LE SCHACK v. DEVEREUX et al
Plaintiff: MARK LE SCHACK
Defendant: ANNA HOLMBERG, ESQ., CATHERINE LE SCHACK, MARY ANNE KIRBY and JOHN DEVEREUX
Case Number: 2:2020cv01233
Filed: August 19, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: Cynthia Reed Eddy
Referring Judge: J Nicholas Ranjan
Nature of Suit: Other Fraud
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 15, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 15, 2020 Filing 3 OBJECTIONS to #2 Report and Recommendation by MARK LE SCHACK. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Envelope) (jv)
August 27, 2020 Judge J. Nicholas Ranjan presiding. Chief Magistrate Judge Cynthia Reed Eddy referred. (nll)
August 27, 2020 Magistrate Judge Cynthia Reed Eddy no longer presiding in case. (nll)
August 26, 2020 Filing 2 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION recommending #1 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by MARK LE SCHACK be granted and the complaint be dismissed with prejudice. Objections to R&R for Unregistered ECF Users due by 9/14/2020 Signed by Chief Magistrate Judge Cynthia Reed Eddy on 8/26/2020. (ajt)
August 19, 2020 Filing 1 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by MARK LE SCHACK. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Complaint, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit) (jv)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: LE SCHACK v. DEVEREUX et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MARK LE SCHACK
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ANNA HOLMBERG, ESQ.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CATHERINE LE SCHACK
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MARY ANNE KIRBY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOHN DEVEREUX
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?