HARRISON v. C R BARD INC et al
Plaintiff: ALLEN HARRISON
Defendant: MCKESSON CORPORATION, C R BARD INC, BARD PERIPHERAL VASCULAR INCORPORATED and DOES 1 THROUGH 100, INCLUSIVE
Case Number: 2:2020cv01281
Filed: September 1, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: William S Stickman
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 1, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ORDER SCHEDULING INITIAL CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Rule 26 Meeting to be conducted on or before 9/23/2020. Rule 26 Meeting Report and Stipulation Selecting ADR Process due by 9/30/2020. Telephonic Initial Case Management Conference set for 10/15/2020 at 9:30 AM before Judge William S. Stickman. Counsel for Plaintiff is directed to manage the call and to contact chambers at 412-208-7390 once all parties are connected. Signed by Judge William S. Stickman on 09/01/20. (eca)
September 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ORDER DENYING AS MOOT #2 Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction; DENYING AS MOOT #9 Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction; DENYING AS MOOT #20 Motion to Sever and Transfer Venue. The matter having been transferred to this Court, the motions are DENIED AS MOOT. Signed by Judge William S. Stickman on 09/01/20. Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Order of the Court or Notice on the matter. (eca)
September 1, 2020 Filing 29 Case transferred in from District of Texas Northern; Case Number 3:20-cv-02459. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
August 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 28 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER grants #23 Amended Motion to Sever and Transfer Venue of Out-of-State Plaintiffs' Cases. The Court directs the Clerk of the Court to sever and transfer this action as follows: a. Plaintiff Michelle Guptil's case be severed and transferred to the Minneapolis Division of the District of Minnesota (Civil case 3:20-cv-2458 opened); b. Plaintiff Allen Harrison's case be severed and transferred to the Pittsburgh Division of the Western District of Pennsylvania (Civil case 3:20-cv-2459 opened); c. Plaintiff Larry Napier's case be severed and transferred to the Nashville Division of the Middle District of Tennessee (Civil case 3:20-cv-2460 opened); d. Plaintiff Richard Novia's case be severed and transferred to the Worcester Division of the District of Massachusetts (Civil case 3:20-cv-2461 opened); e. Plaintiff Sharon Sutherland's case be severed and transferred to the Fort Lauderdale Division of the Southern District of Florida (Civil case 3:20-cv-2462 opened); f. Plaintiff Craig Thompson's case be severed and transferred to the Milwaukee Division of the Eastern District of Wisconsin (Civil case 3:20-cv-2463 opened); g. Plaintiff John Vail's case be severed and transferred to the Tampa Division of the Middle District of Florida (Civil case 3:20-cv-2464 opened). Plaintiff Frank Aguilera is the sole plaintiff with any connection to this forum. Accordingly, he shall remain in the Dallas Division of the Northern District of Texas. (Ordered by Judge Karen Gren Scholer on 8/20/2020) (jmg)
August 19, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 27 Order: Pursuant to the parties' agreement, see ECF Nos. #23 , #25 , the Court DISMISSES WITHOUT PREJUDICE Plaintiff Melissa Reyes's claims against Defendants. The parties shall bear their own costs. All relief not expressly granted is DENIED. (Ordered by Judge Karen Gren Scholer on 8/19/2020) (ndt)
August 19, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 26 Order: Pursuant to the parties' agreement, see ECF Nos. #23 , #25 , the Court DISMISSES WITHOUT PREJUDICE Plaintiff Jerry Derrick's claims against Defendants. The parties shall bear their own costs. All relief not expressly granted is DENIED. (Ordered by Judge Karen Gren Scholer on 8/19/2020) (ndt)
August 14, 2020 Filing 25 RESPONSE filed by Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated, C R Bard Inc re: #20 MOTION to Sever and Transfer Venue of Out of State Plaintiffs' Cases, #23 Amended MOTION to Sever and Transfer Venue of Out of State Plaintiffs' Cases (Matthews, Melissa)
August 12, 2020 Filing 24 Brief/Memorandum in Support filed by Frank Aguilera, Jerry Derrick, Michelle Guptil, Allen Harrison, Larry Napier, Richard Novia, Melissa Reyes, Sharon Sutherland, Craig Thompson, John Vail re #23 Amended MOTION to Sever and Transfer Venue of Out of State Plaintiffs' Cases (Schulte, Steven)
