ROSSI v. M&R POWER EQUIPMENT et al
Plaintiff: RONALDO ROSSI
Defendant: M&R POWER EQUIPMENT GROUP BUTLER, INC., M&R POWER EQUIPMENT, INC., M&R POWER EQUIPMENT GROUP HERMITAGE, INC., M&R POWER EQUIPMENT GROUP, INC. and M&R POWER EQUIPMENT
Case Number: 2:2020cv01267
Filed: August 27, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: Lisa Pupo Lenihan
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1441cr
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 19, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 19, 2020 CLERK'S OFFICE QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE re #11 Proposed Discovery Plan. ERROR: Wrong event selected. CORRECTION: Re-docketed as REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting at #15 . This message is for informational purposes only. (ma)
October 15, 2020 Filing 14 NOTICE of Appearance by Ashley J Giannetti on behalf of RONALDO ROSSI. (Giannetti, Ashley)
October 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 13 CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER: Compliance with provisions of Rule 16 shall be completed as follows: Initial disclosures pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 26(a) shall be made by October 28, 2020. Amendments to the pleadings and joinder of additional parties will be completed by November 12, 2020. The parties are ordered to return to Judge Benson for a follow up conference to their prior mediation no later than December 14, 2020. A telephone status conference is scheduled for December 16, 2020 at 11:00 AM. Counsel are to call into the conference by dialing 888-363-4749 and entering the access code 6019141. If asked for a security code, use * to bypass. The parties shall complete fact discovery by March 15, 2021. A status/settlement conference will be held on March 22, 2021 at 11:00 AM. Trial counsel shall attend and the parties shall be available by telephone. No later than 5 business days prior to the conference any party intending to file a motion for summary judgment shall file a statement, no longer than 3 pages, setting forth the grounds on which the motion will be filed. All parties are to be prepared to discuss this at the conference. Signed by Magistrate Judge Lisa Pupo Lenihan on 10/14/2020. (jmb)
October 14, 2020 Filing 12 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Lisa Pupo Lenihan: A Telephonic Initial Case Management Conference was held on 10/14/2020. Counsel advised that there was a previous mediation with Judge Benson and a tentative agreement was reached, which fell through. They request to therefore be excused from the mandatory ADR process. The Court will agree that the parties do not have to engage in a full blown ADR process but they will be ordered to return to a conference with Judge Benson within 60 days of today. An Initial Scheduling Order will be entered. (jmb)
October 12, 2020 Filing 15 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (ma)
October 12, 2020 Filing 11 PROPOSED DISCOVERY PLAN pursuant to Rule 26(f) by RONALDO ROSSI. (Hardin, Kenneth) Wrong event selected. Removed from public view and refiled at #15 . Modified on 10/19/2020 (ma).
