RIMONI et al v. COMMONWEALTH LAND TITLE INSURANCE COMPANY
Plaintiff: ALON RIMONI, SHAI MANAGEMENT COMPANY, LLC, EREZ RIMONI and RONEN RIMONI
Defendant: COMMONWEALTH LAND TITLE INSURANCE COMPANY
Case Number: 2:2020cv01390
Filed: September 15, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: David S Cercone
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 5, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 5, 2020 Filing 14 BRIEF in Opposition re #8 Motion to Remand filed by COMMONWEALTH LAND TITLE INSURANCE COMPANY. (Willhite, James)
November 5, 2020 Filing 13 RESPONSE to Motion re #8 MOTION to Remand filed by COMMONWEALTH LAND TITLE INSURANCE COMPANY. (Willhite, James)
October 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER OF COURT: And now this 30th day of October, 2020, the court previously having entered a stay in this action, it is ORDERED that the case management conference scheduled for November 6, 2020 is CONTINUED UNTIL FURTHER ORDER OF COURT. Signed by Judge David S. Cercone on 10/30/2020. Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Order of the Court or Notice on the matter. (kly)
October 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER granting #10 Motion to Stay. Signed by Judge David S. Cercone on 10/22/2020. (kly)
October 21, 2020 Filing 10 MOTION to Stay by ALON RIMONI, EREZ RIMONI, RONEN RIMONI AND SHAI MANAGEMENT COMPANY, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (kly)
October 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER Response/Briefing Schedule re #8 Motion to Remand. Response to Motion due by 11/12/2020. Signed by Judge David S. Cercone on 10/16/2020. (kly)
October 15, 2020 Filing 8 MOTION to Remand by ALON RIMONI, EREZ RIMONI, RONEN RIMONI and SHAI MANAGEMENT COMPANY, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Proposed Order) (kly)
October 8, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE that instant civil action has been designated for placement into the United States District Court's Alternative Dispute Resolution program. Parties are directed to fully complete the required 26(f) report, which includes the stipulation of selecting an ADR process. Counsel for plaintiff (or in the case of a removal action, counsel for removing defendant) shall make service of the notice on all parties. (kak)
September 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 INITIAL LOCAL RULE 16.1 SCHEDULING ORDER: Case Management Conference set for 11/6/2020 at 10:30 AM in Courtroom 7A before Judge David S. Cercone. Rule 26 Meeting to be conducted on or before 10/14/2020. Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 10/22/2020. Stipulation Selecting ADR Process due by 10/22/2020. Signed by Judge David S. Cercone on 9/23/2020. (kly)
September 22, 2020 Filing 5 ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) by COMMONWEALTH LAND TITLE INSURANCE COMPANY. (Willhite, James)
September 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER granting #3 Motion for Attorney James A. Willhite, Jr. to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Judge David S. Cercone on 9/17/2020. Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Order of the Court or Notice on the matter. (kly)
September 16, 2020 Filing 3 MOTION for attorney James A. Willhite, Jr. to Appear Pro Hac Vice, (Filing fee $70, Receipt # APAWDC-5916110) by COMMONWEALTH LAND TITLE INSURANCE COMPANY. (Willhite, James)
September 16, 2020 Filing 2 Disclosure Statement identifying Commonwealth Land Title Insurance Company as corporate parent or other affiliate, by COMMONWEALTH LAND TITLE INSURANCE COMPANY. (Willhite, James)
September 15, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Allegheny County Court of Common Pleas, case number GD-19-013087 (Filing fee, including Administrative fee, $400, receipt number APAWDC-5912337) filed by COMMONWEALTH LAND TITLE INSURANCE COMPANY. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A) (cel)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: RIMONI et al v. COMMONWEALTH LAND TITLE INSURANCE COMPANY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ALON RIMONI
Represented By: Robert S. Bootay, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SHAI MANAGEMENT COMPANY, LLC
Represented By: Robert S. Bootay, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: EREZ RIMONI
Represented By: Robert S. Bootay, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: RONEN RIMONI
Represented By: Robert S. Bootay, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: COMMONWEALTH LAND TITLE INSURANCE COMPANY
Represented By: James A Willhite
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?