August 12, 2020 Filing 23 Amended MOTION to Sever and Transfer Venue of Out of State Plaintiffs' Cases filed by Frank Aguilera, Jerry Derrick, Michelle Guptil, Allen Harrison, Larry Napier, Richard Novia, Melissa Reyes, Sharon Sutherland, Craig Thompson, John Vail (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Proposed Order) (Schulte, Steven)
July 31, 2020 Filing 22 Appendix in Support filed by Frank Aguilera, Jerry Derrick, Michelle Guptil, Allen Harrison, Larry Napier, Richard Novia, Melissa Reyes, Sharon Sutherland, Craig Thompson, John Vail re #20 MOTION to Sever and Transfer Venue of Out of State Plaintiffs' Cases Including Declaration and Exhibits (Schulte, Steven)
July 31, 2020 Filing 21 Brief/Memorandum in Support filed by Frank Aguilera, Jerry Derrick, Michelle Guptil, Allen Harrison, Larry Napier, Richard Novia, Melissa Reyes, Sharon Sutherland, Craig Thompson, John Vail re #20 MOTION to Sever and Transfer Venue of Out of State Plaintiffs' Cases (Schulte, Steven)
July 31, 2020 Filing 20 MOTION to Sever and Transfer Venue of Out of State Plaintiffs' Cases filed by Frank Aguilera, Jerry Derrick, Michelle Guptil, Allen Harrison, Larry Napier, Richard Novia, Melissa Reyes, Sharon Sutherland, Craig Thompson, John Vail (Schulte, Steven)
July 31, 2020 Filing 19 RESPONSE filed by Frank Aguilera, Jerry Derrick, Michelle Guptil, Allen Harrison, Larry Napier, Richard Novia, Melissa Reyes, Sharon Sutherland, Craig Thompson, John Vail re: #9 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction , #2 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction (Schulte, Steven)
July 22, 2020 Filing 18 NOTICE of Filing Completed Forms For Each Plaintiff filed by Frank Aguilera, Jerry Derrick, Michelle Guptil, Allen Harrison, Larry Napier, Richard Novia, Melissa Reyes, Sharon Sutherland, Craig Thompson, John Vail (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s)) (Schulte, Steven)
July 22, 2020 Filing 17 NOTICE of Filing Completed Forms For Each Plaintiff filed by Frank Aguilera, Jerry Derrick, Michelle Guptil, Allen Harrison, Larry Napier, Richard Novia, Melissa Reyes, Sharon Sutherland, Craig Thompson, John Vail (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s)) (Schulte, Steven)
July 21, 2020 Filing 16 NOTICE of Filing Completed Forms for Each Plaintiff filed by Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated, C R Bard Inc, McKesson Corporation (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) A - Responses) (Matthews, Melissa)
July 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER: To assist the Court, counsel for all parties shall complete the form attached hereto as Exhibit A for each Plaintiff in this action. The parties shall file their completed forms on or before 7/22/2020. (Ordered by Judge Karen Gren Scholer on 7/16/2020) (mla)
July 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ELECTRONIC ORDER: The Court grants the parties' Agreed Motion for Extension of Time. (Ordered by Judge Karen Gren Scholer on 7/1/2020) (ctf)
June 29, 2020 Filing 13 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to #9 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction , #2 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by Frank Aguilera, Jerry Derrick, Michelle Guptil, Allen Harrison, Larry Napier, Richard Novia, Melissa Reyes, Sharon Sutherland, Craig Thompson, John Vail (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Proposed Order) (Schulte, Steven)
June 17, 2020 Filing 12 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by McKesson Corporation. (Jarreau, Jordan)
June 17, 2020 Filing 11 ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) with Jury Demand filed by McKesson Corporation (Jarreau, Jordan)
June 17, 2020 Filing 10 Brief/Memorandum in Support filed by McKesson Corporation re #9 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction (Jarreau, Jordan)
June 17, 2020 Filing 9 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by McKesson Corporation (Jarreau, Jordan)
June 17, 2020 Filing 8 ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) with Jury Demand filed by Bard Peripheral Vascular Inc, C R Bard Inc (Jarreau, Jordan)
June 11, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ELECTRONIC ORDER: Civil action number 3:20-CV-1512-G is hereby transferred to the docket of the Honorable Karen Gren Scholer and shall henceforth carry the suffix letter "S". (Ordered by Senior Judge A. Joe Fish on 6/11/2020) (ctf)
June 11, 2020 Filing 6 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by C R Bard Inc identifying Corporate Parent/Other Affiliate Becton, Dickinson and Company for C R Bard Inc. (Jarreau, Jordan) Modified corporate parent on 6/12/2020 (mla).
