee. If Plaintiff fails to comply with this Order by 10/1/20, the above-captioned action will be administratively closed. Signed by Judge Robert J. Colville on 9/21/20. (jg)
September 16, 2020 Filing 5 MOTION for Reconsideration re #2 Order, Terminate Motions, Set Deadlines, by MOORISH DIVINE AND NATIONAL MOVEMENT OF THE WORLD, MOORISH SCIENCE TEMPLE OF AMERICA, BRITTANY SIBLEY-BEY, THE MOORISH AMERICAN CONSULATE, SAH RA Y'HUDI-BEY. (sdp)
September 16, 2020 Filing 4 EXHIBITS in Support of #3 Amended Document by AL YAHUDIM DYNASTY VAST ESTATE PURE EXPRESS TRUST, MOORISH DIVINE AND NATIONAL MOVEMENT OF THE WORLD, MOORISH SCIENCE TEMPLE OF AMERICA, BRITTANY SIBLEY-BEY, THE MOORISH AMERICAN CONSULATE, SAH RA Y'HUDI-BEY. (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (sdp)
September 16, 2020 Filing 3 AMENDED DOCUMENT by MOORISH SCIENCE TEMPLE OF AMERICA, BRITTANY SIBLEY-BEY, THE MOORISH AMERICAN CONSULATE, SAH RA Y'HUDI-BEY.. (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (sdp)
August 31, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 2 MEMORANDUM ORDER indicating that, for reasons more fully stated in said Order, that Plaintiffs' Application to Proceed in District Court Without Prepaying Fees or Costs is denied with prejudice in part and denied without prejudice in part. The Application is denied with prejudice in this matter as to Plaintiffs the Moorish American Consulate, the Moorish Science Temple of America, Moorish Divine and National Movement of the World, and Al Yahudim Dynasty Vast Estate Pure Express Trust. To the extent that Plaintiffs choose to file an amended complaint in this matter, as permitted below, these entities must pay the requisite $350.00 filing fee at the time of the filing of the amended complaint. Plaintiffs' Application is denied without prejudice as to Plaintiffs Sah Ra YHudi-Bey and Brittany Sibley-Bey. To the extent Plaintiffs elect to file an amended complaint, Plaintiffs Sah Ra YHudi-Bey and Brittany Sibley-Bey may each submit a completed, individual Application to Proceed in District Court Without Prepaying Fees or Costs for this Court's consideration, or must otherwise pay the requisite filing fee; Because Plaintiffs' Complaint does not comply with Local Rule 8, it is hereby further ordered that Plaintiffs' Complaint is dismissed without prejudice and shall be stricken and removed from view on the public docket. Plaintiffs may file an amended complaint by no later than 9/21/20. Signed by Judge Robert J. Colville on 8/31/20. (jg)
August 19, 2020 Filing 1 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by SAH RA Y'HUDI-BEY. (Attachments: #1 COMPLAINT LODGED PENDING OUTCOME OF IFP, #2 Envelope) (jd)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: SIBLEY-BEY et al v. CITY OF NEW CASTLE et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SAH RA Y'HUDI-BEY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: AL YAHUDIM DYNASTY VAST ESTATE PURE EXPRESS TRUST
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: THE MOORISH AMERICAN CONSULATE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MOORISH DIVINE AND NATIONAL MOVEMENT OF THE WORLD
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MOORISH SCIENCE TEMPLE OF AMERICA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BRITTANY SIBLEY-BEY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CITY OF NEW CASTLE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ROBERT SALEM
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JASON HILTON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RICHARD A. RUSSO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RICHARD A. CONTI
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BRYAN COVERT
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: COUNTY OF LAWRENCE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: COMMONWEALTH OF PENNSYLVANIA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PERRY QUAHLIERO d/b/a CHEIF DEPUTY SHERIFF OF LAWRENCE COUNTY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TOM WOLF d/b/a GOVERNOR OF THE COMMONWEAL TH OF PENNSYLVANIA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JERRY CARTWRIGHT
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NEW CASTLE CITY POLICE DEPARTMENT
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CHRIS FRYE d/b/a MAYOR OF THE CITY OF NEW CASTLE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AUDIE MERTZ
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: THOMAS M. WICKLINE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AMANDA VENTURA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: (OFFICER) SIPE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UNIONTOWNSHIP POLICE DEPARTMENT
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MARK A. MANOS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: (LIEUTENANT) KING
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MARK JULIAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: (OFFICER) MILLER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?