MCKENNA v. C R BARD INC et al
Plaintiff: GERTHA MCKENNA
Defendant: MCKESSON CORPORATION, C R BARD INC, DOES 1 THROUGH 100, INCLUSIVE and BARD PERIPHERAL VASCULAR, INC.
Case Number: 2:2020cv01346
Filed: September 10, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: Nora Barry Fischer
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 10, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 10, 2020 Filing 27 Case transferred in from District of Texas Northern; Case Number 3:20-cv-02718. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
August 31, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 26 Memorandum Opinion and Order Grants #20 Motion to Sever and Transfer Venue of Out-of-State Plaintiffs' Cases. The Court directs the Clerk of the Court to sever and transfer this action as follows: a. Plaintiff James Arrowood's case be severed and transferred to the San Antonio Division of the Western District of Texas (3:20-cv-2708 case opened); b. Plaintiff Morgan Blevins's case be severed and transferred to the Chattanooga Division of the Eastern District of Tennessee (3:20-cv-2709 case opened); c. Plaintiff Jerry Comer's case be severed and transferred to the Eastern Division of the Western District of Tennessee (3:20-cv-2710 case opened); d. Plaintiff Michael Curry's case be severed and transferred to the Philadelphia Division of the Eastern District of Pennsylvania (3:20-cv-2711 case opened); e. Plaintiff Charlotte Dorsey's case be severed and transferred to the Northern Division of the District of Maryland (3:20-cv-2712 case opened); f. Plaintiff LaVerne Hazley's case be severed and transferred to the Alexandria Division of the Eastern District of Virginia (3:20-cv-2713 case opened); g. Plaintiff Gina Hill's case be severed and transferred to the Northern Division of the Middle District of Alabama (3:20-cv-2714 case opened); h. Plaintiff Steve Hoffman's case be severed and transferred to the Florence Division of the District of South Carolina (3:20-cv-2715 case opend); i. Plaintiff Kanitha Jones's case be severed and transferred to the Western Division of the Western District of Tennessee (3:20-cv-2716 case opened); j. Plaintiff Paulette Leaphart's case be severed and transferred to the Newport News Division of the Eastern District of Virginia (3:20-cv-2717 case opened); k. Plaintiff Gertha McKenna's case be severed and transferred to the Pittsburgh Division of the Western District of Pennsylvania (3:20-cv-2718 case opened); l. Plaintiff Prince Scott Williams's case be severed and transferred to the Tampa Division of the Middle District of Florida (3:20-cv-2719 case opened); m. Plaintiff Verrell Wyman's case be severed and transferred to the Tampa Division of the Middle District of Florida (3:20-cv-2720 case opened); n. Plaintiff Richard Yohn's case be severed and transferred to the Boston Division of the District of Massachusetts (3:20-cv-2721 case opened); o. Plaintiff Nathan Young's case be severed and transferred to the Chicago Division of the Northern District of Illinois (3:20-cv-2722); p. Plaintiff Karon Zulewski's case be severed and transferred to the Southern Division of the Eastern District of Michigan (3:20-cv-2723 case opened); q. Plaintiff Scott Zuzek's case be severed and transferred to the Wilkes Barre Division of the Middle District of Pennsylvania (3:20-cv-2724 case opened). Plaintiff Danny Wheeler is the sole plaintiff with any connection to this forum. Accordingly, he shall remain in the Dallas Division of the Northern District of Texas. (Ordered by Judge Karen Gren Scholer on 8/31/2020) (mjr)
August 28, 2020 Filing 25 RESPONSE filed by Bard Peripheral Vascular Inc, C R Bard Inc re: #20 MOTION to Sever and Transfer Venue of Out of State Plaintiffs' Cases, #24 Supplemental MOTION to Sever and Transfer Venue of Out of State Plaintiffs' Cases (Matthews, Melissa)
August 27, 2020 Filing 24 Supplemental MOTION to Sever and Transfer Venue of Out of State Plaintiffs' Cases filed by Paulette Leaphart (Schulte, Steven)
August 14, 2020 Filing 23 RESPONSE filed by Bard Peripheral Vascular Inc, C R Bard Inc re: #20 MOTION to Sever and Transfer Venue of Out of State Plaintiffs' Cases (Matthews, Melissa)
August 10, 2020 Filing 22 Appendix in Support filed by James Arrowood, Morgan Blevins, Jerry Comer, Michael Curry, Charlotte Dorsey, Laverne Hazley, Gina Hill, Steven Hoffman, Kanitha Jones, Paulette Leaphart, Gertha McKenna, Danny Wheeler, Scott Wilson, Verrell Wyman, Richard Yohn, Nathan Young, Karon Zulewski, Scott Zuzek re #20 MOTION to Sever and Transfer Venue of Out of State Plaintiffs' Cases (Schulte, Steven)