June 11, 2020 Filing 5 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Bard Peripheral Vascular Inc. (Jarreau, Jordan)
June 10, 2020 Filing 4 New Case Notes: A filing fee has been paid. Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge (Judge Horan). Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. (oyh)
June 10, 2020 Filing 3 Brief/Memorandum in Support filed by Bard Peripheral Vascular Inc, C R Bard Inc re #2 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction (Jarreau, Jordan)
June 10, 2020 Filing 2 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by Bard Peripheral Vascular Inc, C R Bard Inc (Jarreau, Jordan)
June 10, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL WITH JURY DEMAND filed by C R Bard Inc, Bard Peripheral Vascular Inc. (Filing fee $400; receipt number 0539-10904036) In each Notice of Electronic Filing, the judge assignment is indicated, and a link to the # Judges Copy Requirements and # Judge Specific Requirements is provided. The court reminds the filer that any required copy of this and future documents must be delivered to the judge, in the manner prescribed, within three business days of filing. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms and Instructions found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Attachments: #1 Cover Sheet, #2 Cover Sheet Supplement, #3 Exhibit(s) A - Portion of REACH Agreement (redacted), #4 Exhibit(s) B - McKesson page, #5 Exhibit(s) C - 8-30-16 Romney, Kim Deposition, #6 Exhibit(s) D Index of State Docs, #7 Exhibit(s) D-1 - State Court Docket Sheet, #8 Exhibit(s) D-2 - 2020-04-03 Original Petition, #9 Exhibit(s) D-3 - 2020-04-03 Civil Case Info. Sheet, #10 Exhibit(s) D-4 - 2020-04-03 Jury Demand, #11 Exhibit(s) D-5 - 2020-04-06 Citation Issued - C.R. Bard, #12 Exhibit(s) D-6 - 2020-04-06 Citation Issued - McKesson, #13 Exhibit(s) D-7 - 2020-04-06 Citation issued To Bard Peripheral Vascular, Inc., #14 Exhibit(s) D-8 - 2020-04-17 Status Conference Order, #15 Exhibit(s) D-9 - 2020-05-06 Affidavit of Service - McKesson, #16 Exhibit(s) D-10 - 2020-05-22 Return of Service - C.R. Bard, #17 Exhibit(s) D-11 - 2020-05-29 Status Conference Order, #18 Exhibit(s) D-12 - 2020-06-04 Return of Service - Bard Peripheral Vascular, Inc.) (Jarreau, Jordan)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: HARRISON v. C R BARD INC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MCKESSON CORPORATION
Represented By: Melissa Dorman Matthews
Represented By: Jordan E Jarreau
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: C R BARD INC
Represented By: Melissa Dorman Matthews
Represented By: Jordan E Jarreau
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BARD PERIPHERAL VASCULAR INCORPORATED
Represented By: Melissa Dorman Matthews
Represented By: Jordan E Jarreau
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DOES 1 THROUGH 100, INCLUSIVE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ALLEN HARRISON
Represented By: Darren McDowell
Represented By: Eric Martin Przybysz
Represented By: Steven Scott Schulte
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?