SCHOOL DISTRICT OF PITTSBURGH v. JUUL LABS, INC. et al
Plaintiff: SCHOOL DISTRICT OF PITTSBURGH
Defendant: NU MARK LLC, ALTRIA GROUP DISTRIBUTION COMPANY, ALTRIA CLIENT SERVICES, JUUL LABS, INC., JOHN DOES 1-100 INCLUSIVE, ALTRIA GROUP, INC. and PHILIP MORRIS USA, INC.
Case Number: 2:2020cv01443
Filed: September 24, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: Maureen P Kelly
Nature of Suit: Racketeer/Corrupt Organization
Cause of Action: 18 U.S.C. ยง 1961
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 16, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 16, 2020 Remark: Case transferred from Pennsylvania Western has been opened in California Northern District as case 3:20-cv-07210, filed 10/15/2020 (jv)
October 13, 2020 Filing 7 Certified Copy of Conditional Transfer Order received from Northern District of California. (jv)
October 13, 2020 Case electronically transferred to the Northern District of California. (jv)
October 9, 2020 Filing 6 Conditional Transfer Order received from the Judicial Panel on Multi-District Litigation. (jjg)
September 25, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Ronald T. Elliott on behalf of SCHOOL DISTRICT OF PITTSBURGH. (Elliott, Ronald)
September 25, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Thomas E. Breth on behalf of SCHOOL DISTRICT OF PITTSBURGH. (Breth, Thomas)
September 25, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Jordan P. Shuber on behalf of SCHOOL DISTRICT OF PITTSBURGH. (Shuber, Jordan)
September 25, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Ira Weiss on behalf of SCHOOL DISTRICT OF PITTSBURGH. (Weiss, Ira)
September 24, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against ALTRIA CLIENT SERVICES, ALTRIA GROUP DISTRIBUTION COMPANY, ALTRIA GROUP, INC., JOHN DOES 1-100 INCLUSIVE, JUUL LABS, INC., NU MARK LLC, PHILIP MORRIS USA, INC. (Filing fee, including Administrative fee, $400, receipt number APAWDC-5941108), filed by SCHOOL DISTRICT OF PITTSBURGH. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (jv)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: SCHOOL DISTRICT OF PITTSBURGH v. JUUL LABS, INC. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SCHOOL DISTRICT OF PITTSBURGH
Represented By: Ira Weiss
Represented By: Jordan P. Shuber
Represented By: Thomas E. Breth
Represented By: Thomas W. King, III
Represented By: Ronald T. Elliott
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NU MARK LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ALTRIA GROUP DISTRIBUTION COMPANY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ALTRIA CLIENT SERVICES
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JUUL LABS, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOHN DOES 1-100 INCLUSIVE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ALTRIA GROUP, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PHILIP MORRIS USA, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?