August 10, 2020 Filing 21 Brief/Memorandum in Support filed by James Arrowood, Morgan Blevins, Jerry Comer, Michael Curry, Charlotte Dorsey, Laverne Hazley, Gina Hill, Steven Hoffman, Kanitha Jones, Paulette Leaphart, Gertha McKenna, Danny Wheeler, Scott Wilson, Verrell Wyman, Richard Yohn, Nathan Young, Karon Zulewski, Scott Zuzek re #20 MOTION to Sever and Transfer Venue of Out of State Plaintiffs' Cases (Schulte, Steven)
August 10, 2020 Filing 20 MOTION to Sever and Transfer Venue of Out of State Plaintiffs' Cases filed by James Arrowood, Morgan Blevins, Jerry Comer, Michael Curry, Charlotte Dorsey, Laverne Hazley, Gina Hill, Steven Hoffman, Kanitha Jones, Paulette Leaphart, Gertha McKenna, Danny Wheeler, Scott Wilson, Verrell Wyman, Richard Yohn, Nathan Young, Karon Zulewski, Scott Zuzek (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Proposed Order) (Schulte, Steven)
August 10, 2020 Filing 19 RESPONSE filed by James Arrowood, Morgan Blevins, Jerry Comer, Michael Curry, Charlotte Dorsey, Laverne Hazley, Gina Hill, Steven Hoffman, Kanitha Jones, Paulette Leaphart, Gertha McKenna, Danny Wheeler, Scott Wilson, Verrell Wyman, Richard Yohn, Nathan Young, Karon Zulewski, Scott Zuzek re: #2 MOTION to Dismiss the Out-Of State Plaintiffs' Claims for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction, #8 MOTION to Dismiss Without Prejudice Plaintiffs' Claims for Lack of Subject Matter Jurisdiction (Schulte, Steven)
July 22, 2020 Filing 18 NOTICE of Filing Completed Forms for Each Plaintiff re: #16 Order, filed by James Arrowood, Morgan Blevins, Jerry Comer, Michael Curry, Charlotte Dorsey, Laverne Hazley, Gina Hill, Steven Hoffman, Kanitha Jones, Paulette Leaphart, Gertha McKenna, Danny Wheeler, Scott Wilson, Verrell Wyman, Richard Yohn, Nathan Young, Karon Zulewski, Scott Zuzek (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) Completed Plaintiff Forms) (Schulte, Steven)
July 22, 2020 Filing 17 NOTICE of Filing Completed Forms for Each Plaintiff re: #16 Order, filed by Bard Peripheral Vascular Inc, C R Bard Inc, McKesson Corporation (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s)) (Matthews, Melissa)
July 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER: To assist the Court, counsel for all parties shall complete the form attached hereto as Exhibit A for each Plaintiff in this action. The parties shall file their completed forms on or before7/22/2020. (Ordered by Judge Karen Gren Scholer on 7/16/2020) (oyh)
July 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER The Court grants the parties' Agreed Motion for Leave to Extend the Time for Plaintiff toFile Responses to Defendants' Motions to Dismiss and Defendants' Replies to Those Responses [ECF No. #13 ). Plaintiffs shall respond to Defendants' Motion to Dismiss by 8/27/2020. Defendants shall file their reply, if any, by 9/26/2020. (Ordered by Judge Karen Gren Scholer on 7/9/2020) (ndt)
July 9, 2020 Filing 14 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by McKesson Corporation. (Matthews, Melissa) (Main Document 14 replaced with flattened document on 7/13/2020) (pnp).
July 8, 2020 Filing 13 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to #3 Brief/Memorandum in Support of Motion, #2 MOTION to Dismiss the Out-Of State Plaintiffs' Claims for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction, #9 Brief/Memorandum in Support of Motion, #8 MOTION to Dismiss Without Prejudice Plaintiffs' Claims for Lack of Subject Matter Jurisdiction filed by James Arrowood, Morgan Blevins, Jerry Comer, Michael Curry, Charlotte Dorsey, Laverne Hazley, Gina Hill, Steven Hoffman, Kanitha Jones, Paulette Leaphart, Gertha McKenna, Danny Wheeler, Scott Wilson, Verrell Wyman, Richard Yohn, Nathan Young, Karon Zulewski, Scott Zuzek (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Proposed Order) (Schulte, Steven)
July 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge Karen Gren Scholer for all further proceedings. Judge Sam A. Lindsay no longer assigned to case. (Ordered by Judge Sam A. Lindsay on 7/8/2020) (svc)
July 7, 2020 Filing 11 ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) with Jury Demand filed by McKesson Corporation (Matthews, Melissa)
July 7, 2020 Filing 10 ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) with Jury Demand filed by Bard Peripheral Vascular Inc, C R Bard Inc (Matthews, Melissa)
July 7, 2020 Filing 9 Brief/Memorandum in Support filed by McKesson Corporation re #8 MOTION to Dismiss Without Prejudice Plaintiffs' Claims for Lack of Subject Matter Jurisdiction (Matthews, Melissa)
July 7, 2020 Filing 8 MOTION to Dismiss Without Prejudice Plaintiffs' Claims for Lack of Subject Matter Jurisdiction filed by McKesson Corporation (Matthews, Melissa)
July 1, 2020 Filing 7 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Bard Peripheral Vascular Inc. (Matthews, Melissa) (Main Document 7 replaced with the flattened document on 7/6/2020) (pnp).
