ZAWELENSKY v. SAUL
Plaintiff: KATHY L. ZAWELENSKY
Defendant: ANDREW SAUL
Case Number: 2:2020cv01425
Filed: September 21, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: Alan N Bloch
Referring Judge: Joy Flowers Conti
Nature of Suit: Social Security: RSI Tax Suits
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 22, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 2, 2020 Filing 3 SUMMONS/Return of Service Returned Executed by KATHY L. ZAWELENSKY. ANDREW SAUL served on 9/24/2020, answer due 11/23/2020. (Rerko, A.)
September 23, 2020 Judge Alan N. Bloch added. Judge Joy Flowers Conti no longer assigned to case. (jmm)
September 22, 2020 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to ANDREW SAUL (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons) (cel)
September 21, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against ANDREW SAUL (Filing fee, including Administrative fee, $400, receipt number APAWDC-5928154), filed by KATHY L. ZAWELENSKY. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (cel)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: ZAWELENSKY v. SAUL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: KATHY L. ZAWELENSKY
Represented By: A. Tereasa Rerko
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ANDREW SAUL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?