CHVALA v. HARMONY FIRE DISTRICT
Plaintiff: JAMES F. CHVALA
Defendant: HARMONY FIRE DISTRICT and HARMONY FIRE DISTRICT STATION
Case Number: 2:2020cv01292
Filed: August 31, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: Robert J Colville
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 13, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 13, 2020 Filing 14 BRIEF in Support re #13 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by HARMONY FIRE DISTRICT. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6) (Rende, Bruce)
October 13, 2020 Filing 13 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by HARMONY FIRE DISTRICT. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Conferring, #2 Proposed Order) (Rende, Bruce)
October 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER granting #11 Defendant's Motion for Leave to Exceed Page Limit; Defendant is granted leave to file its Brief in Support of Motion to Dismiss in substantially the same form as presented at Exhibit "A" of its Motion for Leave to Exceed Page Limit. Signed by Judge Robert J. Colville on 10/13/20. (jg)
October 13, 2020 Filing 11 MOTION for Leave to File Brief in Excess of Page Limit by HARMONY FIRE DISTRICT. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Proposed Order) (Rende, Bruce)
October 2, 2020 Filing 10 First AMENDED COMPLAINT IN CIVIL ACTION against HARMONY FIRE DISTRICT HARMONY FIRE DISTRICT answer due 10/23/2020, filed by JAMES F. CHVALA. (Pappasergi, Todd)
October 2, 2020 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Todd M. Pappasergi on behalf of JAMES F. CHVALA. (Pappasergi, Todd)
September 11, 2020 Filing 8 Disclosure Statement identifying None as corporate parent or other affiliate, by HARMONY FIRE DISTRICT. (Rende, Bruce)
September 11, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER indicating that upon consideration of the parties' #6 Stipulation, it is hereby ordered that Plaintiff's Amended Complaint is due by 10/2/20 and Defendant's Response thereto is due by 10/23/20. Signed by Judge Robert J. Colville on 9/11/20. Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Order of the Court or Notice on the matter. (jg)
September 10, 2020 Filing 6 STIPULATION by HARMONY FIRE DISTRICT. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Rende, Bruce)
September 10, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Timothy D. Iannini on behalf of HARMONY FIRE DISTRICT. (Iannini, Timothy)
September 8, 2020 Filing 4 AT&T SCHEDULING NOTICE FOR ALL TELEPHONIC CONFERENCES. Every Telephonic Conference conducted will be via an AT&T call-in number which requires participants to dial-in and provide an access code. When a Telephonic Conference is scheduled you will be instructed to refer back to this. This document has a security setting of "Case Participants Only," so only those individuals will have access to view the document. (jg)
September 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER RE: Rule 12(b) Motions (details more fully stated in said Order). Signed by Judge Robert J. Colville on 9/8/20. (jg)
September 8, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE that instant civil action has been designated for placement into the United States District Court's Alternative Dispute Resolution program. Parties are directed to fully complete the required 26(f) report, which includes the stipulation of selecting an ADR process. Counsel for plaintiff (or in the case of a removal action, counsel for removing defendant) shall make service of the notice on all parties. (jg)
August 31, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Butler County, case number 20-10562 with jury demand ( Filing fee, including Administrative fee, $400,APAWDC-5874767), filed by HARMONY FIRE DISTRICT. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit complaint, #3 Exhibit order, #4 Exhibit affidavit, #5 Exhibit appearance) (sdp)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: CHVALA v. HARMONY FIRE DISTRICT
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HARMONY FIRE DISTRICT
Represented By: Timothy D. Iannini
Represented By: Bruce E. Rende
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HARMONY FIRE DISTRICT STATION
Represented By: Timothy D. Iannini
Represented By: Bruce E. Rende
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JAMES F. CHVALA
Represented By: Todd M. Pappasergi
Represented By: Todd M Pappasergi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?