MAKER et al v. CERVI et al
Plaintiff: ROBERT J. MAKER and ANNA NEWHART MAKER
Defendant: JAMES CERVI, GFS TRANSPORT, LLC and GORDON FOOD SERVICE, INC.
Case Number: 2:2020cv01314
Filed: September 3, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: Joy Flowers Conti
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 23, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 23, 2020 Filing 14 ANSWER to #8 Amended Complaint, by JAMES CERVI, GFS TRANSPORT, LLC, GORDON FOOD SERVICE, INC.. (Clements, Scott)
October 16, 2020 CLERK'S OFFICE QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE re #13 Waiver of Service Executed. ERROR: Incorrect date used for service date. CORRECTION: Modified to correct service date to 10/8/2020, which changed answer due date to 12/9/2020. This message is for informational purposes only. (jv)
October 14, 2020 Filing 13 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by ROBERT J. MAKER, ANNA NEWHART MAKER. Gordon Food Service, Inc. waiver sent on 10/8/2020, answer due 12/9/2020. (Balzarini, Laura) Modified on 10/16/2020 to correct service date which changed answer due date to 12/9/2020 (jv).
October 14, 2020 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by Laura Elizabeth Balzarini on behalf of ANNA NEWHART MAKER, ROBERT J. MAKER. (Balzarini, Laura)
October 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 INITIAL LOCAL RULE 16.1 SCHEDULING ORDER: Case Management set for 12/8/2020 at 2:00 PM in Courtroom 5A before Judge Joy Flowers Conti. Rule 26 Meeting to be conducted on or before 10/30/2020. ADR Stipulation and Rule 26f Report due by 11/13/2020. Details more fully stated in the order. Signed by Judge Joy Flowers Conti on 10/9/20. (cjo)
October 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER ON MOTIONS PRACTICE. Signed by Judge Joy Flowers Conti on 10/9/20. (cjo)
October 6, 2020 Filing 9 PRAECIPE to Issue Summons by ANNA NEWHART MAKER, ROBERT J. MAKER (Balzarini, Edward)
October 6, 2020 Filing 8 AMENDED COMPLAINT against JAMES CERVI, GFS TRANSPORT, LLC, Gordon Food Service, Inc. JAMES CERVI answer due 10/20/2020; GFS TRANSPORT, LLC answer due 10/20/2020; Gordon Food Service, Inc. answer due 10/20/2020, filed by ROBERT J. MAKER; ANNA NEWHART MAKER. (Balzarini, Edward)
September 30, 2020 Filing 7 AMENDED ANSWER to Complaint by JAMES CERVI, GFS TRANSPORT, LLC. (Clements, Scott)
September 24, 2020 Filing 6 DECLARATION re #4 Order to Show Cause by JAMES CERVI, GFS TRANSPORT, LLC. (Clements, Scott)
September 10, 2020 Filing 5 ANSWER to Complaint by JAMES CERVI, GFS TRANSPORT, LLC. (Clements, Scott)
September 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE why removal jurisdiction is proper.Defendants' Show Cause Response due by 9/24/2020. Plaintiff may respond by 10/8/20. Signed by Judge Joy Flowers Conti on 9/10/20. (mh)
September 4, 2020 Filing 3 Disclosure Statement identifying None as corporate parent or other affiliate, by GFS TRANSPORT, LLC. (Clements, Scott)
September 4, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Lars A Peterson on behalf of JAMES CERVI, GFS TRANSPORT, LLC. (Peterson, Lars)
September 4, 2020 CLERK'S OFFICE QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE re #1 Notice of Removal. ERROR: Party did not file disclosure statement as required pursuant L.R. 7.1.1. for GFS TRANSPORT, LLC. CORRECTION: Attorney advised to file statement within 7 days. ACTION REQUIRED. Disclosure Statement due by 9/11/2020. (jv)
September 3, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Court of Common Pleas of Washington County, case number 2020-4085 (Filing fee, including Administrative fee, $400, receipt number APAWDC-5885863), filed by GFS TRANSPORT, LLC, JAMES CERVI. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A - Including Complaint filed in State Court) (jv)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: MAKER et al v. CERVI et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ROBERT J. MAKER
Represented By: Edward J. Balzarini, Jr.
Represented By: Laura Elizabeth Balzarini
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ANNA NEWHART MAKER
Represented By: Edward J. Balzarini, Jr.
Represented By: Laura Elizabeth Balzarini
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JAMES CERVI
Represented By: Scott D. Clements
Represented By: Lars A Peterson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GFS TRANSPORT, LLC
Represented By: Scott D. Clements
Represented By: Lars A Peterson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GORDON FOOD SERVICE, INC.
Represented By: Scott D. Clements
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?