July 1, 2020 Filing 6 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by C R Bard Inc. (Matthews, Melissa) (Main Document 6 replaced with flattened document on 7/6/2020) (pnp).
July 1, 2020 Filing 5 AMENDED DOCUMENT by C R Bard Inc, Bard Peripheral Vascular Inc. Amendment to #1 Notice of Removal,,,,,,,. . (Attachments: #1 Cover Sheet, #2 Cover Sheet Supplement, #3 Exhibit(s) A - Portion of REACH Agreement, #4 Exhibit(s) B - McKesson Corporation, #5 Exhibit(s) C- 8-30-2016 Romney, Kim Deposition, #6 Exhibit(s) D - Index of State Court Documents, #7 Exhibit(s) D-1 - State Court Docket, #8 Exhibit(s) D-2 - P's Original Petition & Jury Demand, #9 Exhibit(s) D-3 - Civil Case Info Sheet, #10 Exhibit(s) D-4 - Citation Issued to Bard Peripheral Vaascular, Inc., #11 Exhibit(s) D-5 - Citation Issued to C. R. Bard, Inc., #12 Exhibit(s) D-6 - Citation Issued to McKesson Corporation, #13 Exhibit(s) D-7 - Notice of Dismissal Hearing, #14 Exhibit(s) D-8 - Return of Service - C. R. Bard, Inc., #15 Exhibit(s) D-9 - Return of Service - Bard Peripheral Vascular, Inc.) (Matthews, Melissa) (Attachment 1 & 2 replaced with the flattened document on 7/6/2020) (pnp).
July 1, 2020 Filing 4 New Case Notes: A filing fee has been paid. Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge (Judge Toliver). Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. (oyh)
July 1, 2020 Filing 3 Brief/Memorandum in Support filed by Bard Peripheral Vascular Inc, C R Bard Inc re #2 MOTION to Dismiss the Out-Of State Plaintiffs' Claims for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction (Matthews, Melissa)
July 1, 2020 Filing 2 MOTION to Dismiss the Out-Of State Plaintiffs' Claims for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction filed by Bard Peripheral Vascular Inc, C R Bard Inc (Matthews, Melissa)
July 1, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL WITH JURY DEMAND filed by C. R. Bard, Inc., Bard Peripheral Vascular, Inc.. (Filing fee $400; receipt number 0539-10961311) In each Notice of Electronic Filing, the judge assignment is indicated, and a link to the # Judges Copy Requirements and # Judge Specific Requirements is provided. The court reminds the filer that any required copy of this and future documents must be delivered to the judge, in the manner prescribed, within three business days of filing. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms and Instructions found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Attachments: #1 Cover Sheet, #2 Cover Sheet Supplement, #3 Exhibit(s) A - Portion of REACH Agreement, #4 Exhibit(s) B - McKesson Corporation, #5 Exhibit(s) C - 8-30-2016 Romney, Kim Deposition, #6 Exhibit(s) D - Index of State Court Documents, #7 Exhibit(s) D-1 - State Court Docket, #8 Exhibit(s) D-2 - P's Original Petition and Jury Demand, #9 Exhibit(s) D-3 - Civil Case Info Sheet, #10 Exhibit(s) D-4 - Citation Issued to Bard Peripheral Vascular, Inc., #11 Exhibit(s) D-5 - Citation Issued to C. R. Bard, Inc., #12 Exhibit(s) D-6 - Citation Issued to McKesson Corporation, #13 Exhibit(s) D-7 - Notice of Dismissal Hearing, #14 Exhibit(s) D-8 - Return of Service - C. R. Bard, Inc., #15 Exhibit(s) D-9 - Return of Service - Bard Peripheral Vascular, Inc.) (Matthews, Melissa)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: MCKENNA v. C R BARD INC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MCKESSON CORPORATION
Represented By: Melissa Dorman Matthews
Represented By: Jordan E Jarreau
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: C R BARD INC
Represented By: Melissa Dorman Matthews
Represented By: Jordan E Jarreau
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DOES 1 THROUGH 100, INCLUSIVE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BARD PERIPHERAL VASCULAR, INC.
Represented By: Melissa Dorman Matthews
Represented By: Jordan E Jarreau
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: GERTHA MCKENNA
Represented By: Darren McDowell
Represented By: Eric Martin Przybysz
Represented By: Steven Scott Schulte
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?