September 22, 2020 Filing 10 CONSENT to Trial/Jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge OR District Judge Option, by M&R POWER EQUIPMENT, M&R POWER EQUIPMENT GROUP BUTLER, INC., M&R POWER EQUIPMENT GROUP HERMITAGE, INC., M&R POWER EQUIPMENT GROUP, INC., M&R POWER EQUIPMENT, INC.. (Mahler, Emily)
September 18, 2020 Filing 9 CONSENT to Trial/Jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge OR District Judge Option, by RONALDO ROSSI. (Drum, Kayla)
September 16, 2020 Filing 8 Disclosure Statement identifying None as corporate parent or other affiliate, by M&R POWER EQUIPMENT, M&R POWER EQUIPMENT GROUP BUTLER, INC., M&R POWER EQUIPMENT GROUP HERMITAGE, INC., M&R POWER EQUIPMENT GROUP, INC., M&R POWER EQUIPMENT, INC.. (Mahler, Emily)
September 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER that the Initial Case Management Conference in this matter will be held via telephone on October 14, 2020, at 11:00 AM. All participants shall call into the conference by dialing 888-363-4749 and entering the access code 6019141. If asked for a security code, use * to bypass. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the parties file a Rule 26(f) Report no later than two days before the scheduled conference. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the parties file the Stipulation Selecting ADR Process no later than two days before the scheduled conference. Signed by Magistrate Judge Lisa Pupo Lenihan on 09/14/2020. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit ADR Form) (jmb)
September 11, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Taylor Wayne Isaac on behalf of M&R POWER EQUIPMENT, M&R POWER EQUIPMENT GROUP BUTLER, INC., M&R POWER EQUIPMENT GROUP HERMITAGE, INC., M&R POWER EQUIPMENT GROUP, INC., M&R POWER EQUIPMENT, INC.. (Isaac, Taylor)
September 8, 2020 CLERK'S OFFICE QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE re #4 Answer to Complaint. ERROR: Party did not file disclosure statement as required pursuant L.R. 7.1.1. CORRECTION: Attorney advised to file statement within 7 days. Disclosure Statement due by 9/15/2020. (ma)
September 4, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Kayla Drum on behalf of RONALDO ROSSI. (Drum, Kayla)
September 3, 2020 Filing 4 ANSWER to Complaint by M&R POWER EQUIPMENT, M&R POWER EQUIPMENT GROUP BUTLER, INC., M&R POWER EQUIPMENT GROUP HERMITAGE, INC., M&R POWER EQUIPMENT GROUP, INC., M&R POWER EQUIPMENT, INC.. (Mahler, Emily)
September 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER that because this case has been assigned to a Magistrate Judge, each party must execute and file the form consenting to the jurisdiction of the Magistrate Judge or selecting the option to have the case randomly assigned to a District Judge no later than September 22, 2020. The applicable form is available on the Court's website at www.pawd.uscourts.gov in the forms section. THE EVENT USED FOR DOCKETING THIS FORM IS FOUND UNDER OTHER DOCUMENTS, CALLED CONSENT TO TRIAL BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE OR DISTRICT JUDGE. If the parties elect to have the case assigned to a District Judge, Magistrate Judge Lisa Pupo Lenihan will continue to manage the case as provided for in Local Rule 72G. Any party who has filed a Consent to Trial by a Magistrate Judge or District Judge form does not need to refile it. Signed by Magistrate Judge Lisa Pupo Lenihan on 09/01/2020. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Consent Form) (jmb)
September 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER re Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 12(b) Motions to Dismiss, as more fully stated in said order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Lisa Pupo Lenihan on 09/01/2020. (jmb)
August 27, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Court of Common Pleas of Mercer County, case number 2020-2199 Copies attached: State Court Complaint (Filing fee, including Administrative fee, $400, receipt number APAWDC-5866875), filed by M&R POWER EQUIPMENT GROUP HERMITAGE, INC., M&R POWER EQUIPMENT, INC., M&R POWER EQUIPMENT, M&R POWER EQUIPMENT GROUP, INC., M&R POWER EQUIPMENT GROUP BUTLER, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Civil Cover Sheet) (ma)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: ROSSI v. M&R POWER EQUIPMENT et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: M&R POWER EQUIPMENT GROUP BUTLER, INC.
Represented By: Emily E. Mahler
Represented By: Taylor Wayne Isaac
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: M&R POWER EQUIPMENT, INC.
Represented By: Emily E. Mahler
Represented By: Taylor Wayne Isaac
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: M&R POWER EQUIPMENT GROUP HERMITAGE, INC.
Represented By: Emily E. Mahler
Represented By: Taylor Wayne Isaac
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: M&R POWER EQUIPMENT GROUP, INC.
Represented By: Emily E. Mahler
Represented By: Taylor Wayne Isaac
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: M&R POWER EQUIPMENT
Represented By: Emily E. Mahler
Represented By: Taylor Wayne Isaac
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: RONALDO ROSSI
Represented By: Kenneth J. Hardin, II
Represented By: Ashley J Giannetti
Represented By: Kayla Drum
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?