RUPP v. MARYLAND OVERPAK CORPORATION
Plaintiff: TODD RUPP
Defendant: MARYLAND OVERPAK CORPORATION
Case Number: 2:2020cv01392
Filed: September 15, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: J Nicholas Ranjan
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 9, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER striking #13 Stipulation Selecting ADR process. The parties must file an amended ADR Stipulation by 11/13/2020 that includes a set date for the mediation and a representative for defendant. Signed by Judge J. Nicholas Ranjan on 11/9/2020. Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Order of the Court or Notice on the matter. (av)
November 6, 2020 Filing 13 STIPULATION selecting ADR process by TODD RUPP. (Elliott, Ronald)
November 6, 2020 Filing 12 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Elliott, Ronald)
October 19, 2020 Filing 11 Disclosure Statement identifying None as corporate parent or other affiliate, by MARYLAND OVERPAK CORPORATION. (Sneath, Henry)
October 15, 2020 CLERK'S OFFICE QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE re #10 Answer to Complaint. ERROR: Party did not file disclosure statement as required pursuant L.R. 7.1.1. CORRECTION: Attorney advised to file statement within 7 days. This message is for informational purposes only. Disclosure Statement due by 10/22/2020. (sdp)
October 14, 2020 Filing 10 ANSWER to Complaint and Defenses by MARYLAND OVERPAK CORPORATION. (Sneath, Henry)
October 8, 2020 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Robert D. Shope, Jr on behalf of MARYLAND OVERPAK CORPORATION. (Shope, Robert)
October 8, 2020 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Henry M. Sneath on behalf of MARYLAND OVERPAK CORPORATION. (Sneath, Henry)
September 28, 2020 Filing 7 Proposed Rule 26(f) report (av)
September 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER: Telephonic Initial Case Management Conference set for 11/18/2020 at 03:00 PM before Judge J. Nicholas Ranjan. Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 11/6/2020. Stipulation Selecting ADR Process due by 11/6/2020. Signed by Judge J. Nicholas Ranjan on 9/28/2020. (av)
September 25, 2020 Filing 4 SUMMONS/Return of Service Returned Executed by TODD RUPP. MARYLAND OVERPAK CORPORATION served on 9/23/2020, answer due 10/14/2020. (Elliott, Ronald)
September 18, 2020 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to MARYLAND OVERPAK CORPORATION (sdp)
September 17, 2020 Filing 2 PRAECIPE to Issue Summons by TODD RUPP (Elliott, Ronald)
September 15, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against MARYLAND OVERPAK CORPORATION (Filing fee, including Administrative fee, $400, receipt number APAWDC-591343), filed by TODD RUPP. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (sdp)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: RUPP v. MARYLAND OVERPAK CORPORATION
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: TODD RUPP
Represented By: Ronald T. Elliott
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MARYLAND OVERPAK CORPORATION
Represented By: Robert D. Shope, Jr.
Represented By: Henry M. Sneath
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?