BILLY v. ENCOMPASS HOME AND AUTO INSURANCE COMPANY
Plaintiff: SUSAN BILLY
Defendant: ENCOMPASS HOME AND AUTO INSURANCE COMPANY
Case Number: 2:2020cv01456
Filed: September 28, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: Joy Flowers Conti
Referring Judge: Christy Criswell Wiegand
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28:1391
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 26, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 26, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER re Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 12(b) Motions to Dismiss. Signed by Christy Criswell Wiegand on 10/26/2020. (jmm)
October 26, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER AT&T SCHEDULING NOTICE FOR ALL TELEPHONIC CONFERENCES. Every Telephonic Conference conducted will be via an AT&T call-in number which requires participants to dial-in and provide an access code. When a Telephonic Conference is scheduled you will be instructed to refer back to this Notice. This document has a security setting of "Case Participants Only," so only those individuals will have access to view the document. Signed by Christy Criswell Wiegand on 10/26/2020. (jmm)
October 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Christy Criswell Wiegand for all further proceedings. Judge Joy Flowers Conti no longer assigned to case. All previously scheduled deadlines and proceedings shall remain in effect unless otherwise ordered by the Court. See order at 2:20-mc-1451. Signed by Chief Judge Mark R. Hornak on 10/22/2020. Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Order of the Court or Notice on the matter. (sgn)
October 6, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE that instant civil action has been designated for placement into the United States District Court's Alternative Dispute Resolution program. Parties are directed to fully complete the required 26(f) report, which includes the stipulation of selecting an ADR process. Counsel for plaintiff (or in the case of a removal action, counsel for removing defendant) shall make service of the notice on all parties. (cjo)
September 28, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against ENCOMPASS HOME AND AUTO INSURANCE COMPANY (Filing fee, including Administrative fee, $400, receipt number APAWDC-5948876), filed by SUSAN BILLY. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (ma)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: BILLY v. ENCOMPASS HOME AND AUTO INSURANCE COMPANY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ENCOMPASS HOME AND AUTO INSURANCE COMPANY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SUSAN BILLY
Represented By: Ashley Marie Henkle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?