MCMENAMIN et al v. ARCH INSURANCE COMPANY et al
Plaintiff: JAMES MCMENAMIN, JR., JESSICA MCMENAMIN, CINDY GORDON, JOHN BURNETT and JEFFREY GORDON
Defendant: ARCH INSURANCE SOLUTIONS, INC. and ARCH INSURANCE COMPANY
Case Number: 2:2020cv01262
Filed: August 26, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: Cynthia Reed Eddy
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 15, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER approving #9 Stipulation filed by ARCH INSURANCE COMPANY. Signed by Chief Magistrate Judge Cynthia Reed Eddy on 10/15/2020. (cmc)
October 14, 2020 Filing 9 STIPULATION re #7 Amended Complaint by ARCH INSURANCE COMPANY. (Lucchesi, Thomas)
September 22, 2020 Update Answer Deadline: Answer due from ARCH INSURANCE COMPANY on 10/21/2020 (sdp)
September 21, 2020 Filing 8 STIPULATION re #7 Amended Complaint by ARCH INSURANCE COMPANY, ARCH INSURANCE SOLUTIONS, INC.. (Lucchesi, Thomas)
September 18, 2020 Filing 7 First AMENDED COMPLAINT against ARCH INSURANCE COMPANY ARCH INSURANCE COMPANY answer due 10/2/2020, filed by JAMES MCMENAMIN, JR; JESSICA MCMENAMIN; JEFFREY GORDON; CINDY GORDON; JOHN BURNETT. (Lynch, Gary)
September 18, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal of Arch Insurance Solutions, Inc. only by JAMES MCMENAMIN, JR, JESSICA MCMENAMIN (Lynch, Gary)
September 14, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Thomas Lucchesi on behalf of ARCH INSURANCE COMPANY, ARCH INSURANCE SOLUTIONS, INC.. (Lucchesi, Thomas)
August 31, 2020 Filing 4 SUMMONS/Return of Service Returned Executed by JAMES MCMENAMIN, JR, JESSICA MCMENAMIN. ARCH INSURANCE COMPANY served on 8/28/2020, answer due 9/18/2020; ARCH INSURANCE SOLUTIONS, INC. served on 8/28/2020, answer due 9/18/2020. (Attachments: #1 Attachment) (Lynch, Gary)
August 27, 2020 Filing 3 STANDING PRACTICES ORDER ON RULE 12(b) MOTIONS. Signed by Chief Magistrate Judge Cynthia Reed Eddy on 8/27/2020. (cmc)
August 26, 2020 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to ARCH INSURANCE COMPANY, ARCH INSURANCE SOLUTIONS, INC. (Attachments: #1 Summons) (sdp)
August 26, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against ARCH INSURANCE COMPANY, ARCH INSURANCE SOLUTIONS, INC. (Filing fee, including Administrative fee, $400, receipt number APAWDC-5862493), filed by JAMES MCMENAMIN, JR, JESSICA MCMENAMIN. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (sdp)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: MCMENAMIN et al v. ARCH INSURANCE COMPANY et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JAMES MCMENAMIN, JR.
Represented By: Gary F. Lynch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JESSICA MCMENAMIN
Represented By: Gary F. Lynch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CINDY GORDON
Represented By: Gary F. Lynch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JOHN BURNETT
Represented By: Gary F. Lynch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JEFFREY GORDON
Represented By: Gary F. Lynch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ARCH INSURANCE SOLUTIONS, INC.
Represented By: Thomas Lucchesi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ARCH INSURANCE COMPANY
Represented By: Thomas Lucchesi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?