LANG v. CIGNA HOLDING CO. et al
Plaintiff: MELODY LANG
Defendant: LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY OF NORTH AMERICA and CIGNA HOLDING CO.
Case Number: 2:2020cv01270
Filed: August 27, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: Joy Flowers Conti
Referring Judge: W Scott Hardy
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 42:12101
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 22, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to W. Scott Hardy for all further proceedings. Judge Joy Flowers Conti no longer assigned to case. All previously scheduled deadlines and proceedings shall remain in effect unless otherwise ordered by the Court. See order at 2:20-mc-1349. Signed by Chief Judge Mark R. Hornak on 9/17/2020. Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Order of the Court or Notice on the matter. (cw)
September 21, 2020 Update Answer Deadline: Answer due from CIGNA HOLDING CO., LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY OF NORTH AMERICA (cel)
September 21, 2020 ***WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by MELODY LANG. CIGNA HOLDING CO. waiver sent on 8/28/2020, answer due 10/27/2020; LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY OF NORTH AMERICA waiver sent on 8/28/2020, answer due 10/27/2020. (cel)
September 21, 2020 Filing 4 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by MELODY LANG. CIGNA HOLDING CO. waiver sent on 8/28/2020, answer due 10/27/2020; LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY OF NORTH AMERICA waiver sent on 8/28/2020, answer due 10/27/2020. (Carroll, Ryan) Modified on 10/14/2020 (cel).
September 3, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE that instant civil action has been designated for placement into the United States District Court's Alternative Dispute Resolution program. Parties are directed to fully complete the required 26(f) report, which includes the stipulation of selecting an ADR process. Counsel for plaintiff (or in the case of a removal action, counsel for removing defendant) shall make service of the notice on all parties. (cjo)
August 28, 2020 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to CIGNA HOLDING CO., LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY OF NORTH AMERICA (Attachments: #1 Summons) (ma)
August 27, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against CIGNA HOLDING CO., LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY OF NORTH AMERICA (Filing fee, including Administrative fee, $400, receipt number APAWDC-5866844), filed by MELODY LANG. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (ma)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: LANG v. CIGNA HOLDING CO. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MELODY LANG
Represented By: Ryan Carroll
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY OF NORTH AMERICA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CIGNA HOLDING CO.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?